Olivia Quiroz-Roman v. William Barr
Petitioner: OLIVIA QUIROZ-ROMAN
Respondent: WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General
Case Number: 19-70973
Filed: April 23, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
April 21, 2020 OLIVIA QUIROZ-ROMAN V. WILLIAM BARR

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 Filed (ECF) Respondent William P. Barr response opposing motion ([ # 1 ] For Stay Removal Motion to stay removal). Date of service: 06/17/2019. [11332963] [19-70973] (Gordon, Virginia) [Entered: 06/17/2019 07:58 AM]
May 14, 2019 Filing 5 Filed (ECF) Certified Administrative Record by Executive Office of Immigration Review. [11296674] [19-70973] (Executive Office Of Immigration Review, DOJ) [Entered: 05/14/2019 11:53 AM]
April 23, 2019 Filing 4 Resources Available As you get ready to prepare your opening brief, please consult the Immigration Outline ( # http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/guides/immigration_outline.php ) prepared by court staff and also consider contacting the court's mentoring program (see Appellate Mentoring Program at # http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/attorneys/ ) for help with the brief and argument. (Notice sent to counsel for petitioner.) [11274578] (CD) [Entered: 04/23/2019 05:40 PM]
April 23, 2019 Filing 3 Added attorney Virginia Gordon for William P. Barr, in case 19-70973. [11273945] (QDL) [Entered: 04/23/2019 01:35 PM]
April 23, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Virginia Lee Gordon for Respondent William P. Barr. Date of service: 04/23/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11273940] [19-70973] (Gordon, Virginia) [Entered: 04/23/2019 01:34 PM]
April 22, 2019 Filing 1 FILED BIA Petition for Review and Motion for Stay. COUNSELED. Pursuant to G.O. 6.4(c) A TEMPORARY STAY OF REMOVAL IS IN EFFECT pending further order. Petitioner detained? NO. Certified Administrative Record due 05/28/2019. Response to motion for stay due 06/17/2019 for William P. Barr, Attorney General. Petitioner opening brief due 07/26/2019 for Olivia Quiroz-Roman. Respondent brief due 09/24/2019 for William P. Barr, Attorney General. Optional reply brief is due 21 days from service of respondent brief. [11272985] (BY) [Entered: 04/23/2019 06:46 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Olivia Quiroz-Roman v. William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: OLIVIA QUIROZ-ROMAN
Represented By: Stefan Stuparu Esquire I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General
Represented By: Virginia Gordon Esquire
Represented By: Chief Counsel ICE
Represented By: OIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?