National Urban League, et al v. Wilbur Ross, et al
Plaintiff / Appellee: KING COUNTY, Washington, ADRIAN GARCIA, HARRIS COUNTY, Texas, NATIONAL URBAN LEAGUE, BLACK ALLIANCE FOR JUST IMMIGRATION, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF COLORED PEOPLE, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS, CITY OF LOS ANGELES, California, CITY OF SALINAS, California, COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, California, GILA RIVER INDIAN COMMUNITY, CITY OF SAN JOSE, California, NAVAJO NATION, CITY OF CHICAGO, Illinois and RODNEY ELLIS
Amicus Curiae: COUNTY OF SANTA CLARA, and 18 Additional Local Governments, STATE OF LOUISIANA and STATE OF MISSISSIPPI
Defendant / Appellant: UNITED STATES CENSUS BUREAU, STEVEN DILLINGHAM, in his official capacity as Director of the U.S. Census Bureau, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE and WILBUR L. ROSS, in his official capacity as Secretary of Commerce
Case Number: 20-16868
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2020 Filing 57 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: MN): Appellees motion (Docket Entry No. [ # 54 ]) for an extension of time to file the answering brief is granted. The answering brief is due December 21, 2020. Appellants optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11900856] (WL) [Entered: 11/20/2020 11:05 AM]
November 17, 2020 Filing 56 Filed (ECF) Appellees National Urban League, Black Alliance For Just Immigration, League of Women Voters, Harris County, King County, City of Los Angeles, City of Salinas, City of San Jose, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, NAACP, City of Chicago, County of Los Angeles, Navajo Nation and Gila River Indian Community reply to response (). Date of service: 11/17/2020. [11895513] [20-16868] (Sherry, Melissa) [Entered: 11/17/2020 10:08 AM]
November 16, 2020 Filing 55 Filed (ECF) Appellants Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, United States Census Bureau and USDOC response opposing motion ([ # 54 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 54 ] Motion (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 11/16/2020. [11894116] [20-16868] (Hinshelwood, Bradley) [Entered: 11/16/2020 12:48 PM]
November 13, 2020 Filing 54 Filed (ECF) Appellees Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, City of Los Angeles, City of Salinas, City of San Jose, County of Los Angeles, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, King County, League of Women Voters, NAACP, National Urban League and Navajo Nation Motion to extend time to file Answering brief until 12/21/2020. Date of service: 11/13/2020. [11893246] [20-16868] (Sherry, Melissa) [Entered: 11/13/2020 11:03 PM]
October 30, 2020 Filing 53 Received 6 paper copies of Opening Brief [ # 49 ] filed by Appellants. [11877731] (DB) [Entered: 10/30/2020 04:09 PM]
October 30, 2020 Filing 52 Received 3 paper copies of excerpts of record [ # 50 ] in 2 volume(s) filed by Appellants. [11877396] (LA) [Entered: 10/30/2020 02:24 PM]
October 26, 2020 Filing 51 Filed clerk order: The opening brief [ # 49 ] submitted by appellants is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 6 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The excerpts of record [ # 50 ] submitted by appellants are filed. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 3 copies of the excerpts in paper format securely bound on the left side, with white covers. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [11872038] (SML) [Entered: 10/26/2020 03:32 PM]
October 23, 2020 Filing 50 Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellants Wilbur L. Ross, United States Census Bureau, USDOC and Steven Dillingham. Date of service: 10/23/2020. [11870542] [20-16868] (Hinshelwood, Bradley) [Entered: 10/23/2020 04:00 PM]
October 23, 2020 Filing 49 Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellants Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, United States Census Bureau and USDOC. Date of service: 10/23/2020. [11870539] [20-16868] (Hinshelwood, Bradley) [Entered: 10/23/2020 03:58 PM]
