Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs v. Toshiba Corporation, et al
Petitioner / Appellant: HARRY GARAVANIAN, CHRIS SEUFERT, KERRY MURPHY, JAY ERICKSON, MIKE BRATCHER, D. BRUCE JOHNSON, ROBERT STEPHENSON, TYLER AYRES, JEFF JOHNSON, JOHN HEENAN, HOPE HITCHCOCK, NIKKI CRAWLEY, GARY TALEWSKY and WILLIAM TRENTHAM
Defendant / Appellee: TOSHIBA AMERICA CONSUMER PRODUCTS, LLC, PANASONIC CORPORATION OF NORTH AMERICA, SAMSUNG SDI (MALAYSIA) SDN BHD, HITACHI DISPLAYS, LTD., AKA Japan Display, Inc., THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, INC., PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION, SHENZEN SAMSUNG SDI CO., LTD., TOSHIBA CORPORATION, SAMSUNG SDI AMERICA, INC., TIANJIN SAMSUNG SDI CO., LTD., THOMSON SA, SAMSUNG SDI CO., LTD., HITACHI ELECTRONIC DEVICES (USA), INC., PANASONIC CORPORATION, FKA Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. ("MEI"), is a Japanese entity, TOSHIBA AMERICA INFORMATION SYSTEMS, INC., HITACHI ASIA, LTD., SAMSUNG SDI MEXICO S.A. DE C.V., PHILIPS DO BRASIL LTDA., TOSHIBA AMERICA ELECTRONIC COMPONENTS, INC., PHILIPS KONINKLIJKE N.V., SAMSUNG SDI BRASIL LTDA., PHILIPS TAIWAN LIMITED, HITACHI, LTD., MT PICTURE DISPLAY CO., LTD, TOSHIBA AMERICA, INC., HITACHI AMERICA, LTD and TECHNOLOGIES DISPLAYS AMERICAS LLC
Plaintiff / Appellee: INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS
Not Classified By Court: In re: CATHODE RAY TUBE (CRT) ANTITRUST LITIGATION
Case Number: 20-16699
Filed: September 2, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2022 Filing 87 Supreme Court Case Info Case number: 21-1218 Filed on: 03/04/2022 Cert Petition Action 1: Denied, 06/13/2022 [12469896] [20-15697, 20-15704, 20-16081, 20-16685, 20-16686, 20-16691, 20-16699] (QDL) [Entered: 06/13/2022 01:52 PM]
March 9, 2022 Filing 86 Supreme Court Case Info Case number: 21-1218 Filed on: 03/04/2022 Cert Petition Action 1: Pending [12390903] [20-15697, 20-15704, 20-16081, 20-16685, 20-16686, 20-16691, 20-16699] (RR) [Entered: 03/09/2022 03:54 PM]
January 3, 2022 Filing 85 MANDATE ISSUED.(WAF, RRC and GSK) Costs taxed against Appellants in the amount of $300.90 & in the amount of $390.20. [12328552] [20-16685, 20-16686, 20-16691, 20-16699] (NAC) [Entered: 01/03/2022 07:46 AM]
December 23, 2021 Filing 84 Filed order (WILLIAM A. FLETCHER, RICHARD R. CLIFTON and GARY S. KATZMANN) The panel has unanimously voted to deny Appellants Motion for Rehearing and Motion for Rehearing En Banc (Docket Entry No. [ # 83 ]). Judge Fletcher has voted to deny the motion, and Judge Clifton and Judge Katzmann so recommend. The full court has been advised of the motion for rehearing en banc, and no judge has requested a vote on whether to rehear the matter en banc. Fed. R. App. P. 35. The motion for rehearing and motion for rehearing en banc are DENIED. [12323899] [20-16685, 20-16686, 20-16691, 20-16699] (OC) [Entered: 12/23/2021 10:00 AM]
October 6, 2021 Filing 83 Filed (ECF) Appellants Tyler Ayres, Mike Bratcher, Nikki Crawley, Jay Erickson, Harry Garavanian, John Heenan, Hope Hitchcock, D. Bruce Johnson, Jeff Johnson, Kerry Murphy, Chris Seufert, Robert Stephenson, Gary Talewsky and William Trentham in 20-16699 petition for panel rehearing and petition for rehearing en banc (from 09/22/2021 memorandum). Date of service: 10/06/2021. [12250091] [20-16685, 20-16686, 20-16691, 20-16699] (Crabtree, John) [Entered: 10/06/2021 05:25 PM]
October 6, 2021 Filing 82 Filed (ECF) Appellee Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs in 20-16685, 20-16686, 20-16691, 20-16699 bill of costs (Form 10) in the amount of $390.20 USD. Date of service: 10/06/2021 [12249677] [20-16685, 20-16686, 20-16691, 20-16699] (Capurro, Lauren) [Entered: 10/06/2021 02:47 PM]
October 5, 2021 Filing 81 Filed (ECF) Appellees Samsung SDI (Malaysia) SDN BHD, Samsung SDI America, Inc., Samsung SDI Brasil Ltda., Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., Samsung SDI Mexico S.A. de C.V., Shenzen Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. and Tianjin Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. in 20-16685, 20-16686, 20-16691, 20-16699 bill of costs (Form 10) in the amount of $300.90 USD. Date of service: 10/05/2021 [12248477] [20-16685, 20-16686, 20-16691, 20-16699] (Davies, Andrew Rhys) [Entered: 10/05/2021 04:16 PM]
September 22, 2021 Filing 80 FILED MEMORANDUM DISPOSITION (WILLIAM A. FLETCHER, RICHARD R. CLIFTON and GARY S. KATZMANN) Costs to be taxed against Appellants. AFFIRMED IN PART, DISMISSED IN PART, AND REMANDED FOR FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [12235542] [20-15697, 20-15704, 20-16081, 20-16685, 20-16686, 20-16691, 20-16699] (MM) [Entered: 09/22/2021 10:17 AM]
July 28, 2021 Filing 79 ARGUED AND SUBMITTED TO WILLIAM A. FLETCHER, RICHARD R. CLIFTON and GARY S. KATZMANN. [12185824] [20-16685, 20-16686, 20-16691, 20-16699] (ORW) [Entered: 07/28/2021 02:46 PM]
July 22, 2021 Filing 78 Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice by Attorney Mario Alioto for Appellee Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs in 20-16685, 20-16686, 20-16691, 20-16699. Hearing in San Francisco on 07/28/2021 at 1:00 P.M. (Courtroom: 3). Filer sharing argument time: Yes. (Argument minutes: 7.) Special accommodations: NO. Filer admission status: I certify that I am admitted to practice before this Court. Date of service: 07/22/2021. [12179968] [20-16685, 20-16686, 20-16691, 20-16699] (Alioto, Mario) [Entered: 07/22/2021 11:00 AM]
July 21, 2021 Filing 77 Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice by Attorney Ms. Lauren C. Capurro for Appellee Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs in 20-16685, 20-16686, 20-16691, 20-16699. Hearing in San Francisco on 07/28/2021 at 1:00 P.M. (Courtroom: 3). Filer sharing argument time: Yes. (Argument minutes: 3.) Special accommodations: NO. Filer admission status: I certify that I am admitted to practice before this Court. Date of service: 07/21/2021. [12179438] [20-16685, 20-16686, 20-16691, 20-16699] (Capurro, Lauren) [Entered: 07/21/2021 04:59 PM]
