In re: Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs v. Toshiba Corporation, et al
Petitioner / Appellant: STEVEN HARRELSON, WALKER, WARREN & WATKINS, LLC, DONNA MUCCINO, SCOTT A. CALDWELL, as administrator of the Estate of Barbara Caldwell, ANTHONY GIANASCA, DONALD OELZE, MINA ASHKANNEJHAD, individually and/or as Administrator of the Estate of the Late R. Deryl Edwards, Jr., JEFF CRAIG, SUSAN LAPAGE, WARREN CUTLIP, FELICIA BLACKWOOD and GEORGE MAGLARAS
Defendant / Appellee: TOSHIBA AMERICA CONSUMER PRODUCTS, LLC, PANASONIC CORPORATION OF NORTH AMERICA, SAMSUNG SDI (MALAYSIA) SDN BHD, HITACHI DISPLAYS, LTD., AKA Japan Display, Inc., THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, INC., PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION, SHENZEN SAMSUNG SDI CO., LTD., TOSHIBA CORPORATION, SAMSUNG SDI AMERICA, INC., TIANJIN SAMSUNG SDI CO., LTD., THOMSON SA, SAMSUNG SDI CO., LTD., HITACHI ELECTRONIC DEVICES (USA), INC., PANASONIC CORPORATION, FKA Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. ("MEI"), is a Japanese entity, TOSHIBA AMERICA INFORMATION SYSTEMS, INC., HITACHI ASIA, LTD., SAMSUNG SDI MEXICO S.A. DE C.V., PHILIPS DO BRASIL LTDA., TOSHIBA AMERICA ELECTRONIC COMPONENTS, INC., PHILIPS KONINKLIJKE N.V., SAMSUNG SDI BRASIL LTDA., PHILIPS TAIWAN LIMITED, HITACHI, LTD., MT PICTURE DISPLAY CO., LTD, TOSHIBA AMERICA, INC., HITACHI AMERICA, LTD and TECHNOLOGIES DISPLAYS AMERICAS LLC
Plaintiff / Appellee: INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS
Not Classified By Court: In re: CATHODE RAY TUBE (CRT) ANTITRUST LITIGATION
Case Number: 20-16691
Filed: September 1, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Filing 13 Added Attorney Donald Arthur Wall for Appellee Technologies Displays Americas LLC, in case 20-16691. [11853249] (HH) [Entered: 10/08/2020 04:54 PM]
October 8, 2020 Filing 12 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Donald A. Wall (Squire Patton Boggs LLP, 1 E. Washington Street, Suite 2700, Phoenix, AZ 85004) for Appellee Technologies Displays Americas LLC. Date of service: 10/08/2020. (Party was previously proceeding pro se.) [11853184] [20-16691] (Wall, Donald) [Entered: 10/08/2020 04:42 PM]
October 8, 2020 Filing 11 Entered appearance of Appellee Technologies Displays Americas LLC. [11852784] (TYL) [Entered: 10/08/2020 03:08 PM]
October 2, 2020 Filing 10 Added Attorney(s) Christopher Thomas Micheletti for party(s) Appellee Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, in case 20-16691. [11845342] (NAC) [Entered: 10/02/2020 10:40 AM]
October 2, 2020 Filing 9 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Christopher T. Micheletti (Zelle LLP, 44 Montgomery Street, Suite 3400, San Francisco, California 94104) for Appellee Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. Date of service: 10/02/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11845330] [20-16691] (Micheletti, Christopher) [Entered: 10/02/2020 10:37 AM]
September 28, 2020 Filing 8 Filed (ECF) Appellee Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs reply to response (). Date of service: 09/28/2020. [11840076] [20-16691] (Capurro, Lauren) [Entered: 09/28/2020 07:56 PM]
September 21, 2020 Filing 7 Filed (ECF) Appellants Mina Ashkannejhad, Felicia Blackwood, Scott A. Caldwell, Jeff Craig, Warren Cutlip, Anthony Gianasca, Steven Harrelson, Susan LaPage, George Maglaras, Donna Muccino, Donald Oelze and Walker, Warren & Watkins, LLC response opposing motion ([ # 3 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 3 ] Motion (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 09/21/2020. [11831980] [20-16691] (Bonsignore, Robert) [Entered: 09/21/2020 09:16 PM]
September 16, 2020 Filing 6 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: These cases are RELEASED from the Mediation Program. All further inquiries regarding these appeals, including request for extensions of time, should be directed to the Clerk's Office. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [11826398] [20-16686, 20-16691] (VS) [Entered: 09/16/2020 01:41 PM]