October 13, 2020 Filing 48 Received from the U.S. Supreme Court, order dated 10/13/2020: The application for stay presented to JUSTICE KAGAN and by her referred to the Court is granted. The district courts September 24, 2020 order granting a preliminary injunction is stayed pending disposition of the appeal in the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit and disposition of the petition for a writ of certiorari, if such writ is timely sought. Should the petition for a writ of certiorari be denied, this stay shall terminate automatically. In the event the petition for a writ of certiorari is granted, the stay shall terminate upon the sending down of the judgment of this Court. Supreme Court No. 20A62. [11856644] (HH) [Entered: 10/13/2020 02:51 PM]
October 8, 2020 Filing 47 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [ # 10 ] submitted by State of Louisiana and State of Mississippi and the amicus brief [ # 24 ] submitted by County of Santa Clara and 18 Additional Local Goverments are filed. No paper copies are required. [11853339] (SML) [Entered: 10/08/2020 05:37 PM]
October 8, 2020 Filing 46 Filed text clerk order (Deputy Clerk: OC): The motions to become amicus, filed on September 30, 2020 [ # 28 ] and October 1, 2020 [ # 31 ], are granted. [11852034] (OC) [Entered: 10/08/2020 10:24 AM]
October 7, 2020 Filing 45 Filed Order for PUBLICATION (SUSAN P. GRABER, WILLIAM A. FLETCHER and MARSHA S. BERZON) To the extent that the district court enjoined the Defendants from attempting to meet the December 31 date, that injunction is stayed pending appeal. Emergency Motion for a Stay DENIED IN PART and GRANTED IN PART. [11850873]--[Edited (attached reformatted PDF) 10/13/2020 by AKM] (AKM) [Entered: 10/07/2020 12:44 PM]
October 7, 2020 Filing 44 Filed Audio recording of oral argument. Note: Video recordings of public argument calendars are available on the Court's website, at # http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/media/ [11850512] (SVG) [Entered: 10/07/2020 10:59 AM]
October 5, 2020 Filing 43 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LF): The panel intends to issue a decision on the motion for stay pending appeal no later than noon Pacific Time on Wednesday, October 7, 2020. [11847520] (JBS) [Entered: 10/05/2020 01:29 PM]
October 3, 2020 Filing 42 Filed (ECF) Appellants Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, United States Census Bureau and USDOC reply to response (). Date of service: 10/03/2020. [11846539] [20-16868] (Hinshelwood, Bradley) [Entered: 10/03/2020 08:44 PM]
October 3, 2020 Filing 41 Added Attorney Christine Casey Smith for Appellees City of San Jose, Harris County, League of Women Voters, National Urban League, King County, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Black Alliance For Just Immigration and NAACP, in case 20-16868. [11846495] (HH) [Entered: 10/03/2020 11:53 AM]
October 2, 2020 Filing 40 Filed (ECF) Appellees Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, City of Los Angeles, City of Salinas, City of San Jose, County of Los Angeles, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, King County, League of Women Voters, NAACP, National Urban League and Navajo Nation response opposing motion ([ # 4 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 4 ] Motion (ECF Filing) motion to stay lower court action). Date of service: 10/02/2020. [11846445] [20-16868] (Sherry, Melissa) [Entered: 10/02/2020 11:54 PM]
October 2, 2020 Filing 39 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Christine Casey Smith (Latham & Watkins LLP 555 Eleventh Street, NW - Suite 1000 - Washington, D.C. 20004) for Appellees National Urban League, Black Alliance For Just Immigration, League of Women Voters, Harris County, King County, City of San Jose, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia and NAACP. Date of service: 10/02/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11846441] [20-16868] (Smith, Christine) [Entered: 10/02/2020 11:09 PM]
October 2, 2020 Filing 38 Added Attorney Sopan Joshi for Appellants Wilbur L. Ross, et al., in case 20-16868. [11846403] (HH) [Entered: 10/02/2020 07:11 PM]
October 2, 2020 Filing 37 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Sopan Joshi (U.S. Department of Justice) for Appellants Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, United States Census Bureau and USDOC. Date of service: 10/02/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11846401] [20-16868] (Joshi, Sopan) [Entered: 10/02/2020 06:49 PM]
