Fire & Police Pension Associat, et al v. Wells Fargo & Company, et al
Defendant / Appellee: MACKEY J. MCDONALD, CYNTHIA H. MILLIGAN, JOHN D. BAKER II, ELAINE L. CHAO, JOHN S. CHEN, NICHOLAS G. MOORE, JAMES H. QUIGLEY, SUSAN G. SWENSON, JOHN G. STUMPF, SUZANNE M. VAUTRINOT, PHILIP J. QUIGLEY, DONALD M. JAMES, ENRIQUE HERNANDEZ, Jr., MICHAEL J. LOUGHLIN, FEDERICO F. PENA, JOHN R. SHREWSBERRY, WELLS FARGO & COMPANY, JUDITH M. RUNSTAD, SUSAN E. ENGEL, LLOYD H. DEAN, RICHARD D. MCCORMICK, HOWARD V. RICHARDSON, TIMOTHY J. SLOAN, CARRIE L. TOLSTEDT, ELIZABETH A. DUKE and STEPHEN W. SANGER
Appellant: CATHY LEBENDIG
Plaintiff / Appellee: THE CITY OF BIRMINGHAM RETIREMENT AND RELIEF SYSTEM and FIRE & POLICE PENSION ASSOCIATION OF COLORADO
Not Classified By Court: In re: WELLS FARGO & COMPANY SHAREHOLDER DERIVATIVE LITIGATION
Case Number: 20-15879
Filed: May 7, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2020 Filing 6 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: These appeals are RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while these appeals are pending. [11705450] [20-15879, 20-15898] (BLS) [Entered: 05/29/2020 02:48 PM]
May 15, 2020 Filing 5 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 05/29/2020, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [11692940] [20-15879, 20-15898] (BLS) [Entered: 05/15/2020 04:49 PM]
May 14, 2020 Filing 4 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 05/14/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11690937]. [20-15879] (AD) [Entered: 05/14/2020 12:44 PM]
May 14, 2020 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) Appellant Cathy LeBendig Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 05/14/2020. [11690475] [20-15879] (Himmelstein, Barry) [Entered: 05/14/2020 08:46 AM]
May 7, 2020 Filing 2 Received copy of amended notice of appeal from district court filed on 05/04/2020. [11683956] (QDL) [Entered: 05/07/2020 02:13 PM]
May 7, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Cathy LeBendig Mediation Questionnaire due on 05/14/2020. Transcript ordered by 06/04/2020. Transcript due 07/06/2020. Appellant Cathy LeBendig opening brief due 08/14/2020. Appellees John D. Baker II, Elaine L. Chao, John S. Chen, Lloyd H. Dean, Elizabeth A. Duke, Susan E. Engel, Fire & Police Pension Association of Colorado, Enrique Hernandez Jr., Donald M. James, Michael J. Loughlin, Richard D. McCormick, Mackey J. McDonald, Cynthia H. Milligan, Nicholas G. Moore, Federico F. Pena, James H. Quigley, Philip J. Quigley, Howard V. Richardson, Judith M. Runstad, Stephen W. Sanger, John R. Shrewsberry, Timothy J. Sloan, John G. Stumpf, Susan G. Swenson, The City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System, Carrie L. Tolstedt, Suzanne M. Vautrinot and Wells Fargo & Company answering brief due 09/14/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11683730] (RT) [Entered: 05/07/2020 12:25 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Fire & Police Pension Associat, et al v. Wells Fargo & Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MACKEY J. MCDONALD
Represented By: John F. Cove Jr.
Represented By: Emily V. Griffen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CYNTHIA H. MILLIGAN
Represented By: John F. Cove Jr.
Represented By: Emily V. Griffen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN D. BAKER II
Represented By: John F. Cove Jr.
Represented By: Emily V. Griffen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ELAINE L. CHAO
Represented By: John F. Cove Jr.
Represented By: Emily V. Griffen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN S. CHEN
Represented By: John F. Cove Jr.
Represented By: Emily V. Griffen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NICHOLAS G. MOORE
Represented By: John F. Cove Jr.
Represented By: Emily V. Griffen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAMES H. QUIGLEY
Represented By: John F. Cove Jr.
Represented By: Emily V. Griffen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SUSAN G. SWENSON
Represented By: John F. Cove Jr.
Represented By: Emily V. Griffen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN G. STUMPF
Represented By: Richard Strassberg
Represented By: Daniel Prugh Roeser Esquire
Represented By: Lloyd Winawer
Represented By: Nicholas A. Reider
Represented By: Grant Fondo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SUZANNE M. VAUTRINOT
Represented By: John F. Cove Jr.
Represented By: Emily V. Griffen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PHILIP J. QUIGLEY
Represented By: John F. Cove Jr.
Represented By: Emily V. Griffen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DONALD M. JAMES
Represented By: John F. Cove Jr.
Represented By: Emily V. Griffen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ENRIQUE HERNANDEZ, Jr.
Represented By: John F. Cove Jr.
Represented By: Emily V. Griffen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL J. LOUGHLIN
Represented By: Cristina C. Arguedas
Represented By: Ted W. Cassman Esquire
Represented By: Laurel Headley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FEDERICO F. PENA
Represented By: John F. Cove Jr.
Represented By: Emily V. Griffen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN R. SHREWSBERRY
Represented By: Miles Ehrlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WELLS FARGO & COMPANY
Represented By: Sverker Kristoffer Hogberg
Represented By: Brendan Peter Cullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JUDITH M. RUNSTAD
Represented By: John F. Cove Jr.
Represented By: Emily V. Griffen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SUSAN E. ENGEL
Represented By: John F. Cove Jr.
Represented By: Emily V. Griffen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LLOYD H. DEAN
Represented By: John F. Cove Jr.
Represented By: Emily V. Griffen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RICHARD D. MCCORMICK
Represented By: John F. Cove Jr.
Represented By: Emily V. Griffen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HOWARD V. RICHARDSON
Represented By: John F. Cove Jr.
Represented By: Emily V. Griffen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TIMOTHY J. SLOAN
Represented By: Josh Cohen
Represented By: Nanci L. Clarence
Represented By: Adam Shearer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CARRIE L. TOLSTEDT
Represented By: Brian P. Hagerty
Represented By: Enu Mainigi
Represented By: Jeffrey Faucette
Represented By: Jennifer Gourley Wicht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ELIZABETH A. DUKE
Represented By: John F. Cove Jr.
Represented By: Emily V. Griffen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STEPHEN W. SANGER
Represented By: John F. Cove Jr.
Represented By: Emily V. Griffen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: CATHY LEBENDIG
Represented By: Barry Himmelstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: THE CITY OF BIRMINGHAM RETIREMENT AND RELIEF SYSTEM
Represented By: Maya Saxena
Represented By: Joseph Edward White III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: FIRE & POLICE PENSION ASSOCIATION OF COLORADO
Represented By: Katherine C. Lubin
Represented By: Richard M. Heimann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: In re: WELLS FARGO & COMPANY SHAREHOLDER DERIVATIVE LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?