Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs v. Toshiba Corporation, et al
Petitioner / Appellant: HARRY GARAVANIAN, CHRIS SEUFERT, KERRY MURPHY, JAY ERICKSON, MIKE BRATCHER, D. BRUCE JOHNSON, ROBERT STEPHENSON, TYLER AYRES, JEFF JOHNSON, WILLIAM TRENTHAM, Proposed Intervenors, JOHN HEENAN, HOPE HITCHCOCK, NIKKI CRAWLEY and GARY TALEWSKY
Defendant / Appellee: TOSHIBA AMERICA CONSUMER PRODUCTS, LLC, PANASONIC CORPORATION OF NORTH AMERICA, SAMSUNG SDI (MALAYSIA) SDN BHD, HITACHI DISPLAYS, LTD., AKA Japan Display, Inc., THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, INC., PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION, SHENZEN SAMSUNG SDI CO., LTD., TOSHIBA CORPORATION, SAMSUNG SDI AMERICA, INC., TIANJIN SAMSUNG SDI CO., LTD., THOMSON SA, SAMSUNG SDI CO., LTD., HITACHI ELECTRONIC DEVICES (USA), INC., PANASONIC CORPORATION, FKA Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. ("MEI"), is a Japanese entity, TOSHIBA AMERICA INFORMATION SYSTEMS, INC., HITACHI ASIA, LTD., SAMSUNG SDI MEXICO S.A. DE C.V., PHILIPS DO BRASIL LTDA., TOSHIBA AMERICA ELECTRONIC COMPONENTS, INC., PHILIPS KONINKLIJKE N.V., SAMSUNG SDI BRASIL LTDA., PHILIPS TAIWAN LIMITED, HITACHI, LTD., MT PICTURE DISPLAY CO., LTD, TOSHIBA AMERICA, INC. and HITACHI AMERICA, LTD
Plaintiff / Appellee: INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS
Not Classified By Court: In re: CATHODE RAY TUBE (CRT) ANTITRUST LITIGATION
Case Number: 20-15697
Filed: April 16, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2020 Filing 20 Filed order (KIM MCLANE WARDLAW, RICHARD R. CLIFTON and GARY S. KATZMANN) Appellants appeal the district courts orders (1) denying their motions to intervene and (2) granting preliminary approval of a class settlement between the so-called Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs (Appellees) and some of the defendants in this case. Appellees do not dispute our jurisdiction to review the orders denying intervention. See Prete v. Bradbury, 438 F.3d 949, 959 n.14 (9th Cir. 2006). But they move to dismiss the appeals for lack of jurisdiction to the extent they challenge the order granting preliminary approval of the settlement. Appellants advance two arguments in favor of appellate jurisdiction over the order granting preliminary approval. First, they contend that the orders denying their motions to intervene were final judgments as to them, and that the preliminary approval order merged into those judgments such that it too is subject to immediate review. However, orders denying motions to intervene are immediately appealable not as final judgments but instead under the collateral order doctrine. Robert Ito Farm, Inc. v. County of Maui, 842 F.3d 681, 688 (9th Cir. 2016)....In sum, we conclude that we lack jurisdiction to review the district courts order granting preliminary approval of the class settlement. Accordingly, Appellees motions to partially dismiss the appeals are GRANTED. These appeals shall be consolidated for future proceedings. The Clerk is directed to set a briefing schedule for the merits of the remaining issues. The parties are encouraged to submit combined briefs to the extent practicable. IT IS SO ORDERED. (SEE ORDER FOR FULL TEXT) [11716114] [20-15697, 20-15704] (OC) [Entered: 06/09/2020 02:00 PM]
May 27, 2020 Filing 19 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: OC): The previous panel has retained jurisdiction of these appeals. Oral argument, if any, will be set in due course. [11702222] (OC) [Entered: 05/27/2020 10:41 AM]
May 26, 2020 Filing 18 Filed (ECF) Appellee Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs reply to response (). Date of service: 05/26/2020. [11701796] [20-15697] (Capurro, Lauren) [Entered: 05/26/2020 11:45 PM]
May 18, 2020 Filing 17 Filed (ECF) Appellants Tyler Ayres, Mike Bratcher, Nikki Crawley, Jay Erickson, Harry Garavanian, John Heenan, Hope Hitchcock, D. Bruce Johnson, Jeff Johnson, Kerry Murphy, Chris Seufert, Robert Stephenson, Gary Talewsky and William Trentham response opposing motion ([ # 15 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 15 ] Motion (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 05/18/2020. [11694679] [20-15697] (Crabtree, John) [Entered: 05/18/2020 06:04 PM]
May 18, 2020 Filing 16 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: These cases are RELEASED from the Mediation Program. All further inquiries regarding these appeals, including request for extensions of time, should be directed to the Clerk's Office. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [11693901] [20-15697, 20-15704] (VS) [Entered: 05/18/2020 01:09 PM]
May 8, 2020 Filing 15 Filed (ECF) Appellee Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction. Date of service: 05/08/2020. [11685743] [20-15697] (Capurro, Lauren) [Entered: 05/08/2020 09:19 PM]
