B.P., et al v. Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., et al
Defendant: RAMESH BALWANI
Plaintiff / Appellee: S.L., B.P., on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated, R.G., A.R., B.B., individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated, S.J. and D.L, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated
Defendant / Appellant: WALGREENS ARIZONA DRUG COMPANY and WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE, INC.
Case Number: 20-15976
Filed: May 20, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2020 Filing 14 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [11740399] [20-15974, 20-15976] (CL) [Entered: 07/01/2020 09:02 PM]
June 23, 2020 Filing 13 Added Attorney(s) Gretchen Freeman Cappio for party(s) Appellee S.L., Appellee S.J., Appellee A.R., Appellee B.B., Appellee B.P., Appellee R.G. and Appellee D.L, in cases 20-15974 and 20-15976. [11730764] [20-15974, 20-15976] (QDL) [Entered: 06/23/2020 01:07 PM]
June 23, 2020 Filing 12 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Gretchen Freeman Cappio (Keller Rohrback L.L.P., 1201 Third Avenue, Suite 3200, Seattle, WA 98101) for Appellees A.R., B.B., B.P., D.L, R.G., S.J. and S.L. in 20-15974, 20-15976. Date of service: 06/23/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11730658] [20-15974, 20-15976] (Cappio, Gretchen) [Entered: 06/23/2020 12:01 PM]
June 19, 2020 Filing 11 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LBS): Appellants unopposed motions (Docket Entry No. [ # 11716630-1 ] in No. 20-15974 and Docket Entry No. [ # 6 ] in No. 20-15976) to consolidate are granted. Nos. 20-15974 and 20-15976 are consolidated. The opening briefs are due August 28, 2020. The consolidated answering brief is due September 28, 2020. The optional reply briefs are due within 21 days after service of the consolidated answering brief. All parties on a side are encouraged to join in a single brief to the extent practicable. See Circuit Advisory Committee Note to 9th Cir. R. 32-2. Appellants requests (included in Docket Entry No. [ # 11716630-1 ] in No. 20-15974 and Docket Entry No. [ # 6 ] in No. 20-15976) to amend the caption are denied. [11728059] [20-15974, 20-15976] (JMR) [Entered: 06/19/2020 04:02 PM]
June 18, 2020 Filing 10 Filed (ECF) Appellants Walgreens Arizona Drug Company and Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. Correspondence: Appellant's Notice Re: Transcripts. Date of service: 06/18/2020 [11726908] [20-15976] (McCall, Kara) [Entered: 06/18/2020 08:01 PM]
June 11, 2020 Filing 9 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 06/23/2020, 11:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11719062] (CL) [Entered: 06/11/2020 02:31 PM]
June 9, 2020 Filing 8 Added Attorney(s) Melissa Gardner for party(s) Appellee S.L. Appellee S.J. Appellee A.R. Appellee B.B. Appellee B.P. Appellee R.G. Appellee D.L, in case 20-15976. [11716548] (QDL) [Entered: 06/09/2020 04:24 PM]
June 9, 2020 Filing 7 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Melissa Ann Gardner (Lieff, Cabraser, Heimann & Bernstein, LLP, 275 Battery Street, 29th Floor, San Francisco, CA 94111-3339) for Appellees A.R., B.B., B.P., D.L, R.G., S.J. and S.L.. Date of service: 06/09/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11716490] [20-15976] (Gardner, Melissa) [Entered: 06/09/2020 04:07 PM]
June 9, 2020 Filing 6 Filed (ECF) Appellants Walgreens Arizona Drug Company and Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. Motion to consolidate cases Nos. 20-15974 & 20-15976. Date of service: 06/09/2020. [11716073] [20-15976] (McCall, Kara) [Entered: 06/09/2020 01:40 PM]
May 27, 2020 Filing 5 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 05/27/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11703173]. [20-15976] (AD) [Entered: 05/27/2020 06:44 PM]
May 27, 2020 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) Appellants Walgreens Arizona Drug Company and Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 05/27/2020. [11702489] [20-15976] --[COURT UPDATE: Replaced mediation questionnaire (redacted email address). 5/28/2020 by TYL] (McCall, Kara) [Entered: 05/27/2020 01:01 PM]
May 21, 2020 Filing 4 Received notification from District Court re: payment of docket fee. Amount Paid: USD 505.00. Date paid: 05/20/2020. [11702495] (RT) [Entered: 05/27/2020 01:04 PM]