July 21, 2021 Filing 76 Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice by Attorney Mr. Robert J. Bonsignore, Esquire for Appellants Miguel A. Albarran, Mary J. Baucom, Lisa L. Butterbrodt, Eric R. Coggins, Gloria A. Comeaux, Dennis S. Cornett, Valerie G. Deick, Heather J. Gordon, Brendan C. McCann, Jessica M. McIntyre, Dale B. McKenzie, Craig A. Schuler, Jeff Speaect and David N. Watson in 20-16686, Attorney Mr. Robert J. Bonsignore, Esquire for Appellants Scott A. Caldwell, Anthony Gianasca, Warren Cutlip, Mina Ashkannejhad, Jeff Craig, George Maglaras, Steven Harrelson, Donald Oelze, Walker, Warren & Watkins, LLC, Susan LaPage, Donna Muccino and Felicia Blackwood in 20-16691. Hearing in San Francisco on 07/28/2021 at 1:00 P.M. (Courtroom: Courtroom: Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor Rm 307, James R. Browning U.S. Courthouse, San Francisco). Filer sharing argument time: Yes. (Argument minutes: 14.) Special accommodations: NO. Filer admission status: I certify that I am admitted to practice before this Court. Date of service: 07/21/2021. [12179400] [20-16686, 20-16685, 20-16691, 20-16699] (Bonsignore, Robert) [Entered: 07/21/2021 04:38 PM]
July 21, 2021 Filing 75 Filed (ECF) Appellant Tyler Ayres in 20-16699 Correspondence: letter re oral argument. Date of service: 07/21/2021 [12179028] [20-16685, 20-16686, 20-16691, 20-16699] (Scarpulla, Francis) [Entered: 07/21/2021 02:05 PM]
July 21, 2021 Filing 74 Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice by Attorney Mr. John Granville Crabtree, Sr. for Appellants Tyler Ayres, Mike Bratcher, Nikki Crawley, Jay Erickson, Harry Garavanian, John Heenan, Hope Hitchcock, D. Bruce Johnson, Jeff Johnson, Kerry Murphy, Chris Seufert, Robert Stephenson, Gary Talewsky and William Trentham in 20-16699. Hearing in San Francisco on 07/28/2021 at 1:00 P.M. (Courtroom: Courtroom 3). Filer sharing argument time: Yes. (Argument minutes: 6.) Special accommodations: NO. Filer admission status: I certify that I am admitted to practice before this Court. Date of service: 07/21/2021. [12178511] [20-16699, 20-16685, 20-16686, 20-16691] (Crabtree, John) [Entered: 07/21/2021 09:27 AM]
July 20, 2021 Filing 73 Filed (ECF) Appellee Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs in 20-16685, 20-16686, 20-16691, 20-16699 Correspondence: Letter from Mario N. Alioto responding to Appellants' letter re: oral argument. Date of service: 07/20/2021 [12178282] [20-16685, 20-16686, 20-16691, 20-16699] (Capurro, Lauren) [Entered: 07/20/2021 04:50 PM]
July 20, 2021 Filing 72 Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice by Attorney Sofia Arguello for Appellees MT Picture Display Co., LTD, Panasonic Corporation and Panasonic Corporation of North America in 20-16685, Attorney Sofia Arguello for Appellees Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America and MT Picture Display Co., LTD in 20-16686, 20-16691, 20-16699. Hearing in San Francisco on 07/28/2021 at 1:00 P.M. (Courtroom: 3). Filer sharing argument time: Yes. (Argument minutes: 5.) Special accommodations: NO. Filer admission status: I certify that I am admitted to practice before this Court. Date of service: 07/20/2021. [12177782] [20-16685, 20-16686, 20-16691, 20-16699] (Arguello, Sofia) [Entered: 07/20/2021 12:17 PM]
July 20, 2021 Filing 71 Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice by Attorney Mr. Andrew Rhys Davies for Appellees Samsung SDI (Malaysia) SDN BHD, Samsung SDI America, Inc., Samsung SDI Brasil Ltda., Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., Samsung SDI Mexico S.A. de C.V., Shenzen Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. and Tianjin Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. in 20-16685, Attorney Mr. Andrew Rhys Davies for Appellees Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., Samsung SDI America, Inc., Samsung SDI (Malaysia) SDN BHD, Samsung SDI Mexico S.A. de C.V., Samsung SDI Brasil Ltda., Shenzen Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. and Tianjin Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. in 20-16686, 20-16691, 20-16699. Hearing in San Francisco on 07/28/2021 at 1:00 P.M. (Courtroom: Courtroom 3). Filer sharing argument time: Yes. (Argument minutes: 5.) Special accommodations: NO. Filer admission status: I certify that I am admitted to practice before this Court. Date of service: 07/20/2021. [12177769] [20-16685, 20-16686, 20-16691, 20-16699] (Davies, Andrew Rhys) [Entered: 07/20/2021 12:09 PM]
July 20, 2021 Filing 70 Added Attorney(s) Sofia Arguello for party(s) Appellee Panasonic Corporation Appellee Panasonic Corporation of North America Appellee MT Picture Display Co., LTD, in case 20-16691, 20-16685, 20-16699, and 20-16686. [12177211] [20-16685, 20-16686, 20-16691, 20-16699] (NAC) [Entered: 07/20/2021 07:14 AM]
July 19, 2021 Filing 69 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Sofia Roa Arguello (Winston & Strawn LLP, 200 Park Avenue, New York, NY 10166) for Appellees MT Picture Display Co., LTD, Panasonic Corporation and Panasonic Corporation of North America in 20-16685, 20-16686, 20-16691, 20-16699. Date of service: 07/19/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12177167] [20-16685, 20-16686, 20-16691, 20-16699] (Arguello, Sofia) [Entered: 07/19/2021 07:39 PM]
July 19, 2021 Filing 68 Filed (ECF) Appellant Tyler Ayres in 20-16699 Correspondence: Scheduling oral argument. Date of service: 07/19/2021 [12175980] [20-16685, 20-16686, 20-16691, 20-16699] (Scarpulla, Francis) [Entered: 07/19/2021 10:58 AM]
July 16, 2021 Filing 67 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: OC): Oral argument will be held at 1:00 p.m. Pacific Daylight Time on Wednesday, July 28, 2021. All parties, as well as the judges, will appear for argument by video. Each side will have 20 minutes of argument time. [12175284] [20-16685, 20-16686, 20-16691, 20-16699] (OC) [Entered: 07/16/2021 04:29 PM]
