Saticoy Bay LLC Series 2794 Mu, et al v. Bank of America, N.A., et al
Plaintiff: ALESSI & KOENIG, LLC
Defendant: PATRICIA E. LEON and FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION
Plaintiff / Appellant: SATICOY BAY LLC SERIES 2794 MURRAY HILL LN
Defendant / Appellee: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.
Case Number: 20-15349
Filed: March 3, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2020 Filing 10 MEDIATION STATUS REPORT DUE - 05/14/2020. The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows :Appellant's opening brief due 07/10/2020. Appellee's answering brief due 08/10/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due within twenty one 21 days from the service date of the answer brief. See order for details. [11645489] (VS) [Entered: 03/30/2020 12:20 PM]
March 24, 2020 Filing 9 Added Attorney(s) Richard Aaron Chastain for party(s) Appellee Bank of America, N.A., in case 20-15349. [11639602] (JFF) [Entered: 03/24/2020 08:40 AM]
March 24, 2020 Filing 8 Added Attorney(s) Stephen Colmery Parsley for party(s) Appellee Bank of America, N.A., in case 20-15349. [11639599] (JFF) [Entered: 03/24/2020 08:39 AM]
March 24, 2020 Filing 7 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Richard Aaron Chastain (Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP, One Federal Place, 1819 Fifth Avenue North, Birmingham, AL 35203) for Appellee Bank of America, N.A.. Date of service: 03/24/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11639520] [20-15349] (Chastain, Richard) [Entered: 03/24/2020 07:21 AM]
March 23, 2020 Filing 6 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Stephen Colmery Parsley (Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP) for Appellee Bank of America, N.A.. Date of service: 03/23/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11639401] [20-15349] (Parsley, Stephen) [Entered: 03/23/2020 06:05 PM]
March 19, 2020 Filing 5 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 03/30/2020, 10:30 a.m., PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11635189] (VS) [Entered: 03/19/2020 11:03 AM]
March 10, 2020 Filing 4 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 03/10/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11625547]. [20-15349] (AD) [Entered: 03/10/2020 06:44 PM]
March 10, 2020 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) Appellant Saticoy Bay LLC Series 2794 Murray Hill Ln Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 03/10/2020. [11624830] [20-15349] (Bohn, Michael) [Entered: 03/10/2020 01:44 PM]
March 4, 2020 Filing 2 Received copy of amended notice of appeal from district court. [11618512] (JFF) [Entered: 03/04/2020 04:03 PM]
March 3, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Saticoy Bay LLC Series 2794 Murray Hill Ln Mediation Questionnaire due on 03/10/2020. Transcript ordered by 04/02/2020. Transcript due 05/01/2020. Appellant Saticoy Bay LLC Series 2794 Murray Hill Ln opening brief due 06/10/2020. Appellee Bank of America, N.A. answering brief due 07/10/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11616017] (RT) [Entered: 03/03/2020 09:33 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Saticoy Bay LLC Series 2794 Mu, et al v. Bank of America, N.A., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SATICOY BAY LLC SERIES 2794 MURRAY HILL LN
Represented By: Michael F. Bohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALESSI & KOENIG, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.
Represented By: Donna M. Wittig
Represented By: Darren T. Brenner
Represented By: Ariel Edward Stern Esquire
Represented By: Richard Aaron Chastain
Represented By: Stephen Colmery Parsley Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATRICIA E. LEON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?