Christopher Henson v. Corizon Health, Inc., et al
Defendant: STEWART, Unknown; John Doe Stewart, M.D. and JOSEPH PROFIRI, Director of Arizona Department of Corrections
Defendant / Appellee: RODNEY STEWART, M.D., CENTURION OF ARIZONA LLC, TRINA RANDALL, Assistant Facility Health Administrator, PHYLLIS RANEY, ADON, THOMAS LUTZ, Medical Director, ADC During 2004-2008, TRACY WILLIAMS, Office of Publication Review, DAVID SHINN, Director, Director of ADC, CHARLES L. RYAN, VANESSA HEADSTREAM, ELIZABETH PONTIOUS, RN, DIANE . MILLER, Supervisor, Office of Publication Review, CORIZON HEALTH, INC., DOROTHY IGWE, N.P., DAVID ROBERTSON, M.D. and ADAM PERKINS, F.H.A.
Plaintiff / Appellant: CHRISTOPHER JAMES HENSON
Case Number: 20-15986
Filed: May 21, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2020 Filing 6 CLERK ORDER FILED (Deputy Clerk CKP) Prisoner completed authorization fee order. [11746089] (CKP) [Entered: 07/08/2020 01:33 PM]
July 6, 2020 Filing 5 Received PLRA authorization response from appellant. Dated 07/03/2020. [11743703] (NAC) [Entered: 07/07/2020 07:27 AM]
June 29, 2020 Filing 4 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CO): On May 29, 2020, this court ordered appellant to complete and file with this court the enclosed authorization form. To date, appellant has not complied with the courts May 29, 2020 order. Although appellants forma pauperis status continues in this court, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1) and (2), incarcerated appellants proceeding in forma pauperis must pay the full amount of the filing and docketing fees when funds are available in appellants account. Within 21 days after the date of this order, appellant shall sign and file with this court the enclosed authorization form, which directs the prison officials at appellants institution to assess, collect, and forward to the court the $505.00 filing and docketing fees for this appeal on a monthly basis whenever funds exist in appellants trust fund account. These fees will continue to be collected regardless of the date or manner of disposition of this appeal. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2) and (e)(2). Appellant is not responsible for payment when the funds in appellants prison trust account total less than $10.00, but payments must resume when additional deposits are made or funds are otherwise available. If appellant fails to comply with this order, the appeal will be dismissed by the Clerk. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. [11736767] (CKP) [Entered: 06/29/2020 02:44 PM]
June 1, 2020 Filing 3 Filed original and 0 copies of Appellant Christopher James Henson opening brief of 4 pages (Informal: No). Served on 05/27/2020. [11707047] (KWG) [Entered: 06/01/2020 02:23 PM]
May 29, 2020 Filing 2 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: DA): A review of the district court docket reflects that the notice of appeal filed in the district court on May 18, 2020 challenges the portion of the district courts April 28, 2020 and May 11, 2020 orders denying appellants motion for a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction, and denying reconsideration. The appeal filed May 18, 2020 therefore appears to be a preliminary injunction appeal, and Ninth Circuit Rule 3-3 shall apply. The briefing schedule established on May 21, 2020 is vacated. Briefing shall proceed as follows: appellants opening brief is due June 24, 2020; appellees answering brief is due July 22, 2020; and appellants optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. The appeal and any motions pending at the time briefing is completed shall be referred to the next available motions panel for disposition. No streamlined extensions of time will be approved. See 9th Cir. R. 31-2.2(a)(3). Any request for an extension of time to file a brief must be made by written motion under Ninth Circuit Rule 31-2.2(b). A review of the district court docket reflects that appellant was permitted to proceed in forma pauperis in the district court, and that such permission has not been revoked to date. Consequently, appellant's forma pauperis status continues in this court. Fed. R. App. P. 24(a). Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1) and (2), however, appellant must pay the full amount of the filing and docketing fees for this appeal when funds are available in appellant's account. Consequently, within 21 days after the filing date of this order, appellant shall complete and file with this court the enclosed authorization form, which directs the prison officials at appellant's institution to assess, collect, and forward to the court the $505.00 filing and docketing fees for this appeal on a monthly basis whenever funds exist in appellant's trust fund account. These fees will continue to be collected regardless of the date or manner of disposition of this appeal. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2) and (e)(2). Appellant is not responsible for payment when the funds in appellants prison trust account total less than $10.00, but payments must resume when additional deposits are made or funds are otherwise available. Failure to file timely the opening brief shall result in the automatic dismissal of this appeal by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. The Clerk shall send appellant a prisoner authorization form. [11705326] (CKP) [Entered: 05/29/2020 02:00 PM]
May 21, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Christopher James Henson opening brief due 07/28/2020. Appellees Centurion of Arizona LLC, Corizon Health, Inc., Vanessa Headstream, Dorothy Igwe, Thomas Lutz, Diane. Miller, Adam Perkins, Elizabeth Pontious, Trina Randall, Phyllis Raney, David Robertson, Charles L. Ryan, David Shinn, Director, Rodney Stewart and Tracy Williams answering brief due 08/28/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11698256] (RT) [Entered: 05/21/2020 02:59 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Christopher Henson v. Corizon Health, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RODNEY STEWART, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CENTURION OF ARIZONA LLC
Represented By: Sarah Lynn Barnes Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TRINA RANDALL, Assistant Facility Health Administrator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PHYLLIS RANEY, ADON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THOMAS LUTZ, Medical Director, ADC During 2004-2008
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TRACY WILLIAMS, Office of Publication Review
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID SHINN, Director, Director of ADC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHARLES L. RYAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: VANESSA HEADSTREAM
Represented By: Rita Bustos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ELIZABETH PONTIOUS, RN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DIANE . MILLER, Supervisor, Office of Publication Review
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CORIZON HEALTH, INC.
Represented By: Rita Bustos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DOROTHY IGWE, N.P.
Represented By: Sarah Lynn Barnes Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID ROBERTSON, M.D.
Represented By: Rita Bustos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ADAM PERKINS, F.H.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEWART, Unknown; John Doe Stewart, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH PROFIRI, Director of Arizona Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHRISTOPHER JAMES HENSON
Represented By: Christopher James Henson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?