July 16, 2021 Filing 66 Notice of Oral Argument on Wednesday, July 28, 2021 - 1:00 P.M. - Courtroom 3 - Scheduled Location: San Francisco CA. The hearing time is the local time zone at the scheduled hearing location. View the Oral Argument Calendar for your case # here . NOTE: Although your case is currently scheduled for oral argument, the panel may decide to submit the case on the briefs instead. See Fed. R. App. P. 34. Absent further order of the court, if the court does determine that oral argument is required in this case, any argument will be held with all attorneys appearing remotely by video or telephone. The court strongly prefers video arguments whenever possible. Travel to a courthouse will not be required. If the panel determines that it will hold oral argument, the Clerk's Office will be in contact with you directly at least two weeks before the set argument date to make any necessary arrangements for remote appearance. Please note however that if you do elect to appear remotely, the court strongly prefers video over telephone appearance. Therefore, if you wish to appear remotely by telephone you will need to file a motion requesting permission to do so. Be sure to review the # GUIDELINES for important information about your hearing, including when to be available (30 minutes before the hearing time) and when and how to submit additional citations (filing electronically as far in advance of the hearing as possible). If you are the specific attorney or self-represented party who will be arguing, use the # ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF HEARING NOTICE filing type in CM/ECF no later than 21 days before Wednesday, July 28, 2021. No form or other attachment is required. If you will not be arguing, do not file an acknowledgment of hearing notice.[12174931]. [20-16685, 20-16686, 20-16691, 20-16699]--[Edited 07/16/2021 by KS] (KS) [Entered: 07/16/2021 02:08 PM]
July 8, 2021 Filing 65 Received 6 paper copies of Reply Brief [ # 60 ] filed by Eleanor Lewis, et al (sent to panel) . [12167010] [20-16685, 20-16686, 20-16691, 20-16699] (SD) [Entered: 07/08/2021 02:42 PM]
July 8, 2021 Filing 64 Received 3 paper copies of further excerpts of record [ # 61 ] in 1 volume(s) filed by Appellants Eleanor Lewis, et al. (sent to panel) [12166530] [20-16685, 20-16686, 20-16691, 20-16699] (LA) [Entered: 07/08/2021 11:48 AM]
July 7, 2021 Filing 63 Received 6 paper copies of Reply Brief [ # 58 ] filed by Miguel A. Albarran; et al. (sent to panel) [12165422] [20-16685, 20-16686, 20-16691, 20-16699] (SD) [Entered: 07/07/2021 02:51 PM]
July 2, 2021 Filing 62 Filed clerk order: The reply brief [ # 60 ] submitted by Eleanor Lewis; et al., is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 6 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: gray. The further excerpts of record [ # 61 ] submitted by Eleanor Lewis; et al., are filed. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 3 copies of the excerpts in paper format securely bound on the left side, with white covers. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [12162044] [20-16685, 20-16686, 20-16691, 20-16699] (SML) [Entered: 07/02/2021 02:57 PM]
July 2, 2021 Filing 61 Submitted (ECF) further excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellant Eleanor Lewis in 20-16685, Appellants Tyler Ayres, Mike Bratcher, Nikki Crawley, Jay Erickson, Harry Garavanian, John Heenan, Hope Hitchcock, D. Bruce Johnson, Jeff Johnson, Kerry Murphy, Chris Seufert, Robert Stephenson, Gary Talewsky and William Trentham in 20-16699. Date of service: 07/02/2021. [12161909] [20-16691, 20-16685, 20-16686, 20-16699] (Crabtree, John) [Entered: 07/02/2021 02:07 PM]
July 2, 2021 Filing 60 Submitted (ECF) Reply Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Eleanor Lewis in 20-16685, Appellants Tyler Ayres, Mike Bratcher, Nikki Crawley, Jay Erickson, Harry Garavanian, John Heenan, Hope Hitchcock, D. Bruce Johnson, Jeff Johnson, Kerry Murphy, Chris Seufert, Robert Stephenson, Gary Talewsky and William Trentham in 20-16699. Date of service: 07/02/2021. [12161894] [20-16691, 20-16685, 20-16686, 20-16699] (Crabtree, John) [Entered: 07/02/2021 02:00 PM]
July 2, 2021 Filing 59 Filed clerk order: The reply brief [ # 58 ] submitted by Miguel A. Albarran; et al., is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 6 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: gray. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [12161851] [20-16685, 20-16686, 20-16691, 20-16699] (SML) [Entered: 07/02/2021 01:41 PM]
July 2, 2021 Filing 58 Submitted (ECF) Reply Brief for review. Submitted by Appellants Mina Ashkannejhad, Felicia Blackwood, Scott A. Caldwell, Jeff Craig, Warren Cutlip, Anthony Gianasca, Steven Harrelson, Susan LaPage, George Maglaras, Donna Muccino, Donald Oelze and Walker, Warren & Watkins, LLC in 20-16691, Appellants Miguel A. Albarran, Mary J. Baucom, Lisa L. Butterbrodt, Eric R. Coggins, Gloria A. Comeaux, Dennis S. Cornett, Valerie G. Deick, Heather J. Gordon, Brendan C. McCann, Jessica M. McIntyre, Dale B. McKenzie, Craig A. Schuler, Jeff Speaect and David N. Watson in 20-16686. Date of service: 07/02/2021. [12161701] [20-16691, 20-16685, 20-16686, 20-16699] (Bonsignore, Robert) [Entered: 07/02/2021 12:28 PM]
June 22, 2021 Filing 57 Filed text clerk order (Deputy Clerk: OC): Appellants motion for an extension of time to file a reply brief (Docket Entry #[ # 55 ]) is GRANTED in part. The reply brief is now due on or before July 2, 2021. [12150386] [20-16685, 20-16686, 20-16691, 20-16699] (OC) [Entered: 06/22/2021 09:19 AM]
June 21, 2021 Filing 56 Filed (ECF) Appellee Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs in 20-16685, 20-16686, 20-16691, 20-16699 response opposing motion ([ # 55 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 55 ] Motion (ECF Filing) motion to extend time to file brief). Date of service: 06/21/2021. [12149038] [20-16685, 20-16686, 20-16691, 20-16699] (Capurro, Lauren) [Entered: 06/21/2021 11:01 AM]
