Albert Veenstra, III v. USDC-IDB
Petitioner: ALBERT PETE VEENSTRA III
Respondent: UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF IDAHO, BOISE
Not Classified By Court: In re: ALBERT PETE VEENSTRA III
Not Yet Classified: PAUL B. RIPPLE, Idaho State Bar Governing Member, sued in his personal and professional capacity, MICHELLE R. POINTS, Idaho State Bar Governing Member, sued in her personal and professional capacity, TRUDY H. FOUSER, Idaho State Bar Governing Member, sued in her personal and professional capacity, UNIVERSITY OF IDAHO LAW SCHOOL, sued in its official capacity, DENNIS S. VORHEES, Idaho State Bar Governing Member, sued in his personal and professional capacity, TIM GRESBACK, Idaho State Bar Governing Member, sued in his personal and professional capacity, DOES, Unnamed Faculty Members sued in their personal and professional capacities; Numerous Attorneys All unnamed licensed by the Idaho State Bar sued in their personal and professional capacities who served as officers of the court between and, IDAHO STATE BAR, sued in its official capacity and CHUCK STABEN, University of Idaho School President, sued in his personal and professional capacitie
Case Number: 19-71260
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2019 Filing 6 Received copy of motion filed in district court re: Motion for leave to request the court to reconsider its order of dismissal dated 6/17/2019, request for expedited reconsideration order. Motion filed by Petitioner Albert Pete Veenstra, III. [11355554] (RL) [Entered: 07/05/2019 04:39 PM]
July 5, 2019 Filing 5 Filed Petitioner Albert Pete Veenstra, III request for stay of proceedings. Deficiencies: Case closed. NAN per 6/28/19 order. Served on 07/01/2019. [11355551] (RL) [Entered: 07/05/2019 04:36 PM]
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 Filed order (RICHARD R. CLIFTON, ANDREW D. HURWITZ and MICHELLE T. FRIEDLAND) Petitioner has not demonstrated that this case warrants the intervention of this court by means of the extraordinary remedy of mandamus. See Bauman v. U.S. Dist. Court, 557 F.2d 650 (9th Cir. 1977). Accordingly, the petition is denied. All pending motions are denied as moot. No further filings will be entertained in this closed case. DENIED. [11348150] (OC) [Entered: 06/28/2019 09:49 AM]
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 Filed Petitioner Albert Pete Veenstra, III letter dated 05/30/2019 re:. Notice that case was entered and filed on 4/24/2019. Paper filing deficiency: None. [11319105] (RL) [Entered: 06/04/2019 12:09 PM]
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 Filed Petitioner Albert Pete Veenstra, III application for in forma pauperis status. Deficiencies: None. Served on 05/30/2019. [11319078] (RL) [Entered: 06/04/2019 11:57 AM]
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 FILED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS. DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCE OF PRO SE PETITIONER. [11304662][COURT UPDATE: New Documents Attached, resent NDA,--[Edited 05/22/2019 by BY] (JBS) [Entered: 05/21/2019 02:36 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Albert Veenstra, III v. USDC-IDB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: In re: ALBERT PETE VEENSTRA III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ALBERT PETE VEENSTRA III
Represented By: Albert Pete Veenstra III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF IDAHO, BOISE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: PAUL B. RIPPLE, Idaho State Bar Governing Member, sued in his personal and professional capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MICHELLE R. POINTS, Idaho State Bar Governing Member, sued in her personal and professional capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: TRUDY H. FOUSER, Idaho State Bar Governing Member, sued in her personal and professional capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: UNIVERSITY OF IDAHO LAW SCHOOL, sued in its official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: DENNIS S. VORHEES, Idaho State Bar Governing Member, sued in his personal and professional capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: TIM GRESBACK, Idaho State Bar Governing Member, sued in his personal and professional capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: DOES, Unnamed Faculty Members sued in their personal and professional capacities; Numerous Attorneys All unnamed licensed by the Idaho State Bar sued in their personal and professional capacities who served as officers of the court between and
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: IDAHO STATE BAR, sued in its official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CHUCK STABEN, University of Idaho School President, sued in his personal and professional capacitie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?