William Roman, et al v. MSL Capital, LLC, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: J. R., Minors, by and through their general guardian, Desiree Acosta, WILLIAM ROMAN, A. R., RENEE SANDOVAL, N. R., CATHERINE MICHELLE PEREZ, D. R., DIEGO SANDOVAL, A. G., a minor, by and through her general guardian, Renee Sandoval, DESIREE ACOSTA, I. A., J. R. and S. A., minors, by and through their general guardian, Catherine Michelle Perez
Defendant / Appellee: MSL CAPITAL, LLC, DBA Casa Buena Casa Lynnda and LI RITCHEY
Case Number: 19-55896
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
September 8, 2020 WILLIAM ROMAN V. MSL CAPITAL, LLC

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing 7 Filed order MEDIATION (JW): The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: appellants' opening brief is due December 9, 2019; appellees' answering brief is due January 8, 2020; appellants' optional reply brief is due within 21 days from the service date of the answering brief. [11447268] (RT) [Entered: 09/27/2019 05:04 PM]
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 MEDIATION CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference w/ counsel for appellant only, 09/09/2019, 10:30 a.m. Pacific Time (originally scheduled on 09/06/2019). [11423908] (BLS) [Entered: 09/06/2019 03:03 PM]
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference w/ counsel for appellant only, 09/06/2019, 2:00 p.m. Pacific Time. See order for details. [11416205] (BLS) [Entered: 08/30/2019 08:51 AM]
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 08/23/2019, 2:00 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11394434] (MS) [Entered: 08/12/2019 01:54 PM]
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 08/01/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11384900][19-55896] (AD) [Entered: 08/01/2019 06:44 PM]
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellants A. G., A. R., Desiree Acosta, D. R., I. A., J. R., J. R., N. R., Catherine Michelle Perez, William Roman, S. A., Diego Sandoval and Renee Sandoval Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 08/01/2019. [11384585] [19-55896] (Fagan, Stuart) [Entered: 08/01/2019 03:17 PM]
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 08/08/2019. Transcript ordered by 08/30/2019. Transcript due 09/30/2019. Appellants A. G., A. R., Desiree Acosta, D. R., I. A., J. R., N. R., Catherine Michelle Perez, William Roman, S. A., Diego Sandoval and Renee Sandoval opening brief due 11/08/2019. Appellees MSL Capital, LLC and Li Ritchey answering brief due 12/09/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11383827] (JBS) [Entered: 08/01/2019 10:21 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: William Roman, et al v. MSL Capital, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: J. R., Minors, by and through their general guardian, Desiree Acosta
Represented By: Stuart Eric Fagan Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WILLIAM ROMAN
Represented By: Stuart Eric Fagan Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: A. R.
Represented By: Stuart Eric Fagan Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RENEE SANDOVAL
Represented By: Stuart Eric Fagan Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: N. R.
Represented By: Stuart Eric Fagan Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CATHERINE MICHELLE PEREZ
Represented By: Stuart Eric Fagan Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: D. R.
Represented By: Stuart Eric Fagan Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DIEGO SANDOVAL
Represented By: Stuart Eric Fagan Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: A. G., a minor, by and through her general guardian, Renee Sandoval
Represented By: Stuart Eric Fagan Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DESIREE ACOSTA
Represented By: Stuart Eric Fagan Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: I. A.
Represented By: Stuart Eric Fagan Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: J. R.
Represented By: Stuart Eric Fagan Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: S. A., minors, by and through their general guardian, Catherine Michelle Perez
Represented By: Stuart Eric Fagan Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MSL CAPITAL, LLC, DBA Casa Buena Casa Lynnda
Represented By: Keith Bremer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LI RITCHEY
Represented By: Keith Bremer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?