October 2, 2020 Filing 36 Filed order (SUSAN P. GRABER, WILLIAM A. FLETCHER, and MARSHA S. BERZON) Appellants and appellees shall appear by telephone for oral argument on the pending emergency motion to stay the district courts September 24, 2020 order on Monday, October 5, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. PDT. The argument will be live-streamed and shall take place in courtroom 4 in San Francisco. Only one attorney for each side shall be permitted to argue, and each side will be permitted 20 minutes of argument time. Call-in instructions will be provided to the appearing parties.[11846349] (SVG) [Entered: 10/02/2020 05:26 PM]
October 2, 2020 Filing 35 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is NOT SELECTED for inclusion in the Mediation Program. Counsel may contact Circuit Mediator to discuss services available through the Circuit Mediation Program or to request a settlement assessment conference. Info regarding the mediation program may be found at www.ca9.uscourts.gov/mediation. [11845995] (MS) [Entered: 10/02/2020 03:09 PM]
October 1, 2020 Filing 34 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 10/01/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11844825]. [20-16868] (AD) [Entered: 10/01/2020 06:44 PM]
October 1, 2020 Filing 33 Filed (ECF) Appellants Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, United States Census Bureau and USDOC Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/01/2020. [11843961] [20-16868] (Hinshelwood, Bradley) [Entered: 10/01/2020 01:06 PM]
October 1, 2020 Filing 32 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae - Pending County of Santa Clara and 18 Additional Local Governments. [11843887] (SML) [Entered: 10/01/2020 12:39 PM]
October 1, 2020 Filing 31 Filed (ECF) County of Santa Clara, California and 18 Additional Local Governments Motion to become amicus curiae. Date of service: 10/01/2020. [11843788] [20-16868] (Rajendra, Raphael) [Entered: 10/01/2020 11:49 AM]
September 30, 2020 Filing 30 Entered appearance of Amici Curiae - Pending State of Louisiana and State of Mississippi. [11843074] (SML) [Entered: 09/30/2020 05:06 PM]
September 30, 2020 Filing 29 Terminated Alexander Haas for USDOC, United States Census Bureau, Wilbur L. Ross and Steven Dillingham in 20-16868 (due to incorrect ECF contact information) [11842905] (RY) [Entered: 09/30/2020 03:56 PM]
September 30, 2020 Filing 28 Filed (ECF) States of Louisiana and Mississippi Motion to become amicus curiae. Date of service: 09/30/2020. [11842678] [20-16868] (Murrill, Elizabeth) [Entered: 09/30/2020 02:37 PM]
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Filed Order for PUBLICATION (JOHNNIE B. RAWLINSON, MORGAN B. CHRISTEN and PATRICK J. BUMATAY) (Dissent by Judge Bumatay) Because the status quo would be upended, rather than preserved, if an administrative stay is issued, the governments request for an immediate administrative stay set forth in Docket Entry No. 4 is denied. Appellees response to the emergency motion is due October 2, 2020. Appellants optional reply is due by October 3, 2020. [11842323] (AKM) [Entered: 09/30/2020 12:14 PM]
September 30, 2020 Filing 26 Filed (ECF) Appellants Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, United States Census Bureau and USDOC citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 09/30/2020. [11842025] [20-16868] (Hinshelwood, Bradley) [Entered: 09/30/2020 10:24 AM]
September 29, 2020 Filing 25 Terminated Ethan Price Davis for USDOC, United States Census Bureau, Wilbur L. Ross and Steven Dillingham in 20-16868 (due to incorrect ECF contact information) [11841553] (RY) [Entered: 09/29/2020 05:09 PM]
September 29, 2020 Filing 24 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by County of Santa Clara, California and 18 Additional Local Governments. Date of service: 09/29/2020. [11841448] [20-16868] (Rajendra, Raphael) [Entered: 09/29/2020 04:26 PM]
September 29, 2020 Filing 23 Filed (ECF) Appellees Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, City of Los Angeles, City of Salinas, City of San Jose, County of Los Angeles, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, King County, League of Women Voters, NAACP, National Urban League and Navajo Nation citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 09/29/2020. [11840908] [20-16868] (Sherry, Melissa) [Entered: 09/29/2020 01:27 PM]
