Bank of New York Mellon v. T-Shack, Inc., et al
Defendant: BLACKHORSE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION
Defendant / Appellant: T-SHACK, INC.
Plaintiff / Appellee: BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON, as Trustee for the Certificateholders of CWALT, Inc. Alternative Loan Trust 2004-36CB, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2004-36CB, FKA Bank of New York
Case Number: 20-15228
Filed: February 13, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
November 24, 2020 BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON V. T-SHACK, INC.

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2020 Filing 6 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 04/27/2020, 2:00 p.m. Pacific Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: Appellant T-Shack, Inc. opening brief due 05/15/2020. Appellee Bank of New York Mellon answering brief due 06/15/2020. Appellants optional reply brief is due within 21 days afer service of the answering brief. See order for details. [11656990] (CL) [Entered: 04/10/2020 08:07 AM]
March 23, 2020 Filing 5 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Further Conference, 04/09/2020, 2:00 p.m. Pacific Time. See order for details. [11637895] (CL) [Entered: 03/23/2020 08:28 AM]
February 27, 2020 Filing 4 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 03/19/2020, 2:00 p.m., PACIFIC Time. See order for instructions and details. [11610949] (VS) [Entered: 02/27/2020 10:55 AM]
February 20, 2020 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 02/20/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11603297]. [20-15228] (AD) [Entered: 02/20/2020 12:44 PM]
February 20, 2020 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellant T-Shack, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 02/20/2020. [11603249] [20-15228] (Yergensen, Chris) [Entered: 02/20/2020 12:16 PM]
February 13, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant T-Shack, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire due on 02/20/2020. Appellant T-Shack, Inc. opening brief due 04/15/2020. Appellee Bank of New York Mellon answering brief due 05/15/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11596656] (RT) [Entered: 02/13/2020 01:28 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Bank of New York Mellon v. T-Shack, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLACKHORSE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: T-SHACK, INC.
Represented By: Chris V. Yergensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON, as Trustee for the Certificateholders of CWALT, Inc. Alternative Loan Trust 2004-36CB, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2004-36CB, FKA Bank of New York
Represented By: Natalie L. Winslow Esquire
Represented By: Jamie Combs
Represented By: Darren T. Brenner
Represented By: Rex D. Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?