Liberty City Movie, LLC, et al v. U.S. Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff / Appellant: LIBERTY CITY MOVIE, LLC, a Florida limited liability company and CUTTING EDGE STEREOSCOPE MOTION PICTURES, LLC, a Louisiana limited liability company
Defendant / Appellee: U.S. BANK, N.A., a National Banking Association
Case Number: 19-55965
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
August 26, 2020 LIBERTY CITY MOVIE, LLC V. U.S. BANK NA

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Filing 10 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. [11449362] (BLS) [Entered: 09/30/2019 06:13 PM]
September 9, 2019 Filing 9 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 09/30/2019, 10:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11424569] (BLS) [Entered: 09/09/2019 09:39 AM]
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 Filed (ECF) Appellee U.S. Bank, N.A. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 08/26/2019. [11410626] [19-55965] (Zubairi, Faisal) [Entered: 08/26/2019 02:55 PM]
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 08/26/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11410225][19-55965] (AD) [Entered: 08/26/2019 12:44 PM]
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 Filed (ECF) Appellant Cutting Edge Stereoscope Motion Pictures, LLC Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 08/26/2019. [11410126] [19-55965] (Blessing, William) [Entered: 08/26/2019 11:59 AM]
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 Added Attorney(s) Faisal M. Zubairi for party(s) Appellee U.S. Bank, N.A.. [11409594] (RL) [Entered: 08/26/2019 09:20 AM]
August 25, 2019 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Faisal M. Zubairi (Dorsey & Whitney LLP, 600 Anton Blvd., Suite 2000, Costa Mesa, CA 92626) for Appellee U.S. Bank, N.A.. Date of service: 08/25/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11409358] [19-55965] (Zubairi, Faisal) [Entered: 08/25/2019 10:25 PM]
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 Attorney James Balesh substituted by Attorney William H. Blessing. [11408606] (RL) [Entered: 08/23/2019 01:31 PM]
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of William H Blessing (The Blessing Law Firm, 119 East Court Street, Suite 500 Cincinnati OH 45202) for Appellants Cutting Edge Stereoscope Motion Pictures, LLC and Liberty City Movie, LLC. Substitution for Attorney James Balesh for Appellants Cutting Edge Stereoscope Motion Pictures, LLC and Liberty City Movie, LLC. Date of service: 08/23/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11408468] [19-55965] (Blessing, William) [Entered: 08/23/2019 12:05 PM]
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 08/26/2019. Transcript ordered by 09/18/2019. Transcript due 10/18/2019. Appellants Cutting Edge Stereoscope Motion Pictures, LLC and Liberty City Movie, LLC opening brief due 11/29/2019. Appellee U.S. Bank, N.A. answering brief due 12/30/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11402240] (RT) [Entered: 08/19/2019 02:14 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Liberty City Movie, LLC, et al v. U.S. Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LIBERTY CITY MOVIE, LLC, a Florida limited liability company
Represented By: James Balesh
Represented By: William H. Blessing Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CUTTING EDGE STEREOSCOPE MOTION PICTURES, LLC, a Louisiana limited liability company
Represented By: James Balesh
Represented By: William H. Blessing Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: U.S. BANK, N.A., a National Banking Association
Represented By: Lynnda Ann McGlinn Esquire
Represented By: Faisal M. Zubairi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?