June 16, 2021 Filing 55 Filed (ECF) Appellants Tyler Ayres, Mike Bratcher, Nikki Crawley, Jay Erickson, Harry Garavanian, John Heenan, Hope Hitchcock, D. Bruce Johnson, Jeff Johnson, Kerry Murphy, Chris Seufert, Robert Stephenson, William Trentham and Gary Talewsky in 20-16699 Motion to extend time to file Reply brief until 07/26/2021. Date of service: 06/16/2021. [12146423] [20-16699, 20-16685, 20-16686, 20-16691] (Crabtree, John) [Entered: 06/16/2021 04:20 PM]
June 16, 2021 Filing 54 Filed text clerk order (Deputy Clerk: OC): Appellants Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief (Docket Entry #[ # 51 ]) is GRANTED in part. The Reply Brief is now due on or before July 2, 2021. [12146368] [20-16685, 20-16686, 20-16691, 20-16699] (OC) [Entered: 06/16/2021 03:44 PM]
June 14, 2021 Filing 53 Received 6 paper copies of Answering Brief [ # 45 ] filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (sent to panel) [12143533] [20-16685, 20-16686, 20-16691, 20-16699] (SD) [Entered: 06/14/2021 02:19 PM]
June 10, 2021 Filing 52 Received 3 paper copies of supplemental excerpts of record [ # 46 ] in 3 volume(s) and index volume filed by Appellee Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (sent to panel) [12141637] [20-16685, 20-16686, 20-16691, 20-16699] (LA) [Entered: 06/11/2021 10:24 AM]
June 9, 2021 Filing 51 Filed (ECF) Appellants Miguel A. Albarran, Mary J. Baucom, Lisa L. Butterbrodt, Eric R. Coggins, Gloria A. Comeaux, Dennis S. Cornett, Valerie G. Deick, Heather J. Gordon, Brendan C. McCann, Jessica M. McIntyre, Dale B. McKenzie, Craig A. Schuler, Jeff Speaect and David N. Watson in 20-16686, Appellants Mina Ashkannejhad, Felicia Blackwood, Scott A. Caldwell, Jeff Craig, Warren Cutlip, Anthony Gianasca, Steven Harrelson, Susan LaPage, George Maglaras, Donna Muccino, Donald Oelze and Walker, Warren & Watkins, LLC in 20-16691 Motion to extend time to file Reply brief until 07/26/2021. Date of service: 06/09/2021. [12139273] [20-16686, 20-16685, 20-16691, 20-16699] (Bonsignore, Robert) [Entered: 06/09/2021 02:50 PM]
June 7, 2021 Filing 50 Received 6 paper copies of Answering Brief [ # 41 ] filed by Hitachi America, Ltd, et al. (sent to panel) [12136153] [20-16685, 20-16686, 20-16691, 20-16699] (SD) [Entered: 06/07/2021 02:30 PM]
June 7, 2021 Filing 49 Received 3 paper copies of supplemental excerpts of record [ # 42 ] in 2 volume(s) and index volume filed by Appellees Hitachi America, Ltd, et al.. (sent to panel) [12135570] [20-16685, 20-16686, 20-16691, 20-16699] (KWG) [Entered: 06/07/2021 10:56 AM]
June 4, 2021 Filing 48 Filed clerk order: The answering brief [ # 45 ] submitted by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 6 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The supplemental excerpts of record [ # 46 ] submitted by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs are filed. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 3 copies of the excerpts in paper format securely bound on the left side, with white covers. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [12134803] [20-16685, 20-16686, 20-16691, 20-16699] (SML) [Entered: 06/04/2021 05:10 PM]
June 4, 2021 Filing 47 Filed text clerk order (Deputy Clerk: OC): Appellees Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File Oversized Brief (Docket Entry No. [ # 44 ]) is GRANTED. The brief and supplemental excerpts of record already received are ordered filed. [12134749] [20-16685, 20-16686, 20-16691, 20-16699] (OC) [Entered: 06/04/2021 04:45 PM]
June 3, 2021 Filing 46 Submitted (ECF) supplemental excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellee Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs in 20-16685, 20-16686, 20-16691, 20-16699. Date of service: 06/03/2021. [12133400] [20-16685, 20-16686, 20-16691, 20-16699] (Capurro, Lauren) [Entered: 06/03/2021 10:21 PM]
June 3, 2021 Filing 45 Submitted (ECF) Answering Brief for review. Submitted by Appellee Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs in 20-16685, 20-16686, 20-16691, 20-16699. Date of service: 06/03/2021. [12133399] [20-16685, 20-16686, 20-16691, 20-16699] (Capurro, Lauren) [Entered: 06/03/2021 10:17 PM]
June 3, 2021 Filing 44 Filed (ECF) Appellee Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs in 20-16685, 20-16686, 20-16691, 20-16699 Motion to file oversized brief. Date of service: 06/03/2021. [12133398] [20-16685, 20-16686, 20-16691, 20-16699] (Capurro, Lauren) [Entered: 06/03/2021 10:14 PM]
June 3, 2021 Filing 43 Filed clerk order: The answering brief [ # 41 ] submitted by Hitachi America; et al., is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 6 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The supplemental excerpts of record [ # 42 ] submitted by Hitachi America; et al., are filed. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 3 copies of the excerpts in paper format securely bound on the left side, with white covers. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [12133304] [20-16685, 20-16686, 20-16691, 20-16699] (SML) [Entered: 06/03/2021 04:57 PM]
June 3, 2021 Filing 42 Submitted (ECF) supplemental excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellees Hitachi America, Ltd, Hitachi Asia, Ltd., Hitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi, Ltd., MT Picture Display Co., LTD, Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Philips do Brasil Ltda., Philips Electronics North America Corporation, Philips Koninklijke N.V., Philips Taiwan Limited, Samsung SDI (Malaysia) SDN BHD, Samsung SDI Brasil Ltda., Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., Samsung SDI Mexico S.A. de C.V., Shenzen Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., Technologies Displays Americas LLC, Thomson Consumer Electronics, Inc., Thomson SA, Tianjin Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., Toshiba America Consumer Products, LLC, Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba America, Inc. and Toshiba Corporation in 20-16685, 20-16686, 20-16691, 20-16699. Date of service: 06/03/2021. [12133187] [20-16685, 20-16686, 20-16691, 20-16699] (Davies, Andrew Rhys) [Entered: 06/03/2021 04:04 PM]
