California Air Resources Board, et al v. American Petroleum Institute, et al
Defendant: BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, DAVID BERNHARDT, in his official capacity as Secretary of the Interior;, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR and JOSEPH BALASH, Assistant Secretary for Land and Minerals Management, United States Department of the Interior
Plaintiff / Appellee: FORT BERTHOLD PROTECTORS OF WATER AND EARTH RIGHTS, CALIFORNIA AIR RESOURCES BOARD, WESTERN ORGANIZATION OF RESOURCE COUNCILS, STATE OF NEW MEXICO, by and through Hector Balderas, Attorney General, STATE OF CALIFORNIA, by and through Xavier Becerra, Attorney General, WILDEARTH GUARDIANS, ENVIRONMENTAL DEFENSE FUND, CITIZENS FOR A HEALTHY COMMUNITY, NATIONAL WILDLIFE FEDERATION, LOS PADRES FORESTWATCH, EARTHWORKS, WILDERNESS WORKSHOP, DINE CITIZENS AGAINST RUINING OUR ENVIRONMENT, SIERRA CLUB, NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL, ENVIRONMENTAL LAW AND POLICY CENTER, WYOMING OUTDOOR COUNCIL, MONTANA ENVIRONMENTAL INFORMATION CENTER, THE WILDERNESS SOCIETY, SAN JUAN CITIZENS ALLIANCE and CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
Intervenor Defendant / Appellant: STATE OF WYOMING, INDEPENDENT PETROLEUM ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, WESTERN ENERGY ALLIANCE and AMERICAN PETROLEUM INSTITUTE
Case Number: 20-16801
Filed: September 17, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2020 Filing 11 MEDIATION STATUS REPORT DUE - 12/03/2020. See order for details. [11888577] [20-16793, 20-16794, 20-16801] (VS) [Entered: 11/10/2020 02:00 PM]
November 3, 2020 Filing 10 Attorney Wayne F. Forman in 20-16801 substituted by Attorney Eric Waeckerlin in 20-16801 [11880073] (CW) [Entered: 11/03/2020 09:33 AM]
November 3, 2020 Filing 9 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Eric P. Waeckerlin (Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP, 410 Seventeenth Street, Suite 2200, Denver, CO 80202) for Appellants Western Energy Alliance and Independent Petroleum Association of America. Substitution for Attorney Mr. Wayne F. Forman for Appellant Western Energy Alliance. Date of service: 11/03/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11880047] [20-16801] (Waeckerlin, Eric) [Entered: 11/03/2020 09:23 AM]
October 7, 2020 Filing 8 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 11/10/2020, 11:00 a.m., PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedules previously set by the court remain in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11850393] [20-16793, 20-16794, 20-16801] (VS) [Entered: 10/07/2020 10:16 AM]
September 25, 2020 Filing 7 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 09/25/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11837148]. [20-16801] (AD) [Entered: 09/25/2020 12:44 PM]
September 25, 2020 Filing 6 Filed (ECF) Appellant Western Energy Alliance Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 09/25/2020. [11836957] [20-16801] (Forman, Wayne) [Entered: 09/25/2020 11:12 AM]
September 25, 2020 Filing 5 Added Attorney(s) Wayne F. Forman for party(s) Appellant Western Energy Alliance, in case 20-16801. [11836548] (CW) [Entered: 09/25/2020 07:06 AM]
September 24, 2020 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Wayne F. Forman (Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP, 410 Seventeenth Street, Suite 2200, Denver, CO 80202) for Appellant Western Energy Alliance. Date of service: 09/24/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11836437] [20-16801] (Forman, Wayne) [Entered: 09/24/2020 06:55 PM]
September 24, 2020 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 09/24/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11836422]. [20-16801] (AD) [Entered: 09/24/2020 06:44 PM]
September 24, 2020 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellant American Petroleum Institute Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 09/24/2020. [11836085] [20-16801] (Smith, Gary) [Entered: 09/24/2020 03:26 PM]
September 17, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants American Petroleum Institute, Independent Petroleum Association of America and Western Energy Alliance Mediation Questionnaire due on 09/24/2020. Transcript ordered by 10/15/2020. Transcript due 11/16/2020. Appellants American Petroleum Institute, Independent Petroleum Association of America and Western Energy Alliance opening brief due 12/24/2020. Appellees California Air Resources Board, Center for Biological Diversity, Citizens for a Healthy Community, Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment, Earthworks, Environmental Defense Fund, Environmental Law and Policy Center, Fort Berthold Protectors of Water and Earth Rights, Los Padres Forestwatch, Montana Environmental Information Center, National Wildlife Federation, Natural Resources Defense Council, San Juan Citizens Alliance, Sierra Club, State of California, State of New Mexico, The Wilderness Society, Western Organization of Resource Councils, WildEarth Guardians, Wilderness Workshop and Wyoming Outdoor Council answering brief due 01/25/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11827732] (RT) [Entered: 09/17/2020 12:50 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: California Air Resources Board, et al v. American Petroleum Institute, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID BERNHARDT, in his official capacity as Secretary of the Interior;
