Ditech Financial LLC, et al v. Dutch Oven Court Trust, et al
Plaintiff: DITECH FINANCIAL LLC, FKA Green Tree Servicing LLC and FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION
Defendant: TALASERA AND VICANTO HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION and NEVADA ASSOCIATION SERVICES, INC.
Counter Claimant: DUTCH OVEN COURT TRUST
Case Number: 20-15066
Filed: January 15, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2020 Filing 9 MEDIATION STATUS REPORT DUE - 03/27/2020. See order for details. [11628095] (CL) [Entered: 03/12/2020 02:23 PM]
February 21, 2020 Filing 8 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 03/12/2020, 2:00 p.m. Pacific Time. See order for details. [11604742] (CL) [Entered: 02/21/2020 11:45 AM]
January 30, 2020 Filing 7 Filed (ECF) Appellees Ditech Financial LLC and FNMA/Fannie Mae Stipulated Motion for miscellaneous relief [Dismissal of Claims Against Ditech Financial LLC f/k/a Green Tree Servicing, LLC]. Date of service: 01/30/2020. [11579967] --[COURT ENTERED FILING to correct entry [6] .] (TYL) [Entered: 01/30/2020 03:16 PM]
January 30, 2020 Filing 6 COURT DELETED INCORRECT ENTRY. Notice about deletion sent to case participants registered for electronic filing. Correct Entry: [ # 7 ]. Original Text: Filed (ECF) Appellees Ditech Financial LLC and FNMA/Fannie Mae Correspondence: Stipulation of Dismissal of Claims Against Ditech Financial LLC f/k/a Green Tree Servicing, LLC. Date of service: 01/30/2020 [11579864] [20-15066] (Garner, Rex) [Entered: 01/30/2020 02:28 PM]
January 30, 2020 Filing 5 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 02/20/2020, 2:00 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11579848] (CL) [Entered: 01/30/2020 02:22 PM]
January 30, 2020 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) Appellee Ditech Financial LLC Correspondence: Notice of Bankruptcy Status. Date of service: 01/30/2020 [11579580] [20-15066] (Garner, Rex) [Entered: 01/30/2020 12:18 PM]
January 22, 2020 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 01/22/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11571128]. [20-15066] (AD) [Entered: 01/22/2020 06:44 PM]
January 22, 2020 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellant Dutch Oven Court Trust Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/22/2020. [11570936] [20-15066] (Bohn, Michael) [Entered: 01/22/2020 04:15 PM]
January 15, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Dutch Oven Court Trust Mediation Questionnaire due on 01/22/2020. Transcript ordered by 02/12/2020. Transcript due 03/13/2020. Appellant Dutch Oven Court Trust opening brief due 04/22/2020. Appellees Ditech Financial LLC and Federal National Mortgage Association answering brief due 05/22/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11562968] (JBS) [Entered: 01/15/2020 10:08 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Ditech Financial LLC, et al v. Dutch Oven Court Trust, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DITECH FINANCIAL LLC, FKA Green Tree Servicing LLC
Represented By: Melanie Dawn Morgan Esquire
Represented By: Rex D. Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Melanie Dawn Morgan Esquire
Represented By: Rex D. Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: DUTCH OVEN COURT TRUST
Represented By: Michael F. Bohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TALASERA AND VICANTO HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEVADA ASSOCIATION SERVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?