June 3, 2021 Filing 41 Submitted (ECF) Answering Brief for review. Submitted by Appellees Hitachi America, Ltd, Hitachi Asia, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi, Ltd., Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Philips do Brasil Ltda., Philips Electronics North America Corporation, Philips Koninklijke N.V., MT Picture Display Co., LTD, Philips Taiwan Limited, Samsung SDI (Malaysia) SDN BHD, Samsung SDI America, Inc., Samsung SDI Brasil Ltda., Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., Samsung SDI Mexico S.A. de C.V., Shenzen Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., Technologies Displays Americas LLC, Thomson Consumer Electronics, Inc., Thomson SA, Tianjin Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., Toshiba America Consumer Products, LLC, Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation and Toshiba America, Inc. in 20-16685, 20-16686, 20-16691, 20-16699. Date of service: 06/03/2021. [12133172] [20-16685, 20-16686, 20-16691, 20-16699] (Davies, Andrew Rhys) [Entered: 06/03/2021 03:58 PM]
April 13, 2021 Filing 40 Received 3 paper copies of excerpts of record [ # 12060168-2 ] in 13 volume(s) and index volume filed by Appellants. (sent to panel) [12072826] [20-16691, 20-16685, 20-16686, 20-16699] (KWG) [Entered: 04/13/2021 02:21 PM]
April 13, 2021 Filing 39 Received 6 paper copies of Opening Brief [ # 12060163-2 ] filed by Appellants. (sent to panel) [12072251] [20-16691, 20-16685, 20-16686, 20-16699] (SD) [Entered: 04/13/2021 10:12 AM]
April 12, 2021 Filing 38 Received 6 paper copies of Opening Brief [ # 12060135-2 ] filed by Miguel A. Albarran, et al. (sent to panel) [12071227] [20-16686, 20-16685, 20-16691, 20-16699] (SD) [Entered: 04/12/2021 03:26 PM]
April 12, 2021 Filing 37 Received 3 paper copies of excerpts of record [ # 12060152-2 ] in 13 volume(s) and index volume filed by appellants Miguel A. Albarran, et al.. (sent to panel) [12071111] [20-16686, 20-16685, 20-16691, 20-16699] (KWG) [Entered: 04/12/2021 02:48 PM]
April 9, 2021 Filing 35 Filed order (WILLIAM A. FLETCHER, RICHARD R. CLIFTON and GARY S. KATZMANN) The Stipulation (Proposed) Order to Consolidate Appeals, filed on April 2, 2021, is GRANTED. The above-captioned cases are hereby consolidated for future proceedings. The unopposed Motion for Extension of Time, filed on April 2, 2021, is GRANTED. The answering brief is now due on or before June 3, 2021. The optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12069368] [20-16685, 20-16686, 20-16691, 20-16699] (OC) [Entered: 04/09/2021 11:59 AM]
April 8, 2021 Filing 36 Received 3 paper copies of excerpts of record [ # 29 ] in 8 volume(s) and index volume filed by Appellants. (sent to panel) [12069500] (LA) [Entered: 04/09/2021 01:24 PM]
April 8, 2021 Filing 34 Received 6 paper copies of Opening Brief [ # 28 ] filed by Appellants. (sent to panel) [12069142] (SD) [Entered: 04/09/2021 10:09 AM]
April 2, 2021 Filing 33 Filed clerk order: The opening brief [ # 28 ] submitted by appellants is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 6 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The excerpts of record [ # 29 ] submitted by appellants are filed. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 3 copies of the excerpts in paper format securely bound on the left side, with white covers. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [12061745] (SML) [Entered: 04/02/2021 10:23 AM]
April 2, 2021 Filing 32 Filed (ECF) Appellees Samsung SDI (Malaysia) SDN BHD, Samsung SDI America, Inc., Samsung SDI Brasil Ltda., Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., Samsung SDI Mexico S.A. de C.V., Shenzen Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. and Tianjin Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. Unopposed Motion to extend time to file Answering brief until 06/03/2021. Date of service: 04/02/2021. [12061506] [20-16699] (Davies, Andrew Rhys) [Entered: 04/02/2021 08:23 AM]
April 2, 2021 Filing 31 Filed (ECF) Appellees Samsung SDI (Malaysia) SDN BHD, Samsung SDI America, Inc., Samsung SDI Brasil Ltda., Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., Samsung SDI Mexico S.A. de C.V., Shenzen Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. and Tianjin Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. Stipulated Motion to consolidate cases 20-16685, 20-16686, 20-16691, and 20-16699. Date of service: 04/02/2021. [12061504] [20-16699] (Davies, Andrew Rhys) [Entered: 04/02/2021 08:20 AM]
April 2, 2021 Filing 30 Filed (ECF) Appellees Samsung SDI (Malaysia) SDN BHD, Samsung SDI America, Inc., Samsung SDI Brasil Ltda., Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., Samsung SDI Mexico S.A. de C.V., Shenzen Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. and Tianjin Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. corporate disclosure statement. Date of service: 04/02/2021. [12061496] [20-16699] (Davies, Andrew Rhys) [Entered: 04/02/2021 08:16 AM]
April 1, 2021 Filing 29 Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellants Tyler Ayres, Mike Bratcher, Nikki Crawley, Jay Erickson, Harry Garavanian, John Heenan, Hope Hitchcock, D. Bruce Johnson, Jeff Johnson, Kerry Murphy, Chris Seufert, Robert Stephenson, Gary Talewsky and William Trentham. Date of service: 04/01/2021. [12060939] [20-16699]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected excerpts. 04/02/2021 by SML] (Crabtree, John) [Entered: 04/01/2021 02:03 PM]