September 16, 2020 Filing 5 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 09/15/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11825517]. [20-16691] (AD) [Entered: 09/16/2020 06:44 AM]
September 15, 2020 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) Appellants Mina Ashkannejhad, Felicia Blackwood, Scott A. Caldwell, Jeff Craig, Warren Cutlip, Anthony Gianasca, Steven Harrelson, Susan LaPage, George Maglaras, Donna Muccino, Donald Oelze and Walker, Warren & Watkins, LLC Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 09/15/2020. [11825452] [20-16691] (Bonsignore, Robert) [Entered: 09/15/2020 07:38 PM]
September 11, 2020 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) Appellee Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction. Date of service: 09/11/2020. [11821500] [20-16691] (Capurro, Lauren) [Entered: 09/11/2020 06:53 PM]
September 10, 2020 Filing 2 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The court of appeals' records do not indicate that appellants have filed a mediation questionnaire in accordance with Cir. R. 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing date of this order, appellants shall file a Mediation Questionnaire or dismiss the appeal voluntarily. [11818972] (LW) [Entered: 09/10/2020 11:49 AM]
September 1, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Mina Ashkannejhad, Felicia Blackwood, Scott A. Caldwell, Jeff Craig, Warren Cutlip, Anthony Gianasca, Steven Harrelson, Susan LaPage, George Maglaras, Donna Muccino, Donald Oelze and Walker, Warren & Watkins, LLC Mediation Questionnaire due on 09/08/2020. Transcript ordered by 09/28/2020. Transcript due 10/27/2020. Appellants Mina Ashkannejhad, Felicia Blackwood, Scott A. Caldwell, Jeff Craig, Warren Cutlip, Anthony Gianasca, Steven Harrelson, Susan LaPage, George Maglaras, Donna Muccino, Donald Oelze and Walker, Warren & Watkins, LLC opening brief due 12/07/2020. Appellees Hitachi America, Ltd, Hitachi Asia, Ltd., Hitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi, Ltd., Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, MT Picture Display Co., LTD, Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Philips Electronics North America Corporation, Philips Koninklijke N.V., Philips Taiwan Limited, Philips do Brasil Ltda., Samsung SDI (Malaysia) SDN BHD, Samsung SDI America, Inc., Samsung SDI Brasil Ltda., Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., Samsung SDI Mexico S.A. de C.V., Shenzen Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., Thomson Consumer Electronics, Inc., Thomson SA, Tianjin Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., Toshiba America Consumer Products, LLC, Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba America, Inc. and Toshiba Corporation answering brief due 01/07/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11809925] (RT) [Entered: 09/01/2020 03:54 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: In re: Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs v. Toshiba Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: STEVEN HARRELSON
Represented By: Robert J. Bonsignore Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: WALKER, WARREN & WATKINS, LLC
Represented By: Robert J. Bonsignore Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: DONNA MUCCINO
Represented By: Robert J. Bonsignore Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: SCOTT A. CALDWELL, as administrator of the Estate of Barbara Caldwell
Represented By: Robert J. Bonsignore Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: ANTHONY GIANASCA
Represented By: Robert J. Bonsignore Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: DONALD OELZE
Represented By: Robert J. Bonsignore Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: MINA ASHKANNEJHAD, individually and/or as Administrator of the Estate of the Late R. Deryl Edwards, Jr.
