Steven Bonilla
Not Classified By Court: In re: STEVEN WAYNE BONILLA, Vexatious Litigant
Petitioner / Appellant: STEVEN WAYNE BONILLA
Case Number: 20-15128
Filed: January 30, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2020 Filing 7 Sent Appellant a copy of the docket sheet, a copy of the FRAP and Ninth Circuit rules and a copy of docket entry 2 in response to his letter of request filed on 03/18/2020. [11635124] (JR) [Entered: 03/19/2020 10:37 AM]
March 18, 2020 Filing 6 Received Appellant Steven Wayne Bonilla notice regarding request for copy of FRAP Rules. [11635005] (NAC) [Entered: 03/19/2020 09:37 AM]
March 18, 2020 Filing 5 Filed Appellant Steven Wayne Bonilla motion to appoint pro bono counsel. Deficiencies: None. [11635001] (NAC) [Entered: 03/19/2020 09:36 AM]
March 18, 2020 Filing 4 Filed Appellant Steven Wayne Bonilla motion to extend time to file a response. Deficiencies: None. [11634998] (NAC) [Entered: 03/19/2020 09:34 AM]
March 18, 2020 Filing 3 Filed Appellant Steven Wayne Bonilla letter dated re: request copy of court oders and docket sheet. Paper filing deficiency: None. [11634988] (NAC) [Entered: 03/19/2020 09:32 AM]
January 30, 2020 Filing 2 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCE OF PRO SE APPELLANT AND NO APPELLEES. This appeal is subject to a pre-filing review order in case number 16-73383. The appeal will be reviewed by the Court to determine whether it will be allowed to proceed. No briefing schedule will be set until/unless the Court determines that the appeal should be allowed to proceed. [11579363] (RT) [Entered: 01/30/2020 10:44 AM]
January 30, 2020 Filing 1 Deleted Incorrect Entry. Entered in error. [11579329] (RT) [Entered: 01/30/2020 10:29 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Steven Bonilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: In re: STEVEN WAYNE BONILLA, Vexatious Litigant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: STEVEN WAYNE BONILLA
Represented By: Steven Wayne Bonilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?