April 1, 2021 Filing 28 Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellants Tyler Ayres, Mike Bratcher, Nikki Crawley, Jay Erickson, Harry Garavanian, John Heenan, D. Bruce Johnson, Jeff Johnson, Kerry Murphy, Chris Seufert, Robert Stephenson, Gary Talewsky, William Trentham and Hope Hitchcock. Date of service: 04/01/2021. [12060911] [20-16699]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected brief. 04/02/2021 by SML] (Crabtree, John) [Entered: 04/01/2021 01:46 PM]
February 26, 2021 Filing 27 Filed text clerk order (Deputy Clerk: OC): Appellants' motion for an extension of time to file their opening brief, is granted. The opening brief is due on April 1, 2021. The answering brief is due on May 3, 2021 and the optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12017995] [20-16685, 20-16699] (OC) [Entered: 02/26/2021 12:33 PM]
February 23, 2021 Filing 26 Filed (ECF) Appellee Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs response opposing motion ([ # 25 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 25 ] Motion (ECF Filing) motion to extend time to file brief). Date of service: 02/23/2021. [12013599] [20-16699] (Capurro, Lauren) [Entered: 02/23/2021 11:57 AM]
February 18, 2021 Filing 25 Filed (ECF) Appellant Tyler Ayres Motion to extend time to file Opening brief until 04/01/2021. Date of service: 02/18/2021. [12008977] [20-16699] (Scarpulla, Francis) [Entered: 02/18/2021 04:44 PM]
February 16, 2021 Filing 24 Streamlined request [23] by Appellants Tyler Ayres, Mike Bratcher, Nikki Crawley, Jay Erickson, Harry Garavanian, John Heenan, D. Bruce Johnson, Jeff Johnson, Kerry Murphy, Chris Seufert, Robert Stephenson, Gary Talewsky and William Trentham to extend time to file the brief is not approved because extension is not allowed because the case is assigned to a merits panel. The filer must file a motion. [12005226] (DLM) [Entered: 02/16/2021 04:14 PM]
February 16, 2021 Filing 23 Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellants Tyler Ayres, Mike Bratcher, Nikki Crawley, Jay Erickson, Harry Garavanian, John Heenan, D. Bruce Johnson, Jeff Johnson, Kerry Murphy, Chris Seufert, Robert Stephenson, Gary Talewsky and William Trentham. New requested due date is 03/31/2021. [12003498] [20-16699] (Crabtree, John) [Entered: 02/16/2021 08:41 AM]
February 1, 2021 Filing 22 Filed order (WILLIAM A. FLETCHER, RICHARD R. CLIFTON and GARY S. KATZMANN): Appellees motion to dismiss this appeal for lack of jurisdiction (Docket Entry No. [ # 5 ]) is denied without prejudice to renewing the arguments in the answering brief. See Natl Indus. v. Republic Natl Life Ins. Co., 677 F.2d 1258, 1262 (9th Cir. 1982) (merits panel may consider appellate jurisdiction despite earlier denial of motion to dismiss). The opening brief and excerpts of record are due March 1, 2021; the answering brief is due March 30, 2021; and the optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11989049] (AF) [Entered: 02/01/2021 05:56 PM]
January 29, 2021 Filing 21 Filed (ECF) Appellee Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Correspondence: Letter from Mario N. Alioto to Clerk of the Ninth Circuit Regarding Pending Motions to Dismiss. Date of service: 01/29/2021 [11986724] [20-16699] (Capurro, Lauren) [Entered: 01/29/2021 04:34 PM]
December 2, 2020 Filing 20 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: OC): Pursuant to G.O. 3.2(h), Judge W. Fletcher has been drawn to replace Judge Wardlaw, who is recused. The reconstituted panel: W. FLETCHER and CLIFTON, Circuit Judges, and KATZMANN,* Judge, will retain jurisdiction of this case. [11913047] [17-15496, 17-15597, 17-15598, 20-15697, 20-15704, 20-16081, 20-16699, 20-16685, 20-16684, 20-16686, 20-16691] (OC) [Entered: 12/02/2020 04:01 PM]
October 8, 2020 Filing 19 Added Attorney Donald Arthur Wall for Appellee Technologies Displays Americas LLC, in case 20-16699. [11853259] (HH) [Entered: 10/08/2020 04:55 PM]
October 8, 2020 Filing 18 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Donald A. Wall (Squire Patton Boggs LLP, 1 E. Washington Street, Suite 2700, Phoenix, AZ 85004) for Appellee Technologies Displays Americas LLC. Date of service: 10/08/2020. (Party was previously proceeding pro se.) [11853199] [20-16699] (Wall, Donald) [Entered: 10/08/2020 04:43 PM]
October 8, 2020 Filing 17 Entered appearance of Appellee Technologies Displays Americas LLC. [11852790] (TYL) [Entered: 10/08/2020 03:08 PM]
October 6, 2020 Filing 16 Terminated attorney Donald Arthur Wall for appellee Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs in 20-16699. [11849777] (HH) [Entered: 10/06/2020 04:07 PM]
October 6, 2020 Filing 15 Filed (ECF) Notice of withdrawal of counsel. Filed by Attorney Donald Arthur Wall, Esquire for Appellee Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. Party proceeding without counsel: No. Date of service: 10/06/2020. [11849729] [20-16699] (Wall, Donald) [Entered: 10/06/2020 03:49 PM]
October 6, 2020 Filing 14 Added Attorney(s) Donald Arthur Wall for party(s) Appellee Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, in case 20-16699. [11849324] (NAC) [Entered: 10/06/2020 01:46 PM]
October 6, 2020 Filing 13 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Donald A. Wall (Squire Patton Boggs (US) LLP, One E. Washington St., Ste. 2700, Phoenix, AZ 85004) for Appellee Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. Date of service: 10/06/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11849302] [20-16699] (Wall, Donald) [Entered: 10/06/2020 01:34 PM]
October 2, 2020 Filing 12 Added Attorney(s) Christopher Thomas Micheletti for party(s) Appellee Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, in case 20-16699. [11845331] (NAC) [Entered: 10/02/2020 10:37 AM]
October 2, 2020 Filing 11 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Christopher T. Micheletti (Zelle LLP, 44 Montgomery Street, Suite 3400, San Francisco, California 94104) for Appellee Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. Date of service: 10/02/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11845314] [20-16699] (Micheletti, Christopher) [Entered: 10/02/2020 10:34 AM]