September 28, 2020 Filing 22 Filed (ECF) Appellants Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, United States Census Bureau and USDOC Correspondence: Notice of revision to target date for completion of field operations.. Date of service: 09/28/2020 [11840007] [20-16868] (Hinshelwood, Bradley) [Entered: 09/28/2020 05:50 PM]
September 28, 2020 Filing 21 Filed (ECF) Appellants Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, United States Census Bureau and USDOC reply to response (). Date of service: 09/28/2020. [11839107] [20-16868] (Hinshelwood, Bradley) [Entered: 09/28/2020 12:42 PM]
September 28, 2020 Filing 20 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: TSP): The appeal filed September 25, 2020 is a preliminary injunction appeal. Accordingly, Ninth Circuit Rule 3-3 shall apply. The mediation questionnaire is due three days after the date of this order. If they have not already done so, within 7 calendar days after the filing date of this order, the parties shall make arrangements to obtain from the court reporter an official transcript of proceedings in the district court that will be included in the record on appeal. The briefing schedule shall proceed as follows: the opening brief and excerpts of record are due not later than October 23, 2020; the answering brief is due November 20, 2020 or 28 days after service of the opening brief, whichever is earlier; and the optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. See 9th Cir. R. 3-3(b). No streamlined extensions of time will be approved. See 9th Cir. R. 31-2.2(a)(3). Any request for an extension of time to file a brief must be made by written motion under Ninth Circuit Rule 31-2.2(b). Failure to file timely the opening brief shall result in the automatic dismissal of this appeal by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. [11838952] (JBS) [Entered: 09/28/2020 11:42 AM]
September 28, 2020 Filing 19 COURT CORRECTION: Added Attorney(s) Anne Robinson, Sadik Harry Huseny for party(s) Appellee City of Chicago, in case 20-16868. [11838856]--[Edited 09/28/2020 by SLM] (SLM) [Entered: 09/28/2020 11:14 AM]
September 28, 2020 Filing 18 Terminated David M. Morrell for USDOC, United States Census Bureau, Wilbur L. Ross and Steven Dillingham in 20-16868 (due to incorrect ECF contact information) [11838732] (RY) [Entered: 09/28/2020 10:40 AM]
September 28, 2020 Filing 17 Added Attorney(s) Jason Searle for party(s) Appellee Navajo Nation, in case 20-16868. [11838641] (QDL) [Entered: 09/28/2020 10:08 AM]
September 28, 2020 Filing 16 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Jason Searle (Navajo Nation Department of Justice Post Office Box 2010 Window Rock, Arizona 86515) for Appellee Navajo Nation. Date of service: 09/28/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11838617] [20-16868] (Searle, Jason) [Entered: 09/28/2020 10:04 AM]
September 28, 2020 Filing 15 Added Attorney(s) Paul W. Spruhan for party(s) Appellee Navajo Nation, in case 20-16868. [11838508] (QDL) [Entered: 09/28/2020 09:35 AM]
September 28, 2020 Filing 14 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Paul W. Spruhan (Navajo Nation Department of Justice Post Office Box 2010 Window Rock, Arizona 86515) for Appellee Navajo Nation. Date of service: 09/28/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11838478] [20-16868] (Spruhan, Paul) [Entered: 09/28/2020 09:20 AM]
September 28, 2020 Filing 13 Attorneys Sadik Harry Huseny and Anne Robinson in 20-16868 substituted by Attorney Benna Ruth Solomon in 20-16868 [11838433] (QDL) [Entered: 09/28/2020 08:58 AM]
September 28, 2020 Filing 12 Added Attorney(s) Merrill C. Godfrey, Pratik A. Shah, Z.W. Julius Chen for party(s) Appellee Gila River Indian Community, in case 20-16868. [11838430] (QDL) [Entered: 09/28/2020 08:54 AM]
September 28, 2020 Filing 11 Filed (ECF) Appellees Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of Chicago, City of Los Angeles, City of Salinas, City of San Jose, County of Los Angeles, Rodney Ellis, Adrian Garcia, Gila River Indian Community, Harris County, King County, League of Women Voters, NAACP, National Urban League and Navajo Nation response opposing motion ([ # 4 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 4 ] Motion (ECF Filing) motion to stay lower court action). Date of service: 09/28/2020. [11838421] [20-16868] (Sherry, Melissa) [Entered: 09/28/2020 08:48 AM]
