Bank of America, N.A. v. Twilight Homeowners Assoc., et al
Defendant: RBBE REAL ESTATE INVESTMENTS, LLC, DALY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, AKA Daly Management Corporation and HOMEOWNER ASSOCIATION SERVICES, INC.
Defendant / Appellee: TWILIGHT HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION
Plaintiff / Appellant: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., Successor by Merger to BAC Home Loans Servicing LP, FKA Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP
Case Number: 20-15713
Filed: April 20, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2020 Filing 7 MEDIATION STATUS REPORT DUE - 07/01/2020. The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: Appellant Bank of America, N.A. opening brief due 08/26/2020. Appellee Twilight Homeowners Association answering brief due 09/25/2020. Appellants optional reply brief is due within twenty one 21 days from the service date of the answer brief. See order for details. [11706719] (BLS) [Entered: 06/01/2020 11:58 AM]
May 22, 2020 Filing 6 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 05/29/2020, 10:00 a.m. Pacific Time. See order for details. [11699853] (BLS) [Entered: 05/22/2020 04:58 PM]
May 11, 2020 Filing 5 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 05/22/2020, 11:00 a.m. Pacific Time. See order for details. [11686075] (BLS) [Entered: 05/11/2020 09:36 AM]
May 1, 2020 Filing 4 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 05/08/2020, 1:00 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11678587] (BLS) [Entered: 05/01/2020 06:43 PM]
April 28, 2020 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 04/27/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11673643]. [20-15713] (AD) [Entered: 04/28/2020 06:44 AM]
April 27, 2020 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellant Bank of America, N.A. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 04/27/2020. [11673559] [20-15713] (Parsley, Stephen) [Entered: 04/27/2020 08:02 PM]
April 20, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Bank of America, N.A. Mediation Questionnaire due on 04/27/2020. Transcript ordered by 05/18/2020. Transcript due 06/16/2020. Appellant Bank of America, N.A. opening brief due 07/27/2020. Appellee Twilight Homeowners Association answering brief due 08/26/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11665692] (JBS) [Entered: 04/20/2020 11:19 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Bank of America, N.A. v. Twilight Homeowners Assoc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBBE REAL ESTATE INVESTMENTS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DALY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, AKA Daly Management Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOMEOWNER ASSOCIATION SERVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TWILIGHT HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Amber M. Williams
Represented By: Kaleb D. Anderson Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., Successor by Merger to BAC Home Loans Servicing LP, FKA Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP
Represented By: Richard Aaron Chastain
Represented By: Stephen Colmery Parsley Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?