September 28, 2020 Filing 10 Filed (ECF) Appellee Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs reply to response (). Date of service: 09/28/2020. [11840050] [20-16699] (Capurro, Lauren) [Entered: 09/28/2020 06:49 PM]
September 21, 2020 Filing 9 Filed (ECF) Appellants Tyler Ayres, Mike Bratcher, Nikki Crawley, Jay Erickson, Harry Garavanian, John Heenan, Hope Hitchcock, D. Bruce Johnson, Jeff Johnson, Kerry Murphy, Chris Seufert, Robert Stephenson, Gary Talewsky and William Trentham response opposing motion ([ # 5 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 5 ] Motion (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 09/21/2020. [11831892] [20-16699] (Crabtree, John) [Entered: 09/21/2020 06:18 PM]
September 21, 2020 Filing 8 Added Attorney(s) John Granville Crabtree Sr. for party(s) Appellant William Trentham Appellant Tyler Ayres Appellant Mike Bratcher Appellant Kerry Murphy Appellant D. Bruce Johnson Appellant Robert Stephenson Appellant Nikki Crawley Appellant Harry Garavanian Appellant John Heenan Appellant Jeff Johnson Appellant Chris Seufert Appellant Gary Talewsky Appellant Jay Erickson Appellant Hope Hitchcock, in case 20-16699. [11831423] (NAC) [Entered: 09/21/2020 03:12 PM]
September 21, 2020 Filing 7 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of John Granville Crabtree (Crabtree & Auslander, 240 Crandon Blvd., Suite 101, Key Biscayne, Florida 33149) for Appellants Tyler Ayres, Mike Bratcher, Nikki Crawley, Jay Erickson, Harry Garavanian, John Heenan, Hope Hitchcock, D. Bruce Johnson, Jeff Johnson, Kerry Murphy, Chris Seufert, Robert Stephenson, Gary Talewsky and William Trentham. Date of service: 09/21/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11831395] [20-16699] (Crabtree, John) [Entered: 09/21/2020 03:04 PM]
September 15, 2020 Filing 6 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. All further inquiries regarding this appeal, including request for extensions of time, should be directed to the Clerk's Office. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [11824672] (VS) [Entered: 09/15/2020 12:54 PM]
September 11, 2020 Filing 5 Filed (ECF) Appellee Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction. Date of service: 09/11/2020. [11821503] [20-16699] (Capurro, Lauren) [Entered: 09/11/2020 06:56 PM]
September 9, 2020 Filing 4 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 09/09/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11818314]. [20-16699] (AD) [Entered: 09/09/2020 06:44 PM]
September 9, 2020 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) Appellants Tyler Ayres, Mike Bratcher, Nikki Crawley, Jay Erickson, Harry Garavanian, John Heenan, Jeff Johnson, Chris Seufert, Robert Stephenson, Gary Talewsky, William Trentham, Hope Hitchcock, D. Bruce Johnson and Kerry Murphy Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 09/09/2020. [11818278] [20-16699] (Moore, Theresa) [Entered: 09/09/2020 05:39 PM]
September 3, 2020 Filing 2 Added Attorney Theresa D. Moore for Appellants Tyler Ayres, et al., in case 20-16699. [11812970] (HH) [Entered: 09/03/2020 04:34 PM]
September 2, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Tyler Ayres, Mike Bratcher, Nikki Crawley, Jay Erickson, Harry Garavanian, John Heenan, Hope Hitchcock, D. Bruce Johnson, Jeff Johnson, Kerry Murphy, Chris Seufert, Robert Stephenson, Gary Talewsky and William Trentham Mediation Questionnaire due on 09/09/2020. Transcript ordered by 09/28/2020. Transcript due 10/27/2020. Appellants Tyler Ayres, Mike Bratcher, Nikki Crawley, Jay Erickson, Harry Garavanian, John Heenan, Hope Hitchcock, D. Bruce Johnson, Jeff Johnson, Kerry Murphy, Chris Seufert, Robert Stephenson, Gary Talewsky and William Trentham opening brief due 12/07/2020. Appellees Hitachi America, Ltd, Hitachi Asia, Ltd., Hitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi, Ltd., Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, MT Picture Display Co., LTD, Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Philips Electronics North America Corporation, Philips Koninklijke N.V., Philips Taiwan Limited, Philips do Brasil Ltda., Samsung SDI (Malaysia) SDN BHD, Samsung SDI America, Inc., Samsung SDI Brasil Ltda., Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., Samsung SDI Mexico S.A. de C.V., Shenzen Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., Thomson Consumer Electronics, Inc., Thomson SA, Tianjin Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., Toshiba America Consumer Products, LLC, Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba America, Inc. and Toshiba Corporation answering brief due 01/07/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11810901] (RT) [Entered: 09/02/2020 01:01 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs v. Toshiba Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: HARRY GARAVANIAN
Represented By: Patrick B. Clayton
Represented By: Francis O. Scarpulla Esquire
Represented By: Theresa D. Moore Esquire
Represented By: John Granville Crabtree Sr.
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: CHRIS SEUFERT
Represented By: Patrick B. Clayton
Represented By: Francis O. Scarpulla Esquire
Represented By: Theresa D. Moore Esquire
Represented By: John Granville Crabtree Sr.
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: KERRY MURPHY
Represented By: Patrick B. Clayton
Represented By: Francis O. Scarpulla Esquire
Represented By: Theresa D. Moore Esquire
Represented By: John Granville Crabtree Sr.
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: JAY ERICKSON
Represented By: Patrick B. Clayton
Represented By: Francis O. Scarpulla Esquire
Represented By: Theresa D. Moore Esquire
Represented By: John Granville Crabtree Sr.
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: MIKE BRATCHER
Represented By: Patrick B. Clayton
Represented By: Francis O. Scarpulla Esquire
Represented By: Theresa D. Moore Esquire
Represented By: John Granville Crabtree Sr.