September 28, 2020 Filing 10 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by BRIEF OF THE STATES OF LOUISIANA AND MISSISSIPPI AS AMICI CURIAE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS EMERGENCY MOTION TO STAY. Date of service: 09/28/2020. [11838405] [20-16868] (Murrill, Elizabeth) [Entered: 09/28/2020 08:40 AM]
September 28, 2020 Filing 9 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of BENNA RUTH SOLOMON (Corporation Counsel of the City of Chicago 30 North LaSalle Street - Suite 800 Chicago, IL 60602) for Appellee City of Chicago. Date of service: 09/28/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11838352] [20-16868]--[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect content of filing. 09/28/2020 by SLM] (Solomon, Benna) [Entered: 09/28/2020 07:44 AM]
September 26, 2020 Filing 8 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Merrill C. Godfrey (Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP, 2001 K Street, N.W., Washington, D.C. 20006) for Appellee Gila River Indian Community. Date of service: 09/26/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11838004] [20-16868] (Godfrey, Merrill) [Entered: 09/26/2020 10:01 AM]
September 26, 2020 Filing 7 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Z.W. Julius Chen (Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP, 2001 K Street, N.W., Washington, D.C. 20006) for Appellee Gila River Indian Community. Date of service: 09/26/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11838003] [20-16868] (Chen, Z.W.) [Entered: 09/26/2020 09:58 AM]
September 26, 2020 Filing 6 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Pratik A. Shah (Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP, 2001 K Street, N.W., Washington, D.C. 20006) for Appellee Gila River Indian Community. Date of service: 09/26/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11838002] [20-16868] (Shah, Pratik) [Entered: 09/26/2020 09:54 AM]
September 25, 2020 Filing 5 Filed clerk order: (MN): The court has received appellants emergency motion to stay the district courts September 24, 2020 order pending appeal, and request for an immediate administrative stay pending disposition of the stay motion. Any response to the request for an immediate administrative stay is due by 9:00 a.m. (PDT) on Monday, September 28, 2020.The briefing schedule for the motion to stay pending appeal will be set by separate order. [11837973] (HH) [Entered: 09/25/2020 10:24 PM]
September 25, 2020 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) Appellants Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, United States Census Bureau and USDOC EMERGENCY Motion to stay lower court action. Date of service: 09/25/2020. [11837955] [20-16868] (Hinshelwood, Bradley) [Entered: 09/25/2020 07:37 PM]
September 25, 2020 Filing 3 Added Attorney(s) Bradley Hinshelwood for party(s) Appellant United States Census Bureau, Appellant Wilbur L. Ross, Appellant Steven Dillingham and Appellant USDOC, in case 20-16868. [11837865] (QDL) [Entered: 09/25/2020 05:22 PM]
September 25, 2020 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Bradley Alan Hinshelwood (U.S Department of Justice, 950 Pennsylvania Ave. NW, Room 7256, Washington, DC 20530) for Appellants Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, United States Census Bureau and USDOC. Date of service: 09/25/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11837850] [20-16868] (Hinshelwood, Bradley) [Entered: 09/25/2020 05:14 PM]
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: to be set. Preliminary Injunction Appeal. C.R. 3-3. [11837158] (RT) [Entered: 09/25/2020 12:49 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: National Urban League, et al v. Wilbur Ross, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: KING COUNTY, Washington
Represented By: Anne Robinson
Represented By: Richard P. Bress
Represented By: Jon M. Greenbaum Esquire
Represented By: Kelly M. Percival
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny Esquire
Represented By: Tyce R. Walters
Represented By: Genevieve Patricia Hoffman
Represented By: Melissa Sherry
Represented By: Steven M. Bauer
Represented By: Thomas P. Wolf