April 28, 2020 Filing 14 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 05/12/2020, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedules remain in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [11674557] [20-15697, 20-15704] (VS) [Entered: 04/28/2020 01:54 PM]
April 27, 2020 Filing 13 Added Attorney(s) James Sigel for party(s) Appellee Hitachi Asia, Ltd. Appellee Hitachi, Ltd. Appellee Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc. Appellee Hitachi America, Ltd Appellee Hitachi Displays, Ltd., in case 20-15697. [11671939] (NAC) [Entered: 04/27/2020 07:14 AM]
April 27, 2020 Filing 12 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of James R. Sigel (Morrison & Foerster LLP, 425 Market Street, San Francisco, CA 94105) for Appellees Hitachi, Ltd., Hitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi America, Ltd, Hitachi Asia, Ltd. and Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc.. Date of service: 04/27/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11671931] [20-15697] (Sigel, James) [Entered: 04/27/2020 07:03 AM]
April 23, 2020 Filing 11 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 04/23/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11670383]. [20-15697] (AD) [Entered: 04/23/2020 06:44 PM]
April 23, 2020 Filing 10 Filed (ECF) Appellants Tyler Ayres, Mike Bratcher, Nikki Crawley, Jay Erickson, Harry Garavanian, John Heenan, Hope Hitchcock, D. Bruce Johnson, Jeff Johnson, Kerry Murphy, Chris Seufert, Robert Stephenson, Gary Talewsky and William Trentham Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 04/23/2020. [11670118] [20-15697] (Crabtree, John) [Entered: 04/23/2020 03:20 PM]
April 23, 2020 Filing 9 Added Attorney(s) Matthew Frutig for party(s) Appellee Toshiba America Consumer Products, LLC Appellee Toshiba Corporation Appellee Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc. Appellee Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc. Appellee Toshiba America, Inc., in case 20-15697. [11669892] (NAC) [Entered: 04/23/2020 01:49 PM]
April 23, 2020 Filing 8 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Matthew Frutig (White & Case LLP 701 Thirteenth Street, NW Washington, District of Columbia 20005-3807) for Appellees Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba America, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba America Consumer Products, LLC and Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc.. Date of service: 04/23/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11669862] [20-15697] (Frutig, Matthew) [Entered: 04/23/2020 01:40 PM]
April 23, 2020 Filing 7 Added Attorney(s) John Granville Crabtree Sr. for party(s) Appellant William Trentham Appellant Tyler Ayres Appellant Mike Bratcher Appellant Kerry Murphy Appellant D. Bruce Johnson Appellant Robert Stephenson Appellant Nikki Crawley Appellant Harry Garavanian Appellant John Heenan Appellant Jeff Johnson Appellant Chris Seufert Appellant Gary Talewsky Appellant Jay Erickson Appellant Hope Hitchcock, in case 20-15697. [11669303] (NAC) [Entered: 04/23/2020 09:14 AM]
April 23, 2020 Filing 6 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of John G. Crabtree (Crabtree & Auslander, 240 Crandon Boulevard, Suite 101, Key Biscayne, FL 33149) for Appellants Tyler Ayres, Mike Bratcher, Nikki Crawley, Jay Erickson, Harry Garavanian, John Heenan, Hope Hitchcock, D. Bruce Johnson, Jeff Johnson, Kerry Murphy, Chris Seufert, Robert Stephenson, Gary Talewsky and William Trentham. Date of service: 04/23/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11669266] [20-15697] (Crabtree, John) [Entered: 04/23/2020 08:58 AM]
April 22, 2020 Filing 5 Terminated Christopher A. Nedeau for William Trentham, Gary Talewsky, Robert Stephenson, Chris Seufert, Kerry Murphy, Jeff Johnson, D. Bruce Johnson, Hope Hitchcock, John Heenan, Harry Garavanian, Jay Erickson, Nikki Crawley, Mike Bratcher and Tyler Ayres in 20-15697 (due to incorrect ECF contact information) [11668199] (RY) [Entered: 04/22/2020 10:33 AM]
April 21, 2020 Filing 4 Attorneys Gary Halling, James McGinnis, Michael W. Scarborough in 20-15697 substituted by Attorneys Andrew Rhys and John Roberti in 20-15697 [11666882] (NAC) [Entered: 04/21/2020 09:43 AM]