May 20, 2020 Filing 2 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Walgreens Arizona Drug Company and Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire due on 05/27/2020. Transcript ordered by 06/18/2020. Transcript due 07/20/2020. Appellants Walgreens Arizona Drug Company and Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. opening brief due 08/28/2020. Appellees A.R., B.B., B.P., D.L, R.G., S.J. and S.L. answering brief due 09/28/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11697132] (RT) [Entered: 05/20/2020 03:16 PM]
May 19, 2020 Filing 1 Filed order (JACQUELINE H. NGUYEN and DANIEL PAUL COLLINS, Circuit Judges) in case no. 20-80058 on 5-19-2020: Petitioners motion for leave to file a reply in support of the petition for permission to appeal (Docket Entry No. 3) is granted. The reply has been filed. The court, in its discretion, grants the petition for permission to appeal the district courts order granting class action certification. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(f); Chamberlan v. Ford Motor Co., 402 F.3d 952 (9th Cir. 2005). Within 14 days after the date of this order, petitioner shall perfect the appeal in accordance with Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 5(d). The Clerk shall publicly file the answer (Docket Entry No. 2-2). Respondents Motion for Under Seal Filing of portions of their answer (Docket Entry No. 2-1) is denied as moot. [11697123] (RT) [Entered: 05/20/2020 03:14 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: B.P., et al v. Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: S.L.
Represented By: Laurence David King Esquire
Represented By: Hart L. Robinovitch
Represented By: Thomas David Copley
Represented By: Roger N. Heller
Represented By: Michael Sobol Esquire
Represented By: Tanya Korkhov Esquire
Represented By: Mark Dudley Samson
Represented By: Linda Marie Fong
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Melissa Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: B.P., on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated
Represented By: Thomas David Copley
Represented By: Roger N. Heller
Represented By: Michael Sobol Esquire
Represented By: Mark Dudley Samson
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Melissa Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: R.G.
Represented By: Thomas David Copley
Represented By: Roger N. Heller
Represented By: Michael Sobol Esquire
Represented By: Tanya Korkhov Esquire
Represented By: Mark Dudley Samson
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Melissa Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: A.R.
Represented By: Thomas David Copley
Represented By: Roger N. Heller
Represented By: Michael Sobol Esquire
Represented By: Tanya Korkhov Esquire
Represented By: Mark Dudley Samson
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Melissa Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: B.B., individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By: Laurence David King Esquire
Represented By: Hart L. Robinovitch
Represented By: Thomas David Copley
Represented By: Roger N. Heller
Represented By: Michael Sobol Esquire
Represented By: Tanya Korkhov Esquire
Represented By: Mark Dudley Samson
Represented By: Linda Marie Fong
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Melissa Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: S.J.
Represented By: Thomas David Copley
Represented By: Roger N. Heller
Represented By: Michael Sobol Esquire
Represented By: Tanya Korkhov Esquire
Represented By: Mark Dudley Samson
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Melissa Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: D.L, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated
Represented By: Thomas David Copley
Represented By: Roger N. Heller
Represented By: Michael Sobol Esquire
Represented By: Tanya Korkhov Esquire
Represented By: Mark Dudley Samson
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Melissa Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAMESH BALWANI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: WALGREENS ARIZONA DRUG COMPANY
Represented By: David Ryan Carpenter
Represented By: Kara Lynn McCall
Represented By: Lawrence Fogel
Represented By: Kristen R. Seeger
Represented By: Robert N. Hochman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE, INC.
Represented By: David Ryan Carpenter
Represented By: Kara Lynn McCall
Represented By: Lawrence Fogel
Represented By: Kristen R. Seeger
Represented By: Robert N. Hochman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?