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH BALASH, Assistant Secretary for Land and Minerals Management, United States Department of the Interior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: FORT BERTHOLD PROTECTORS OF WATER AND EARTH RIGHTS
Represented By: Robin Cooley
Represented By: Rumela Roy
Represented By: Stacey Putnam Geis Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CALIFORNIA AIR RESOURCES BOARD
Represented By: Shannon Clark
Represented By: George Torgun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: WESTERN ORGANIZATION OF RESOURCE COUNCILS
Represented By: Robin Cooley
Represented By: Rumela Roy
Represented By: Stacey Putnam Geis Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STATE OF NEW MEXICO, by and through Hector Balderas, Attorney General
Represented By: William Grantham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STATE OF CALIFORNIA, by and through Xavier Becerra, Attorney General
Represented By: Shannon Clark
Represented By: George Torgun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: WILDEARTH GUARDIANS
Represented By: Erik Schlenker-Goodrich
Represented By: Stacey Putnam Geis Esquire
Represented By: Melissa A. Hornbein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ENVIRONMENTAL DEFENSE FUND
Represented By: Stacey Putnam Geis Esquire
Represented By: Rosalie Winn
Represented By: Susannah Weaver
Represented By: Peter Zalzal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CITIZENS FOR A HEALTHY COMMUNITY
Represented By: Erik Schlenker-Goodrich
Represented By: Stacey Putnam Geis Esquire
Represented By: Melissa A. Hornbein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: NATIONAL WILDLIFE FEDERATION
Represented By: Erik Schlenker-Goodrich
Represented By: Stacey Putnam Geis Esquire
Represented By: Melissa A. Hornbein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LOS PADRES FORESTWATCH
Represented By: Erik Schlenker-Goodrich
Represented By: Stacey Putnam Geis Esquire
Represented By: Melissa A. Hornbein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: EARTHWORKS
Represented By: Erik Schlenker-Goodrich
Represented By: Stacey Putnam Geis Esquire
Represented By: Melissa A. Hornbein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: WILDERNESS WORKSHOP
Represented By: Erik Schlenker-Goodrich
Represented By: Stacey Putnam Geis Esquire
Represented By: Melissa A. Hornbein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DINE CITIZENS AGAINST RUINING OUR ENVIRONMENT
Represented By: Erik Schlenker-Goodrich
Represented By: Stacey Putnam Geis Esquire
Represented By: Melissa A. Hornbein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SIERRA CLUB
Represented By: Robin Cooley
Represented By: Rumela Roy
Represented By: Stacey Putnam Geis Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL
Represented By: David Daniel Doniger
Represented By: Stacey Putnam Geis Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ENVIRONMENTAL LAW AND POLICY CENTER
Represented By: Stacey Putnam Geis Esquire
Represented By: Rachel Leigh Granneman
Represented By: Scott Strand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: WYOMING OUTDOOR COUNCIL
Represented By: Erik Schlenker-Goodrich
Represented By: Stacey Putnam Geis Esquire
Represented By: Melissa A. Hornbein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MONTANA ENVIRONMENTAL INFORMATION CENTER
Represented By: Erik Schlenker-Goodrich
Represented By: Stacey Putnam Geis Esquire
Represented By: Melissa A. Hornbein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: THE WILDERNESS SOCIETY
Represented By: Robin Cooley
Represented By: Rumela Roy
Represented By: Stacey Putnam Geis Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SAN JUAN CITIZENS ALLIANCE
Represented By: Erik Schlenker-Goodrich
Represented By: Stacey Putnam Geis Esquire
Represented By: Melissa A. Hornbein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
Represented By: Erik Schlenker-Goodrich
Represented By: Stacey Putnam Geis Esquire
Represented By: Melissa A. Hornbein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant / appellant: STATE OF WYOMING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant / appellant: INDEPENDENT PETROLEUM ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA
Represented By: Peter Schaumberg
Represented By: Gary John Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant / appellant: WESTERN ENERGY ALLIANCE
Represented By: Peter Schaumberg
Represented By: Gary John Smith
Represented By: Eric Waeckerlin Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant / appellant: AMERICAN PETROLEUM INSTITUTE
Represented By: Peter Schaumberg
Represented By: Gary John Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?