April 21, 2020 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of John Roberti (Allen & Overy LLP, 1101 New York Avenue NW, Washington, DC 20005) for Appellees Samsung SDI (Malaysia) SDN BHD, Samsung SDI America, Inc., Samsung SDI Brasil Ltda., Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., Samsung SDI Mexico S.A. de C.V., Tianjin Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. and Shenzen Samsung SDI Co., Ltd.. Substitution for Gary Halling, Esquire for Appellees Samsung SDI (Malaysia) SDN BHD, Samsung SDI America, Inc., Samsung SDI Brasil Ltda., Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., Samsung SDI Mexico S.A. de C.V., Shenzen Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. and Tianjin Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., James McGinnis for Appellees Samsung SDI (Malaysia) SDN BHD, Samsung SDI America, Inc., Samsung SDI Brasil Ltda., Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., Samsung SDI Mexico S.A. de C.V., Shenzen Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. and Tianjin Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. and Michael W. Scarborough for Appellees Samsung SDI (Malaysia) SDN BHD, Samsung SDI America, Inc., Samsung SDI Brasil Ltda., Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., Samsung SDI Mexico S.A. de C.V., Shenzen Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. and Tianjin Samsung SDI Co., Ltd.. Date of service: 04/21/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11666854] [20-15697] (Roberti, John) [Entered: 04/21/2020 09:36 AM]
April 21, 2020 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Andrew Rhys Davies (Allen & Overy LLP, 1221 Avenue of the Americas, New York, New York 10020) for Appellees Samsung SDI (Malaysia) SDN BHD, Samsung SDI America, Inc., Samsung SDI Brasil Ltda., Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., Samsung SDI Mexico S.A. de C.V., Shenzen Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. and Tianjin Samsung SDI Co., Ltd.. Substitution for Gary Halling, Esquire for Appellees Samsung SDI (Malaysia) SDN BHD, Samsung SDI America, Inc., Samsung SDI Brasil Ltda., Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., Samsung SDI Mexico S.A. de C.V., Shenzen Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. and Tianjin Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., James McGinnis for Appellees Samsung SDI (Malaysia) SDN BHD, Samsung SDI America, Inc., Samsung SDI Brasil Ltda., Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., Samsung SDI Mexico S.A. de C.V., Shenzen Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. and Tianjin Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. and Michael W. Scarborough for Appellees Samsung SDI (Malaysia) SDN BHD, Samsung SDI America, Inc., Samsung SDI Brasil Ltda., Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., Samsung SDI Mexico S.A. de C.V., Shenzen Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. and Tianjin Samsung SDI Co., Ltd.. Date of service: 04/21/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11666823] [20-15697] (Davies, Andrew Rhys) [Entered: 04/21/2020 09:26 AM]
April 16, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Tyler Ayres, Mike Bratcher, Nikki Crawley, Jay Erickson, Harry Garavanian, John Heenan, Hope Hitchcock, D. Bruce Johnson, Jeff Johnson, Kerry Murphy, Chris Seufert, Robert Stephenson, Gary Talewsky and William Trentham Mediation Questionnaire due on 04/23/2020. Transcript ordered by 05/15/2020. Transcript due 06/15/2020. Appellants Tyler Ayres, Mike Bratcher, Nikki Crawley, Jay Erickson, Harry Garavanian, John Heenan, Hope Hitchcock, D. Bruce Johnson, Jeff Johnson, Kerry Murphy, Chris Seufert, Robert Stephenson, Gary Talewsky and William Trentham opening brief due 07/24/2020. Appellees Hitachi America, Ltd, Hitachi Asia, Ltd., Hitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi, Ltd., Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, MT Picture Display Co., LTD, Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Philips Electronics North America Corporation, Philips Koninklijke N.V., Philips Taiwan Limited, Philips do Brasil Ltda., Samsung SDI (Malaysia) SDN BHD, Samsung SDI America, Inc., Samsung SDI Brasil Ltda., Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., Samsung SDI Mexico S.A. de C.V., Shenzen Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., Thomson Consumer Electronics, Inc., Thomson SA, Tianjin Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., Toshiba America Consumer Products, LLC, Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba America, Inc. and Toshiba Corporation answering brief due 08/24/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11663730] (RT) [Entered: 04/16/2020 05:44 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs v. Toshiba Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: HARRY GARAVANIAN
Represented By: Patrick B. Clayton
Represented By: Francis O. Scarpulla Esquire
Represented By: Theresa D. Moore Esquire
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau Esquire
Represented By: John Granville Crabtree Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: CHRIS SEUFERT
