Marvin Coffey v. Mesa Airlines, Inc., et al
Defendant / Appellee: MESA AIRLINES, INC. and MESA AIR GROUP, INC.
Plaintiff / Appellant: MARVIN WAYNE COFFEY
Case Number: 19-55916
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 8 Streamlined request [7] by Appellant Marvin Wayne Coffey to extend time to file the brief is approved. Streamline requests allow for 30 day extensions. Amended briefing schedule: Appellant Marvin Wayne Coffey opening brief due 11/04/2019. Appellees Mesa Air Group, Inc. and Mesa Airlines, Inc. answering brief due 12/04/2019. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [11455217] (DLM) [Entered: 10/04/2019 04:35 PM]
October 4, 2019 Filing 7 Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellant Marvin Wayne Coffey. New requested due date is 11/01/2019. [11453890] [19-55916] (Hernandez, Isaac) [Entered: 10/04/2019 07:25 AM]
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. [11431021] (CL) [Entered: 09/13/2019 12:26 PM]
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 09/05/2019, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [11407624] (CL) [Entered: 08/22/2019 04:48 PM]
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 08/12/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11395116][19-55916] (AD) [Entered: 08/12/2019 06:44 PM]
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) Appellant Marvin Wayne Coffey Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 08/12/2019. [11394908] [19-55916] (Hernandez, Isaac) [Entered: 08/12/2019 04:17 PM]
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 Terminated Jenna Logoluso for Mesa Airlines, Inc. and Mesa Air Group, Inc. in 19-55916 (Due to incorrect ECF account information). [11389699] (SLM) [Entered: 08/07/2019 11:03 AM]
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 08/13/2019. Appellant Marvin Wayne Coffey opening brief due 10/04/2019. Appellees Mesa Air Group, Inc. and Mesa Airlines, Inc. answering brief due 11/04/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11388549] (JPD) [Entered: 08/06/2019 11:29 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marvin Coffey v. Mesa Airlines, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MESA AIRLINES, INC.
Represented By: Shirley Shu
Represented By: Hope Anne Case
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MESA AIR GROUP, INC.
Represented By: Hope Anne Case
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARVIN WAYNE COFFEY
Represented By: Isaac P. Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?