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: D. BRUCE JOHNSON
Represented By: Patrick B. Clayton
Represented By: Francis O. Scarpulla Esquire
Represented By: Theresa D. Moore Esquire
Represented By: John Granville Crabtree Sr.
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: ROBERT STEPHENSON
Represented By: Patrick B. Clayton
Represented By: Francis O. Scarpulla Esquire
Represented By: Theresa D. Moore Esquire
Represented By: John Granville Crabtree Sr.
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: TYLER AYRES
Represented By: Patrick B. Clayton
Represented By: Francis O. Scarpulla Esquire
Represented By: Theresa D. Moore Esquire
Represented By: John Granville Crabtree Sr.
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: JEFF JOHNSON
Represented By: Patrick B. Clayton
Represented By: Francis O. Scarpulla Esquire
Represented By: Theresa D. Moore Esquire
Represented By: John Granville Crabtree Sr.
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: JOHN HEENAN
Represented By: Patrick B. Clayton
Represented By: Francis O. Scarpulla Esquire
Represented By: Theresa D. Moore Esquire
Represented By: John Granville Crabtree Sr.
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: HOPE HITCHCOCK
Represented By: Patrick B. Clayton
Represented By: Francis O. Scarpulla Esquire
Represented By: Theresa D. Moore Esquire
Represented By: John Granville Crabtree Sr.
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: NIKKI CRAWLEY
Represented By: Patrick B. Clayton
Represented By: Francis O. Scarpulla Esquire
Represented By: Theresa D. Moore Esquire
Represented By: John Granville Crabtree Sr.
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: GARY TALEWSKY
Represented By: Patrick B. Clayton
Represented By: Francis O. Scarpulla Esquire
Represented By: Theresa D. Moore Esquire
Represented By: John Granville Crabtree Sr.
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: WILLIAM TRENTHAM
Represented By: Patrick B. Clayton
Represented By: Francis O. Scarpulla Esquire
Represented By: Theresa D. Moore Esquire
Represented By: John Granville Crabtree Sr.
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TOSHIBA AMERICA CONSUMER PRODUCTS, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Frutig
Represented By: Christopher M. Curran
Represented By: Lucius B. Lau
Represented By: Dana Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PANASONIC CORPORATION OF NORTH AMERICA
Represented By: Molly M. Donovan
Represented By: Kevin B. Goldstein Esquire
Represented By: David Yohai Esquire
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Represented By: Adam C. Hemlock
Represented By: Eva W. Cole
Represented By: Aldo Badini
Represented By: David Yolkut
Represented By: Sofia Arguello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SAMSUNG SDI (MALAYSIA) SDN BHD
Represented By: John Roberti
Represented By: Andrew Rhys Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HITACHI DISPLAYS, LTD., AKA Japan Display, Inc.
Represented By: James Sigel
Represented By: Eliot A. Adelson Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, INC.
Represented By: Ryan Hurley
Represented By: Kathy Osborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION
Represented By: Erik T. Koons
Represented By: John M. Taladay Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SHENZEN SAMSUNG SDI CO., LTD.
Represented By: John Roberti
Represented By: Andrew Rhys Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TOSHIBA CORPORATION
Represented By: Matthew Frutig
Represented By: Christopher M. Curran
Represented By: Lucius B. Lau
Represented By: Dana Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SAMSUNG SDI AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: John Roberti
Represented By: Andrew Rhys Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TIANJIN SAMSUNG SDI CO., LTD.
Represented By: John Roberti
Represented By: Andrew Rhys Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THOMSON SA
Represented By: Ryan Hurley
Represented By: Kathy Osborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SAMSUNG SDI CO., LTD.
Represented By: John Roberti
Represented By: Andrew Rhys Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HITACHI ELECTRONIC DEVICES (USA), INC.
Represented By: James Sigel
Represented By: Eliot A. Adelson Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PANASONIC CORPORATION, FKA Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. ("MEI"), is a Japanese entity
Represented By: Molly M. Donovan
Represented By: Kevin B. Goldstein Esquire
Represented By: David Yohai Esquire
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Represented By: Adam C. Hemlock
Represented By: Eva W. Cole
Represented By: Aldo Badini
Represented By: David Yolkut
Represented By: Sofia Arguello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TOSHIBA AMERICA INFORMATION SYSTEMS, INC.
Represented By: Matthew Frutig
Represented By: Christopher M. Curran
Represented By: Lucius B. Lau
Represented By: Dana Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HITACHI ASIA, LTD.
Represented By: James Sigel
Represented By: Eliot A. Adelson Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SAMSUNG SDI MEXICO S.A. DE C.V.
Represented By: John Roberti
Represented By: Andrew Rhys Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PHILIPS DO BRASIL LTDA.
Represented By: Erik T. Koons
Represented By: John M. Taladay Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TOSHIBA AMERICA ELECTRONIC COMPONENTS, INC.
Represented By: Matthew Frutig
Represented By: Christopher M. Curran
Represented By: Lucius B. Lau
Represented By: Dana Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PHILIPS KONINKLIJKE N.V.
Represented By: Erik T. Koons
Represented By: John M. Taladay Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SAMSUNG SDI BRASIL LTDA.
Represented By: John Roberti
Represented By: Andrew Rhys Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PHILIPS TAIWAN LIMITED
Represented By: Erik T. Koons
Represented By: John M. Taladay Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HITACHI, LTD.
Represented By: James Sigel
Represented By: Eliot A. Adelson Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MT PICTURE DISPLAY CO., LTD
Represented By: Molly M. Donovan
Represented By: Kevin B. Goldstein Esquire
Represented By: David Yohai Esquire
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Represented By: Adam C. Hemlock
Represented By: Eva W. Cole
Represented By: Aldo Badini
Represented By: David Yolkut
Represented By: Sofia Arguello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TOSHIBA AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: Matthew Frutig
Represented By: Christopher M. Curran
Represented By: Lucius B. Lau
Represented By: Dana Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HITACHI AMERICA, LTD
Represented By: James Sigel
Represented By: Eliot A. Adelson Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TECHNOLOGIES DISPLAYS AMERICAS LLC
Represented By: Donald Arthur Wall Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS
Represented By: Mario Alioto
Represented By: Sylvie Kern
Represented By: Jennifer S. Rosenberg Esquire
Represented By: Lauren C. Capurro
Represented By: Daniel Edward Birkhaeuser Esquire
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Micheletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: In re: CATHODE RAY TUBE (CRT) ANTITRUST LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?