FNMA/Fannie Mae v. Ferrell Street Trust, et al
Defendant: WARM SPRINGS RESERVE OWNERS ASSOCIATION and ALESSI & KOENIG, LLC
Defendant / Appellant: FERRELL STREET TRUST
Plaintiff / Appellee: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION
Case Number: 20-15156
Filed: February 5, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
February 9, 2021 FNMA/FANNIE MAE V. FERRELL STREET TRUST

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2020 Filing 8 MEDIATION CONFERENCE now DIAL-IN - FurtherConference, 04/09/2020, 2:00 p.m. Pacific Time. [11647667] (VS) [Entered: 03/31/2020 03:49 PM]
March 10, 2020 Filing 7 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - FurtherConference, 04/09/2020, 2:00 p.m. Pacific Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: Appellant's opening brief due 05/26/2020. Appellee's answering brief due 06/25/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due within 21 days afer service of the answering brief. See order for details. [11625100] (VS) [Entered: 03/10/2020 03:05 PM]
February 19, 2020 Filing 6 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - AssessmentConference, 03/10/2020, 2:30 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11601551] (VS) [Entered: 02/19/2020 11:15 AM]
February 13, 2020 Filing 5 Added Attorney(s) Stephen Colmery Parsley for party(s) Appellee FNMA/Fannie Mae. [11596019] (RL) [Entered: 02/13/2020 09:51 AM]
February 13, 2020 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Stephen Colmery Parsley (Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP) for Appellee FNMA/Fannie Mae. Date of service: 02/13/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11596010] [20-15156] (Parsley, Stephen) [Entered: 02/13/2020 09:47 AM]
February 12, 2020 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 02/12/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11595732]. [20-15156] (AD) [Entered: 02/12/2020 06:44 PM]
February 12, 2020 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellant Ferrell Street Trust Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 02/12/2020. [11595082] [20-15156] (Bohn, Michael) [Entered: 02/12/2020 01:42 PM]
February 5, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Ferrell Street Trust Mediation Questionnaire due on 02/12/2020. Appellant Ferrell Street Trust opening brief due 04/03/2020. Appellee Federal National Mortgage Association answering brief due 05/04/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11586009] (JBS) [Entered: 02/05/2020 09:34 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: FNMA/Fannie Mae v. Ferrell Street Trust, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARM SPRINGS RESERVE OWNERS ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALESSI & KOENIG, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: FERRELL STREET TRUST
Represented By: Michael F. Bohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Scott Lachman
Represented By: Ariel Edward Stern Esquire
Represented By: Stephen Colmery Parsley Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?