Salvador Ortiz Lopez, et al v. Town of Apple Valley, et al
Plaintiff: IRMA ORTIZ
Defendant: JIM ANDERSON, Code Enforcement Officer for Town of Apple Valley, DOES, 1-10, Inclusive and JOHNATHAN WOOD, Inspector for Town of Apple Valley
Plaintiff / Appellant: SALVADOR ORTIZ LOPEZ
Defendant / Appellee: TOWN OF APPLE VALLEY, a corporation
Case Number: 19-56412
Filed: December 4, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Filing 6 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. [11557093] (VS) [Entered: 01/09/2020 04:05 PM]
December 30, 2019 Filing 5 Filed (ECF) Notice of withdrawal of counsel. Filed by Attorney Mrs. Linda M. Battram for Appellant Salvador Ortiz Lopez. Party proceeding without counsel: Yes, mailing address provided. Party mailing address: 21817 Arapahoe Avenue, Apt. B, Apple Valley, CA 92307. Date of service: 12/30/2019. [11546502] [19-56412] (Battram, Linda) [Entered: 12/30/2019 12:06 PM]
December 17, 2019 Filing 4 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 12/31/2019, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [11535067] (VS) [Entered: 12/17/2019 11:13 AM]
December 9, 2019 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 12/09/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11526505]. [19-56412] (AD) [Entered: 12/09/2019 06:44 PM]
December 9, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellant Salvador Ortiz Lopez Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 12/09/2019. [11525699] [19-56412] (Battram, Linda) [Entered: 12/09/2019 01:38 PM]
December 4, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Salvador Ortiz Lopez Mediation Questionnaire due on 12/11/2019. Transcript ordered by 01/03/2020. Transcript due 02/03/2020. Appellant Salvador Ortiz Lopez opening brief due 03/12/2020. Appellee Town of Apple Valley answering brief due 04/13/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11520775] (RT) [Entered: 12/04/2019 11:41 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Salvador Ortiz Lopez, et al v. Town of Apple Valley, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IRMA ORTIZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SALVADOR ORTIZ LOPEZ
Represented By: Linda M. Battram
Represented By: Salvador Ortiz Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JIM ANDERSON, Code Enforcement Officer for Town of Apple Valley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES, 1-10, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNATHAN WOOD, Inspector for Town of Apple Valley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TOWN OF APPLE VALLEY, a corporation
Represented By: Nicole Barvie
Represented By: Konrad Muth Rasmussen Esquire
Represented By: John P. McCormick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?