Center for Biological Diversit, et al v. USEPA, et al
Petitioner: CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, CALIFORNIA COMMUNITIES AGAINST TOXICS, DESERT CITIZENS AGAINST POLLUTION and SIERRA CLUB
Respondent: ANDREW WHEELER, Acting Administrator, United States Environmental Protection Agency and U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Case Number: 19-70340
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2019 Filing 8 Filed (ECF) Respondents USEPA and Andrew Wheeler agency certified list. Date of service: 03/24/2019 [11240133] [19-70340] (Coghlan, Andrew) [Entered: 03/24/2019 03:17 PM]
March 4, 2019 Filing 7 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. The briefing schedule previously established by the court remains in effect. [11214702] (LW) [Entered: 03/04/2019 12:08 PM]
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 Attorneys Jon Michael Lipshultz \ substituted by Attorneys Andrew Coghlan [11198981] (JFF) [Entered: 02/19/2019 11:19 AM]
February 18, 2019 Filing 5 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Andrew Stephen Coghlan for Respondents USEPA and Andrew Wheeler. Substitution for Attorney Jon Michael Lipshultz for Respondents USEPA and Andrew Wheeler. Date of service: 02/18/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11198232] [19-70340] (Coghlan, Andrew) [Entered: 02/18/2019 01:37 PM]
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 03/01/2019, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [11197882] (LW) [Entered: 02/15/2019 03:50 PM]
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 02/14/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11190480] (AD) [Entered: 02/14/2019 12:44 PM]
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Petitioners Center for Biological Diversity, California Communities Against Toxics, Desert Citizens Against Pollution and Sierra Club Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 02/14/2019. [11190234] [19-70340] (Ukeiley, Robert) [Entered: 02/14/2019 10:53 AM]
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 FILED PETITION FOR REVIEW. DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. NOTIFIED RESPONDENTS OF FILING. SEND MQ: Yes. Mediation Questionnaire due on 02/15/2019. Petitioner brief due 04/29/2019 for California Communities Against Toxics, Center for Biological Diversity, Desert Citizens Against Pollution and Sierra Club. Respondent brief due 05/29/2019 for U.S. Environmental Protection Agency and Andrew Wheeler. Petitioner's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11183804] (JMR) [Entered: 02/08/2019 10:12 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Center for Biological Diversit, et al v. USEPA, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
Represented By: Lisa T. Belenky
Represented By: Robert Ukeiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CALIFORNIA COMMUNITIES AGAINST TOXICS
Represented By: Lisa T. Belenky
Represented By: Robert Ukeiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DESERT CITIZENS AGAINST POLLUTION
Represented By: Lisa T. Belenky
Represented By: Robert Ukeiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SIERRA CLUB
Represented By: Lisa T. Belenky
Represented By: Robert Ukeiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ANDREW WHEELER, Acting Administrator, United States Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: Andrew Coghlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Represented By: Andrew Coghlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?