Bank of America, N.A., et al v. Summit Real Estate Group, Inc., et al
Defendant: NEVADA ASSOCIATION SERVICES, INC. and ESTRELLA II HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION
Plaintiff / Appellee: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., Successor by Merger on behalf of BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP, FKA Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP and FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION
Defendant / Appellant: SUMMIT REAL ESTATE GROUP, INC.
Case Number: 20-16624
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Filing 10 MEDIATION STATUS REPORT DUE - 10/21/2020..The conference previously scheduled for October 16, 2020, is canceled. See order for details [11859082] (VS) [Entered: 10/14/2020 04:53 PM]
October 6, 2020 Filing 9 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 10/16/2020, 09:00 a.m., Pacific Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows :Appellant's opening brief due 11/19/2020. Appellees' answering brief due 12/21/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due within 21 days afer service of the answering brief. See order for details. [11848709] (VS) [Entered: 10/06/2020 09:39 AM]
September 22, 2020 Filing 8 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 10/06/2020, 09:00 a.m., PACIFIC Time. See order for instructions and details. [11832670] (VS) [Entered: 09/22/2020 11:43 AM]
September 17, 2020 Filing 7 Added Attorney(s) Richard Aaron Chastain, Stephen Colmery Parsley for party(s) Appellee FNMA/Fannie Mae Appellee Bank of America, N.A., in case 20-16624. [11828288] (RR) [Entered: 09/17/2020 04:33 PM]
September 17, 2020 Filing 6 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Richard Aaron Chastain (Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP, One Federal Place, 1819 Fifth Ave. N., Birmingham, AL 35203) for Appellees Bank of America, N.A. and FNMA/Fannie Mae. Date of service: 09/17/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11827794] [20-16624] (Chastain, Richard) [Entered: 09/17/2020 01:32 PM]
September 17, 2020 Filing 5 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Stephen Colmery Parsley (Bradley Arant Boult Cummings, LLP, 1819 Fifth Ave. N., Birmingham, AL 35203) for Appellees Bank of America, N.A. and FNMA/Fannie Mae. Date of service: 09/17/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11827725] [20-16624] (Parsley, Stephen) [Entered: 09/17/2020 12:47 PM]
September 4, 2020 Filing 4 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 09/17/2020, 09:00 a.m., PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11813524] (VS) [Entered: 09/04/2020 10:02 AM]
August 31, 2020 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 08/31/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11808653]. [20-16624] (AD) [Entered: 08/31/2020 06:44 PM]
August 31, 2020 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellant Summit Real Estate Group, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 08/31/2020. [11808427] [20-16624] (Wright, John) [Entered: 08/31/2020 04:12 PM]
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Summit Real Estate Group, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire due on 08/31/2020. Appellant Summit Real Estate Group, Inc. opening brief due 10/20/2020. Appellees Bank of America, N.A. and Federal National Mortgage Association answering brief due 11/19/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11799706] (JBS) [Entered: 08/24/2020 10:23 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Bank of America, N.A., et al v. Summit Real Estate Group, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., Successor by Merger on behalf of BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP, FKA Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP
Represented By: Holly Walker
Represented By: Melanie Dawn Morgan Esquire
Represented By: Ariel Edward Stern Esquire
Represented By: Richard Aaron Chastain
Represented By: Stephen Colmery Parsley Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Holly Walker
Represented By: Melanie Dawn Morgan Esquire
Represented By: Ariel Edward Stern Esquire
Represented By: Richard Aaron Chastain
Represented By: Stephen Colmery Parsley Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: SUMMIT REAL ESTATE GROUP, INC.
Represented By: John Henry Wright Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEVADA ASSOCIATION SERVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESTRELLA II HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?