Matthew Dennis v. Scott Kernan, et al
Defendant / Appellee: Y. MANSOUR, SCOTT KERNAN, B. LEE, A. ENENMOH, O. BEREGOVSKAYA, R. GILL, DAVE DAVEY, Warden, RALPH DIAZ, CDCR Secretary, in his official capacity, R. LANKFORD, D. MENDIVIL, S. ABDUR-RAHMAN, J. CLARK KELSO, J. WINDSOR, J. LEWIS, KHOUNG PHUI, Dr., C. MCCABE, D. SMITH and MARTHA MAYS, a Nurse Practitioner
Plaintiff / Appellant: MATTHEW DENNIS
Case Number: 20-16392
Filed: July 20, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
January 28, 2021 MATTHEW DENNIS V. SCOTT KERNAN

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Filing 13 Filed order (DIARMUID F. O'SCANNLAIN and MORGAN B. CHRISTEN) : Appellants motions for appointment of counsel (Docket Entry No. [ # 9 ] and [ # 12 ] ) are denied. No motions for reconsideration, clarification, or modification of this denial shall be filed or entertained. The Clerk shall file the opening brief received on August 13, 2020 (Docket Entry No. [ # 10 ] ). The answering brief is due October 21, 2020, and the optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. The appeal and any motions pending at the time briefing is completed will be referred to the next available motions panel for disposition. No streamlined extensions of time will be approved. See 9th Cir. R. 31-2.2(a)(3). Any request for an extension of time to file a brief must be made by written motion under Ninth Circuit Rule 31-2.2(b). [11828316] (RT) [Entered: 09/17/2020 04:41 PM]
August 21, 2020 Filing 12 Filed Appellant Matthew Dennis supplemental motion to appoint pro bono counsel. Deficiencies: None. [11798159] (NAC) [Entered: 08/21/2020 01:46 PM]
August 21, 2020 Filing 11 Received Appellant Matthew Dennis miscellaneous notice. [11798157] (NAC) [Entered: 08/21/2020 01:45 PM]
August 13, 2020 Filing 10 Received original and 0 copies of Appellant Matthew Dennis opening brief of 17 pages (Informal: No). Served on 08/09/2020. Major deficiency: briefing is stayed (motion to appoint counsel is pending). [11789556] (LA) [Entered: 08/14/2020 11:59 AM]
August 13, 2020 Filing 9 Filed Appellant Matthew Dennis motion to appoint pro bono counsel. Deficiencies: None [11788042] (NAC) [Entered: 08/13/2020 01:46 PM]
August 10, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK ORDER FILED (Deputy Clerk CKP) Prisoner completed authorization fee order. [11783369] (CKP) [Entered: 08/10/2020 02:08 PM]
August 6, 2020 Filing 7 Received PLRA authorization response from appellant. Dated 08/02/2020. [11782217] (NAC) [Entered: 08/10/2020 12:43 AM]
July 31, 2020 Filing 6 Attorney Robert S. Rogoyski substituted by Attorney Norman Morrison IV, in 20-16392. [11773868] (HH) [Entered: 07/31/2020 05:01 PM]
July 31, 2020 Filing 5 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Norman D. Morrison (California Attorney General's Office, Department of Justice, 2550 Mariposa Mall, Room 5090, Fresno, CA 93721) for Appellees Ralph Diaz, Martha Mays and Khoung Phui. Substitution for Attorney Robert S. Rogoyski, Esquire for Appellees Ralph Diaz, Martha Mays and Khoung Phui. Date of service: 07/31/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11773861] [20-16392] (Morrison, Norman) [Entered: 07/31/2020 04:58 PM]
July 30, 2020 Filing 4 Received Appellant Matthew Dennis notice regarding office of the Clerk's notifications. [11772020] (NAC) [Entered: 07/30/2020 01:22 PM]
July 30, 2020 Filing 3 Received Appellant Matthew Dennis notice regarding Petitioner's listings, case information, corrections, and patient information. [11772012] (NAC) [Entered: 07/30/2020 01:19 PM]
July 27, 2020 Filing 2 Filed order (Appellate Commissioner): The June 23, 2020 district court order challenged in this appeal dismissed several claims and defendants, and denied appellants motion for a preliminary injunction. The only portion of the June 23, 2020 order that is appealable now is the portion of the order denying preliminary injunctive relief. See 28 U.S.C. 1292(a)(1); see also 28 U.S.C. 1291. Therefore, the scope of this appeal is limited to a review of that portion of the district courts June 23, 2020 order denying preliminary injunctive relief. Ninth Circuit Rule 3-3 applies to this preliminary injunction appeal. Appellants opening brief is due August 20, 2020; appellees answering brief is due September 17, 2020; and appellants optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. The appeal and any motions pending at the time briefing is completed will be referred to the next available motions panel for disposition. No streamlined extensions of time will be approved. See 9th Cir. R. 31-2.2(a)(3). Any request for an extension of time to file a brief must be made by written motion under Ninth Circuit Rule 31-2.2(b). A review of the district court docket reflects that appellant was permitted to proceed in forma pauperis in the district court, and that such permission has not been revoked to date. Consequently, appellants in forma pauperis status continues in this court. Fed. R. App. P. 24(a). Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1) and (2), however, appellant must pay the full amount of the filing and docketing fees for this appeal when funds are available in appellants account. Consequently, within 21 days after the filing date of this order, appellant shall complete and file with this court the enclosed authorization form, which directs the prison officials at appellant's institution to assess, collect, and forward to the court the $505.00 filing and docketing fees for this appeal on a monthly basis whenever funds exist in appellants trust fund account. These fees will continue to be collected regardless of the date or manner of disposition of this appeal. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2) and (e)(2). Appellant is not responsible for payment when the funds in appellants prison trust account total less than $10.00, but payments must resume when additional deposits are made or funds are otherwise available. Failure to file timely the opening brief will result in the automatic dismissal of this appeal by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. The Clerk shall send appellant a prisoner authorization form. (Pro Se) [11767777] (CKP) [Entered: 07/27/2020 03:18 PM]
July 20, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT . SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: to be set. Preliminary Injunction Appeal. C.R. 3-3. [11758852] (RT) [Entered: 07/20/2020 01:54 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Matthew Dennis v. Scott Kernan, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Y. MANSOUR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SCOTT KERNAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: B. LEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: A. ENENMOH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: O. BEREGOVSKAYA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: R. GILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVE DAVEY, Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RALPH DIAZ, CDCR Secretary, in his official capacity
Represented By: Robert S. Rogoyski Esquire
Represented By: Norman Morrison IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: R. LANKFORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: D. MENDIVIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: S. ABDUR-RAHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: J. CLARK KELSO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: J. WINDSOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: J. LEWIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KHOUNG PHUI, Dr.
Represented By: Robert S. Rogoyski Esquire
Represented By: Norman Morrison IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: C. MCCABE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: D. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARTHA MAYS, a Nurse Practitioner
Represented By: Robert S. Rogoyski Esquire
Represented By: Norman Morrison IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MATTHEW DENNIS
Represented By: Matthew Dennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?