Raphaiel Moore v. Martin Biter
Petitioner / Appellant: RAPHAIEL MOORE
Respondent / Appellee: MARTIN BITER, Warden
Case Number: 19-55844
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
November 20, 2020 RAPHAIEL MOORE V. MARTIN BITER

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) Appellant Raphaiel Moore Unopposed Motion to extend time to file Opening brief until 11/07/2019. Date of service: 09/04/2019. [11420853] [19-55844] (Fischer, Dennis) [Entered: 09/04/2019 02:27 PM]
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 Filed Appellant Raphaiel Moore motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: None. Served on 05/19/2019. [11375747] (HC) [Entered: 07/24/2019 04:15 PM]
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Raphaiel Moore opening brief due 09/23/2019. Appellee Martin Biter, Warden answering brief due 10/22/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11375742] (HC) [Entered: 07/24/2019 04:13 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Raphaiel Moore v. Martin Biter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: RAPHAIEL MOORE
Represented By: Dennis A. Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: MARTIN BITER, Warden
Represented By: Toni Raven Johns Estaville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?