Latwahn McElroy v. Gomez, et al
Defendant / Appellee: GOMEZ, Corrections Officer, LUNA, Building 5 Floor Officer, DOE, NKSP Physician, CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS AND REHABILITATION and BJORK, Facility Seargent
Plaintiff / Appellant: LATWAHN MCELROY
Case Number: 20-16453
Filed: July 29, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 3 MANDATE ISSUED. (BGS, MMM and DAB) [11820563] (CW) [Entered: 09/11/2020 11:47 AM]
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 Filed order (BARRY G. SILVERMAN, M. MARGARET MCKEOWN and DANIEL A. BRESS) A review of the record demonstrates that this court lacks jurisdiction over this appeal because the June 18, 2020 and July 16, 2020 orders challenged in the appeal are not final or appealable. See 28 U.S.C. 1291; Religious Tech. Ctr. v. Scott, 869 F.2d 1306 (9th Cir. 1989) (denial of temporary restraining order is appealable only if the denial is tantamount to the denial of a preliminary injunction); Wilborn v. Escalderon, 789 F.2d 1328, 1330 (9th Cir. 1986) (denial of appointment of counsel in civil case is not appealable). Appellants notice of appeal states that appellant also seeks review of the rescission of appellants in forma pauperis status. However, a review of the district court docket and the July 16, 2020 district court order reflects that appellant is proceeding in forma pauperis in the above referenced district court action, E.D. Cal. No. 1:20-cv-00658-NONE-SAB, and that to date appellants in forma pauperis status for that action has not been revoked. Consequently, this appeal is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. DISMISSED. [11796384] (OC) [Entered: 08/20/2020 11:48 AM]
July 29, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCE OF PRO SE APPELLANT AND NO APPEARANCE FOR APPELLEES. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Latwahn McElroy opening brief due 09/28/2020. [11770558] (WL) [Entered: 07/29/2020 11:21 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Latwahn McElroy v. Gomez, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GOMEZ, Corrections Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LUNA, Building 5 Floor Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DOE, NKSP Physician
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS AND REHABILITATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BJORK, Facility Seargent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LATWAHN MCELROY
Represented By: Latwahn McElroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?