Represented By: Patrick B. Clayton
Represented By: Francis O. Scarpulla Esquire
Represented By: Theresa D. Moore Esquire
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau Esquire
Represented By: John Granville Crabtree Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: KERRY MURPHY
Represented By: Patrick B. Clayton
Represented By: Francis O. Scarpulla Esquire
Represented By: Theresa D. Moore Esquire
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau Esquire
Represented By: John Granville Crabtree Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: JAY ERICKSON
Represented By: Patrick B. Clayton
Represented By: Francis O. Scarpulla Esquire
Represented By: Theresa D. Moore Esquire
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau Esquire
Represented By: John Granville Crabtree Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: MIKE BRATCHER
Represented By: Patrick B. Clayton
Represented By: Francis O. Scarpulla Esquire
Represented By: Theresa D. Moore Esquire
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau Esquire
Represented By: John Granville Crabtree Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: D. BRUCE JOHNSON
Represented By: Patrick B. Clayton
Represented By: Francis O. Scarpulla Esquire
Represented By: Theresa D. Moore Esquire
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau Esquire
Represented By: John Granville Crabtree Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: ROBERT STEPHENSON
Represented By: Patrick B. Clayton
Represented By: Francis O. Scarpulla Esquire
Represented By: Theresa D. Moore Esquire
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau Esquire
Represented By: John Granville Crabtree Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: TYLER AYRES
Represented By: Patrick B. Clayton
Represented By: Francis O. Scarpulla Esquire
Represented By: Theresa D. Moore Esquire
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau Esquire
Represented By: John Granville Crabtree Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: JEFF JOHNSON
Represented By: Patrick B. Clayton
Represented By: Francis O. Scarpulla Esquire
Represented By: Theresa D. Moore Esquire
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau Esquire
Represented By: John Granville Crabtree Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: WILLIAM TRENTHAM, Proposed Intervenors
Represented By: Patrick B. Clayton
Represented By: Francis O. Scarpulla Esquire
Represented By: Theresa D. Moore Esquire
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau Esquire
Represented By: John Granville Crabtree Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: JOHN HEENAN
Represented By: Patrick B. Clayton
Represented By: Francis O. Scarpulla Esquire
Represented By: Theresa D. Moore Esquire
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau Esquire
Represented By: John Granville Crabtree Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: HOPE HITCHCOCK
Represented By: Patrick B. Clayton
Represented By: Francis O. Scarpulla Esquire
Represented By: Theresa D. Moore Esquire
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau Esquire
Represented By: John Granville Crabtree Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: NIKKI CRAWLEY
Represented By: Patrick B. Clayton
Represented By: Francis O. Scarpulla Esquire
Represented By: Theresa D. Moore Esquire
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau Esquire
Represented By: John Granville Crabtree Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: GARY TALEWSKY
Represented By: Patrick B. Clayton
Represented By: Francis O. Scarpulla Esquire
Represented By: Theresa D. Moore Esquire
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau Esquire
Represented By: John Granville Crabtree Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TOSHIBA AMERICA CONSUMER PRODUCTS, LLC
Represented By: Christopher M. Curran
Represented By: Lucius B. Lau
Represented By: Dana E. Foster
Represented By: Matthew Frutig
Represented By: Dana Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PANASONIC CORPORATION OF NORTH AMERICA
Represented By: Martin C. Geagan
Represented By: Molly M. Donovan
Represented By: Kevin B. Goldstein Esquire
Represented By: David Yohai Esquire
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Represented By: Adam C. Hemlock
Represented By: Eva W. Cole
Represented By: Aldo Badini
Represented By: David Yolkut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SAMSUNG SDI (MALAYSIA) SDN BHD
Represented By: Michael W. Scarborough
Represented By: Gary Halling Esquire
Represented By: James McGinnis
Represented By: John Roberti
Represented By: Andrew Rhys Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HITACHI DISPLAYS, LTD., AKA Japan Display, Inc.