Represented By: Robert J. Bonsignore Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: JEFF CRAIG
Represented By: Robert J. Bonsignore Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: SUSAN LAPAGE
Represented By: Robert J. Bonsignore Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: WARREN CUTLIP
Represented By: Robert J. Bonsignore Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: FELICIA BLACKWOOD
Represented By: Robert J. Bonsignore Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: GEORGE MAGLARAS
Represented By: Robert J. Bonsignore Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TOSHIBA AMERICA CONSUMER PRODUCTS, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Frutig
Represented By: Christopher M. Curran
Represented By: Lucius B. Lau
Represented By: Dana Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PANASONIC CORPORATION OF NORTH AMERICA
Represented By: Molly M. Donovan
Represented By: Kevin B. Goldstein Esquire
Represented By: David Yohai Esquire
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Represented By: Adam C. Hemlock
Represented By: Eva W. Cole
Represented By: Aldo Badini
Represented By: David Yolkut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SAMSUNG SDI (MALAYSIA) SDN BHD
Represented By: John Roberti
Represented By: Andrew Rhys Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HITACHI DISPLAYS, LTD., AKA Japan Display, Inc.
Represented By: James Sigel
Represented By: Eliot A. Adelson Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, INC.
Represented By: Ryan Hurley
Represented By: Kathy Osborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION
Represented By: Erik T. Koons
Represented By: John M. Taladay Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SHENZEN SAMSUNG SDI CO., LTD.
Represented By: John Roberti
Represented By: Andrew Rhys Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TOSHIBA CORPORATION
Represented By: Matthew Frutig
Represented By: Christopher M. Curran
Represented By: Lucius B. Lau
Represented By: Dana Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SAMSUNG SDI AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: John Roberti
Represented By: Andrew Rhys Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TIANJIN SAMSUNG SDI CO., LTD.
Represented By: John Roberti
Represented By: Andrew Rhys Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THOMSON SA
Represented By: Ryan Hurley
Represented By: Kathy Osborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SAMSUNG SDI CO., LTD.
Represented By: John Roberti
Represented By: Andrew Rhys Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HITACHI ELECTRONIC DEVICES (USA), INC.
Represented By: James Sigel
Represented By: Eliot A. Adelson Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PANASONIC CORPORATION, FKA Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. ("MEI"), is a Japanese entity
Represented By: Molly M. Donovan
Represented By: Kevin B. Goldstein Esquire
Represented By: David Yohai Esquire
Represented By: Adam C. Hemlock
Represented By: Eva W. Cole
Represented By: Aldo Badini
Represented By: David Yolkut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TOSHIBA AMERICA INFORMATION SYSTEMS, INC.
Represented By: Matthew Frutig
Represented By: Christopher M. Curran
Represented By: Lucius B. Lau
Represented By: Dana Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HITACHI ASIA, LTD.
Represented By: James Sigel
Represented By: Eliot A. Adelson Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SAMSUNG SDI MEXICO S.A. DE C.V.
Represented By: John Roberti
Represented By: Andrew Rhys Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PHILIPS DO BRASIL LTDA.
Represented By: Erik T. Koons
Represented By: John M. Taladay Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TOSHIBA AMERICA ELECTRONIC COMPONENTS, INC.
Represented By: Matthew Frutig
Represented By: Christopher M. Curran
Represented By: Lucius B. Lau
Represented By: Dana Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PHILIPS KONINKLIJKE N.V.
Represented By: Erik T. Koons
Represented By: John M. Taladay Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SAMSUNG SDI BRASIL LTDA.
Represented By: John Roberti
Represented By: Andrew Rhys Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PHILIPS TAIWAN LIMITED
Represented By: Erik T. Koons
Represented By: John M. Taladay Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HITACHI, LTD.
Represented By: James Sigel
Represented By: Eliot A. Adelson Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MT PICTURE DISPLAY CO., LTD
Represented By: Molly M. Donovan
Represented By: Kevin B. Goldstein Esquire
Represented By: David Yohai Esquire
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Represented By: Adam C. Hemlock
Represented By: Eva W. Cole
Represented By: Aldo Badini
Represented By: David Yolkut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TOSHIBA AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: Matthew Frutig
Represented By: Christopher M. Curran
Represented By: Lucius B. Lau
Represented By: Dana Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HITACHI AMERICA, LTD
Represented By: James Sigel
Represented By: Eliot A. Adelson Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TECHNOLOGIES DISPLAYS AMERICAS LLC
Represented By: Donald Arthur Wall Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS
Represented By: Mario Alioto
Represented By: Sylvie Kern
Represented By: Jennifer S. Rosenberg Esquire
Represented By: Lauren C. Capurro
Represented By: Daniel Edward Birkhaeuser Esquire
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Micheletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: In re: CATHODE RAY TUBE (CRT) ANTITRUST LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?