Represented By: Christine Casey Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ADRIAN GARCIA
Represented By: Anne Robinson
Represented By: Richard P. Bress
Represented By: Kelly M. Percival
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny Esquire
Represented By: Tyce R. Walters
Represented By: Genevieve Patricia Hoffman
Represented By: Melissa Sherry
Represented By: Danielle Luce Goldstein
Represented By: Steven M. Bauer
Represented By: Thomas P. Wolf
Represented By: Christine Casey Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: HARRIS COUNTY, Texas
Represented By: Anne Robinson
Represented By: Richard P. Bress
Represented By: Jon M. Greenbaum Esquire
Represented By: Kelly M. Percival
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny Esquire
Represented By: Tyce R. Walters
Represented By: Genevieve Patricia Hoffman
Represented By: Melissa Sherry
Represented By: Steven M. Bauer
Represented By: Thomas P. Wolf
Represented By: Christine Casey Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: NATIONAL URBAN LEAGUE
Represented By: Anne Robinson
Represented By: Richard P. Bress
Represented By: Jon M. Greenbaum Esquire
Represented By: Kelly M. Percival
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny Esquire
Represented By: Tyce R. Walters
Represented By: Genevieve Patricia Hoffman
Represented By: Melissa Sherry
Represented By: Steven M. Bauer
Represented By: Thomas P. Wolf
Represented By: Christine Casey Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BLACK ALLIANCE FOR JUST IMMIGRATION
Represented By: Anne Robinson
Represented By: Richard P. Bress
Represented By: Jon M. Greenbaum Esquire
Represented By: Kelly M. Percival
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny Esquire
Represented By: Tyce R. Walters
Represented By: Genevieve Patricia Hoffman
Represented By: Melissa Sherry
Represented By: Steven M. Bauer
Represented By: Thomas P. Wolf
Represented By: Christine Casey Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF COLORED PEOPLE
Represented By: Anne Robinson
Represented By: Richard P. Bress
Represented By: Jon M. Greenbaum Esquire
Represented By: Kelly M. Percival
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny Esquire
Represented By: Doreen N. McPaul
Represented By: Tyce R. Walters
Represented By: Genevieve Patricia Hoffman
Represented By: Melissa Sherry
Represented By: Steven M. Bauer
Represented By: Thomas P. Wolf
Represented By: Christine Casey Smith
Represented By: Doreen Nanibaa McPaul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS
Represented By: Anne Robinson
Represented By: Richard P. Bress
Represented By: Jon M. Greenbaum Esquire
Represented By: Kelly M. Percival
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny Esquire
Represented By: Tyce R. Walters
Represented By: Genevieve Patricia Hoffman
Represented By: Melissa Sherry
Represented By: Steven M. Bauer
Represented By: Thomas P. Wolf
Represented By: Christine Casey Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CITY OF LOS ANGELES, California
Represented By: Anne Robinson
Represented By: Michael Dundas
Represented By: Richard P. Bress
Represented By: Jon M. Greenbaum Esquire
Represented By: Kelly M. Percival
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny Esquire
Represented By: Kathleen Alice Kenealy
Represented By: Tyce R. Walters
Represented By: Genevieve Patricia Hoffman
Represented By: Michael Nelson Feuer Esquire
Represented By: Melissa Sherry
Represented By: Danielle Luce Goldstein
Represented By: Steven M. Bauer
Represented By: Thomas P. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CITY OF SALINAS, California
Represented By: Anne Robinson
Represented By: Richard P. Bress
Represented By: Jon M. Greenbaum Esquire
Represented By: Kelly M. Percival
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny Esquire
Represented By: Tyce R. Walters
Represented By: Genevieve Patricia Hoffman
Represented By: Melissa Sherry
Represented By: Steven M. Bauer
Represented By: Christopher A. Callihan
Represented By: Thomas P. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, California
Represented By: Anne Robinson
Represented By: Jacqueline Harvey
Represented By: David Ilan Holtzman
Represented By: Richard P. Bress
Represented By: Jon M. Greenbaum Esquire
Represented By: Kelly M. Percival
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny Esquire
