Frank Solis v. Schering-Plough Corporation, et al
Defendant: MILLENNIUM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Defendant / Appellant: MERCK & CO., INC. and SCHERING-PLOUGH CORPORATION
Plaintiff / Appellee: FRANK SOLIS, United States of America ex rel.
Case Number: 20-15864
Filed: May 6, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2020 Filing 4 Streamlined request [3] by Appellant Frank Solis in 20-15682, Appellee Frank Solis in 20-15863, 20-15864 to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: First cross-appeal brief due 08/24/2020 for Frank Solis. Second brief on cross-appeal due 09/23/2020 for Merck & Co., Inc., Millennium Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Schering-Plough Corporation. Third brief on cross-appeal due 10/23/2020 for Frank Solis. The optional reply cross-appeal brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the third brief on cross-appeal. [11737712] [20-15682, 20-15863, 20-15864] (JN) [Entered: 06/30/2020 09:21 AM]
June 29, 2020 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellant Frank Solis in 20-15682. New requested due date is 08/24/2020. [11737205] [20-15682, 20-15863, 20-15864] (Parker, John) [Entered: 06/29/2020 04:49 PM]
May 8, 2020 Filing 2 Filed order MEDIATION (RSK): Appellants obligation to file mediation questionnaires in appeal nos. 20-15863 and 20-15864 are deemed satisfied. A dial-in telephone conference in appeal nos. 20-15863 and 20-15864 will be held in conjunction with appeal no. 20-15682 on May 26, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. Pacific Time. Each participant will receive an email modifying the dial-in information. [11685443] [20-15682, 20-15863, 20-15864] (AF) [Entered: 05/08/2020 03:07 PM]
May 6, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. Setting cross-appeal briefing schedule as follows: Appellants Merck & Co., Inc. and Schering-Plough Corporation Mediation Questionnaire due on 05/13/2020. First cross appeal brief due 07/24/2020 for Frank Solis. Second brief on cross appeal due 08/24/2020 for Merck & Co., Inc., Millennium Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Schering-Plough Corporation. Third brief on cross appeal due 09/23/2020 for Frank Solis. Optional cross appeal reply brief is due within 21 days of service of third brief on cross appeal. [11682046] [20-15864, 20-15682, 20-15863] (JBS) [Entered: 05/06/2020 09:44 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Frank Solis v. Schering-Plough Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MERCK & CO., INC.
Represented By: Douglas Hallward-Driemeier
Represented By: Rocky Chiu-feng Tsai
Represented By: John P. Bueker
Represented By: Jonathan R. Ference-Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: SCHERING-PLOUGH CORPORATION
Represented By: Douglas Hallward-Driemeier
Represented By: Rocky Chiu-feng Tsai
Represented By: John P. Bueker
Represented By: Jonathan R. Ference-Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MILLENNIUM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: FRANK SOLIS, United States of America ex rel.
Represented By: John Parker Esquire Jr.
Represented By: Mychal Wilson
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?