Scottsdale Insurance Company v. Dickstein Shapiro LLP, et al
Defendant / Appellee: DICKSTEIN SHAPIRO LLP, CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDON, including Brit UW Limited for and on behalf of Lloyds Syndicate 2987, Beazley Furlonge Ltd. for and on behalf of Lloyds Syndicate 2623, Beazley Furlonge Ltd. for and on behalf of Lloyds Syndicate 0623, Faraday, LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY and SWISS RE INTERNATIONAL SE ZURICH
Plaintiff / Appellant: SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 19-56027
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Filing 7 MEDIATION STATUS REPORT DUE - 10/22/2019. See order for details. [11450174] [19-55502, 19-56102, 19-56027] (BLS) [Entered: 10/01/2019 01:32 PM]
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 Filed order MEDIATION (JW): In appeal no. 19-56102, appellants are excused from filing the Mediation Questionnaire. [11444387] [19-55502, 19-56102, 19-56027] (AF) [Entered: 09/26/2019 09:26 AM]
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 09/30/2019, 1:00 p.m. Pacific Time. See order for details. [11436768] [19-55502, 19-56102, 19-56027] (BLS) [Entered: 09/19/2019 09:07 AM]
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. Setting cross-appeal briefing schedule as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 09/25/2019. First cross appeal brief due 12/11/2019 for Scottsdale Insurance Company. Second brief on cross appeal due 01/13/2020 for Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London, Dickstein Shapiro LLP, Lexington Insurance Company and Swiss Re International SE Zurich. Third brief on cross appeal due 02/13/2020 for Scottsdale Insurance Company. Optional cross appeal Reply brief for Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London, Lexington Insurance Company and Swiss Re International SE Zurich is due 21 days from service of Third brief on cross appeal. [11435590] [19-56102, 19-55502, 19-56027] (RT) [Entered: 09/18/2019 11:18 AM]
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 09/10/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11426784][19-56027] (AD) [Entered: 09/10/2019 12:44 PM]
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellant Scottsdale Insurance Company Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 09/10/2019. [11426738] [19-56027] (Keane, Bryan) [Entered: 09/10/2019 12:17 PM]
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 09/10/2019. Transcript ordered by 09/30/2019. Transcript due 10/29/2019. Appellant Scottsdale Insurance Company opening brief due 12/11/2019. Appellees Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London, Dickstein Shapiro LLP, Lexington Insurance Company and Swiss Re International SE Zurich answering brief due 01/13/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11419034] (RT) [Entered: 09/03/2019 02:42 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Scottsdale Insurance Company v. Dickstein Shapiro LLP, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DICKSTEIN SHAPIRO LLP
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Garfinkle
Represented By: John E. Jureller
Represented By: Danielle Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDON, including Brit UW Limited for and on behalf of Lloyds Syndicate 2987, Beazley Furlonge Ltd. for and on behalf of Lloyds Syndicate 2623, Beazley Furlonge Ltd. for and on behalf of Lloyds Syndicate 0623, Faraday
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Williams
Represented By: Mark Leonard Block Esquire
Represented By: Raymond J. Tittmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Williams
Represented By: Mark Leonard Block Esquire
Represented By: Raymond J. Tittmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SWISS RE INTERNATIONAL SE ZURICH
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Williams
Represented By: Mark Leonard Block Esquire
Represented By: Raymond J. Tittmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Robert E. Cattanach
Represented By: Faisal M. Zubairi
Represented By: Bryan C. Keane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?