Represented By: Tyce R. Walters
Represented By: Genevieve Patricia Hoffman
Represented By: Melissa Sherry
Represented By: Steven M. Bauer
Represented By: Thomas P. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GILA RIVER INDIAN COMMUNITY
Represented By: Anne Robinson
Represented By: Z.W. Julius Chen
Represented By: Richard P. Bress
Represented By: Pratik A. Shah
Represented By: Jon M. Greenbaum Esquire
Represented By: Kelly M. Percival
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny Esquire
Represented By: Merrill C. Godfrey
Represented By: Tyce R. Walters
Represented By: Genevieve Patricia Hoffman
Represented By: Donald Pongrace
Represented By: Melissa Sherry
Represented By: Steven M. Bauer
Represented By: Thomas P. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CITY OF SAN JOSE, California
Represented By: Anne Robinson
Represented By: Richard P. Bress
Represented By: Jon M. Greenbaum Esquire
Represented By: Kelly M. Percival
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny Esquire
Represented By: Tyce R. Walters
Represented By: Genevieve Patricia Hoffman
Represented By: Melissa Sherry
Represented By: Steven M. Bauer
Represented By: Thomas P. Wolf
Represented By: Christine Casey Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: NAVAJO NATION
Represented By: Anne Robinson
Represented By: Richard P. Bress
Represented By: Paul W. Spruhan Esquire
Represented By: Jon M. Greenbaum Esquire
Represented By: Kelly M. Percival
Represented By: Jason Searle
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny Esquire
Represented By: Doreen N. McPaul
Represented By: Tyce R. Walters
Represented By: Genevieve Patricia Hoffman
Represented By: Melissa Sherry
Represented By: Steven M. Bauer
Represented By: Thomas P. Wolf
Represented By: Doreen Nanibaa McPaul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CITY OF CHICAGO, Illinois
Represented By: Anne Robinson
Represented By: Richard P. Bress
Represented By: Jon M. Greenbaum Esquire
Represented By: Kelly M. Percival
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny Esquire
Represented By: Tyce R. Walters
Represented By: Genevieve Patricia Hoffman
Represented By: Melissa Sherry
Represented By: Steven M. Bauer
Represented By: Benna Ruth Solomon
Represented By: Thomas P. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RODNEY ELLIS
Represented By: Anne Robinson
Represented By: Richard P. Bress
Represented By: Jon M. Greenbaum Esquire
Represented By: Kelly M. Percival
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny Esquire
Represented By: Tyce R. Walters
Represented By: Genevieve Patricia Hoffman
Represented By: Melissa Sherry
Represented By: Steven M. Bauer
Represented By: Thomas P. Wolf
Represented By: Christine Casey Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: COUNTY OF SANTA CLARA, and 18 Additional Local Governments
Represented By: Raphael Rajendra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF LOUISIANA
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Murrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF MISSISSIPPI
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Murrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: UNITED STATES CENSUS BUREAU
Represented By: Jeffrey Bossert Clark Esquire Sr.
Represented By: Bradley Hinshelwood
Represented By: Sopan Joshi
Represented By: Brad Prescott Rosenberg
Represented By: Diane Kelleher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: STEVEN DILLINGHAM, in his official capacity as Director of the U.S. Census Bureau
Represented By: Jeffrey Bossert Clark Esquire Sr.
Represented By: Bradley Hinshelwood
Represented By: Sopan Joshi
Represented By: Brad Prescott Rosenberg
Represented By: Diane Kelleher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE
Represented By: Jeffrey Bossert Clark Esquire Sr.
Represented By: Bradley Hinshelwood
Represented By: Sopan Joshi
Represented By: Brad Prescott Rosenberg
Represented By: Diane Kelleher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: WILBUR L. ROSS, in his official capacity as Secretary of Commerce
Represented By: Jeffrey Bossert Clark Esquire Sr.
Represented By: Bradley Hinshelwood
Represented By: Sopan Joshi
Represented By: Brad Prescott Rosenberg
Represented By: Diane Kelleher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?