SFR Investments Pool I, LLC v. IRS, et al
Plaintiff: ALESSI & KOENIG, LLC
Defendant: BANK OF AMERICA, NA and UNITED STATES INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Cross Claimant: SFR INVESTMENTS POOL 1, LLC
Case Number: 20-15989
Filed: May 22, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2020 Filing 14 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN FurtherConference, 07/23/2020, 1:00 p.m., Pacific Time. See order for details. [11747466] (VS) [Entered: 07/09/2020 01:04 PM]
June 18, 2020 Filing 13 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 07/09/2020, 11:00 a.m., PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11725878] (VS) [Entered: 06/18/2020 10:16 AM]
June 9, 2020 Filing 12 Terminated Darren T. Brenner for Bank of America, NA in 20-15989 (due to incorrect ECF contact information) [11716563] (RY) [Entered: 06/09/2020 04:25 PM]
June 4, 2020 Filing 11 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 06/04/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11711857]. [20-15989] (AD) [Entered: 06/04/2020 06:44 PM]
June 4, 2020 Filing 10 Filed (ECF) Appellant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 06/04/2020. [11711659] [20-15989] (Gilbert, Jacqueline) [Entered: 06/04/2020 04:21 PM]
June 4, 2020 Filing 9 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The court of appeals' records do not indicate that appellant has filed a mediation questionnaire in accordance with Cir. R. 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing date of this order, appellant shall file a Mediation Questionnaire or dismiss the appeal voluntarily. [11711388] (LW) [Entered: 06/04/2020 02:42 PM]
June 1, 2020 Filing 8 Added Attorney(s) Richard Aaron Chastain for party(s) Appellee Bank of America, NA, in case 20-15989. [11706103] (NAC) [Entered: 06/01/2020 07:01 AM]
June 1, 2020 Filing 7 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Richard Aaron Chastain (Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP, One Federal Place, 1819 Fifth Avenue North, Birmingham, Alabama 35203) for Appellee Bank of America, NA. Date of service: 06/01/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11706081] [20-15989] (Chastain, Richard) [Entered: 06/01/2020 06:29 AM]
May 29, 2020 Filing 6 Added Attorney(s) Stephen Colmery Parsley for party(s) Appellee Bank of America, NA, in case 20-15989. [11705260] (NAC) [Entered: 05/29/2020 01:33 PM]
May 29, 2020 Filing 5 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Stephen Colmery Parsley (Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP, One Federal Place, 1819 5th Avenue North, Birmingham, AL 35203) for Appellee Bank of America, NA. Date of service: 05/29/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11705257] [20-15989] (Parsley, Stephen) [Entered: 05/29/2020 01:31 PM]
May 29, 2020 Filing 4 Added Attorney(s) Karen G. Gregory for party(s) Appellee IRS, in case 20-15989. [11704668] (NAC) [Entered: 05/29/2020 08:07 AM]
May 29, 2020 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Karen Grace Gregory (U.S. Department of Justice, Tax Division, Appellate Section, P.O. Box 502, Washington, D.C. 20044) for Appellee IRS. Date of service: 05/29/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11704665] [20-15989] (Gregory, Karen) [Entered: 05/29/2020 08:03 AM]
May 26, 2020 Filing 2 Received copy of amended notice of appeal from district court. [11700373] (NAC) [Entered: 05/26/2020 10:00 AM]
May 22, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC Mediation Questionnaire due on 05/29/2020. Transcript ordered by 06/17/2020. Transcript due 07/17/2020. Appellant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC opening brief due 08/26/2020. Appellees Bank of America, NA and United States Internal Revenue Service answering brief due 09/25/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11698894] (JBS) [Entered: 05/22/2020 09:43 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: SFR Investments Pool I, LLC v. IRS, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALESSI & KOENIG, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: SFR INVESTMENTS POOL 1, LLC
Represented By: Karen Hanks
Represented By: Diana S. Ebron
Represented By: Jacqueline A. Gilbert Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANK OF AMERICA, NA
Represented By: Darren T. Brenner
Represented By: Donna M. Wittig
Represented By: Rex D. Garner
Represented By: Jamie Combs
Represented By: Stephen Colmery Parsley Esquire
Represented By: Richard Aaron Chastain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Represented By: Holly Ann Vance
Represented By: Boris Kukso
Represented By: Karen G. Gregory Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?