Optimum Productions, et al v. Home Box Office, et al
Defendant: DOES, 1 through 5, business entities unknown; 6 through 10, business indivduals unknown and HOME BOX OFFICE, a Division of Time Warner Entertainment L.P. a Delaware Limited Partnership
Defendant / Appellant: HOME BOX OFFICE, INC., a Delaware corporation
Plaintiff / Appellee: JOHN BRANCA, OPTIMUM PRODUCTIONS, a California corporation and JOHN MCCLAIN, in the Respective Capacities as Co-Executor of the Estate of Michael J. Jackson
Case Number: 19-56222
Filed: October 23, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 Filing 5 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. [11504266] (VS) [Entered: 11/19/2019 02:25 PM]
October 31, 2019 Filing 4 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 11/15/2019, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [11485359] (VS) [Entered: 10/31/2019 03:58 PM]
October 30, 2019 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 10/30/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11484181][19-56222] (AD) [Entered: 10/30/2019 06:44 PM]
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellant Home Box Office, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/30/2019. [11484165] [19-56222] (Petrocelli, Daniel) [Entered: 10/30/2019 06:07 PM]
October 23, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Home Box Office, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire due on 10/30/2019. Transcript ordered by 11/20/2019. Transcript due 12/20/2019. Appellant Home Box Office, Inc. opening brief due 01/29/2020. Appellees John Branca, John McClain and Optimum Productions answering brief due 02/28/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11474186] (JBS) [Entered: 10/23/2019 09:33 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Optimum Productions, et al v. Home Box Office, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: HOME BOX OFFICE, INC., a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Drew Myers Breuder
Represented By: Daniel Petrocelli
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous Esquire Jr.
Represented By: Nathaniel Bach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES, 1 through 5, business entities unknown; 6 through 10, business indivduals unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOME BOX OFFICE, a Division of Time Warner Entertainment L.P. a Delaware Limited Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JOHN BRANCA
Represented By: Howard L. Weitzman Esquire
Represented By: Bryan Joel Freedman Esquire
Represented By: Jonathan Steinsapir Esquire
Represented By: Dale F. Kinsella Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: OPTIMUM PRODUCTIONS, a California corporation
Represented By: Howard L. Weitzman Esquire
Represented By: Bryan Joel Freedman Esquire
Represented By: Jonathan Steinsapir Esquire
Represented By: Dale F. Kinsella Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JOHN MCCLAIN, in the Respective Capacities as Co-Executor of the Estate of Michael J. Jackson
Represented By: Howard L. Weitzman Esquire
Represented By: Bryan Joel Freedman Esquire
Represented By: Jonathan Steinsapir Esquire
Represented By: Dale F. Kinsella Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?