Represented By: Eliot A. Adelson Esquire
Represented By: James Sigel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, INC.
Represented By: Ryan Hurley
Represented By: Kathy Osborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION
Represented By: Erik T. Koons
Represented By: John M. Taladay Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SHENZEN SAMSUNG SDI CO., LTD.
Represented By: Michael W. Scarborough
Represented By: Gary Halling Esquire
Represented By: James McGinnis
Represented By: John Roberti
Represented By: Andrew Rhys Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TOSHIBA CORPORATION
Represented By: Christopher M. Curran
Represented By: Lucius B. Lau
Represented By: Dana E. Foster
Represented By: Matthew Frutig
Represented By: Dana Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SAMSUNG SDI AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: Michael W. Scarborough
Represented By: Gary Halling Esquire
Represented By: James McGinnis
Represented By: John Roberti
Represented By: Andrew Rhys Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TIANJIN SAMSUNG SDI CO., LTD.
Represented By: Michael W. Scarborough
Represented By: Gary Halling Esquire
Represented By: James McGinnis
Represented By: John Roberti
Represented By: Andrew Rhys Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THOMSON SA
Represented By: Ryan Hurley
Represented By: Kathy Osborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SAMSUNG SDI CO., LTD.
Represented By: Michael W. Scarborough
Represented By: Gary Halling Esquire
Represented By: James McGinnis
Represented By: John Roberti
Represented By: Andrew Rhys Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HITACHI ELECTRONIC DEVICES (USA), INC.
Represented By: Eliot A. Adelson Esquire
Represented By: James Sigel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PANASONIC CORPORATION, FKA Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. ("MEI"), is a Japanese entity
Represented By: Martin C. Geagan
Represented By: Molly M. Donovan
Represented By: Kevin B. Goldstein Esquire
Represented By: David Yohai Esquire
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Represented By: Adam C. Hemlock
Represented By: Eva W. Cole
Represented By: Aldo Badini
Represented By: David Yolkut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TOSHIBA AMERICA INFORMATION SYSTEMS, INC.
Represented By: Christopher M. Curran
Represented By: Lucius B. Lau
Represented By: Dana E. Foster
Represented By: Matthew Frutig
Represented By: Dana Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HITACHI ASIA, LTD.
Represented By: Eliot A. Adelson Esquire
Represented By: James Sigel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SAMSUNG SDI MEXICO S.A. DE C.V.
Represented By: Michael W. Scarborough
Represented By: Gary Halling Esquire
Represented By: James McGinnis
Represented By: John Roberti
Represented By: Andrew Rhys Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PHILIPS DO BRASIL LTDA.
Represented By: Erik T. Koons
Represented By: John M. Taladay Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TOSHIBA AMERICA ELECTRONIC COMPONENTS, INC.
Represented By: Christopher M. Curran
Represented By: Lucius B. Lau
Represented By: Dana E. Foster
Represented By: Matthew Frutig
Represented By: Dana Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PHILIPS KONINKLIJKE N.V.
Represented By: Erik T. Koons
Represented By: John M. Taladay Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SAMSUNG SDI BRASIL LTDA.
Represented By: Michael W. Scarborough
Represented By: Gary Halling Esquire
Represented By: James McGinnis
Represented By: John Roberti
Represented By: Andrew Rhys Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PHILIPS TAIWAN LIMITED
Represented By: Erik T. Koons
Represented By: John M. Taladay Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HITACHI, LTD.
Represented By: Eliot A. Adelson Esquire
Represented By: James Sigel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MT PICTURE DISPLAY CO., LTD
Represented By: Martin C. Geagan
Represented By: Molly M. Donovan
Represented By: Kevin B. Goldstein Esquire
Represented By: David Yohai Esquire
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Represented By: Adam C. Hemlock
Represented By: Eva W. Cole
Represented By: Aldo Badini
Represented By: David Yolkut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TOSHIBA AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: Christopher M. Curran
Represented By: Lucius B. Lau
Represented By: Dana E. Foster
Represented By: Matthew Frutig
Represented By: Dana Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HITACHI AMERICA, LTD
Represented By: Eliot A. Adelson Esquire
Represented By: James Sigel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS
Represented By: Mario Alioto
Represented By: Sylvie Kern
Represented By: Jennifer S. Rosenberg Esquire
Represented By: Lauren C. Capurro
Represented By: Daniel Edward Birkhaeuser Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: In re: CATHODE RAY TUBE (CRT) ANTITRUST LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?