Colin Scholl, et al v. Steven Mnuchin, et al
Defendant / Appellant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, STEVEN TERNER MNUCHIN, in his official capacity as the Secretary of the U.S. Department of Treasury, UNITED STATES INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, CHARLES P. RETTIG, in his official capacity as U.S. Commissioner of Internal Revenue and UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
Intervenor Plaintiff: JOHN GALVAN and PATRICK TAYLOR
Plaintiff / Appellee: COLIN SCHOLL and LISA STRAWN, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated
Intervenor: JEFFREY OLSON
Case Number: 20-16915
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2020 Filing 18 Filed order (RICHARD R. CLIFTON, SANDRA S. IKUTA and KENNETH K. LEE): The unopposed motion to dismiss this appeal (Docket Entry No. [ # 14 ]) is granted. All pending motions are denied as moot. DISMISSED. [11901587] (AF) [Entered: 11/20/2020 02:44 PM]
October 26, 2020 Filing 17 Filed (ECF) Appellees Colin Scholl and Lisa Strawn response to motion ([ # 16 ] Party Motion). Date of service: 10/26/2020. [11872471] [20-16915] (Dermody, Kelly) [Entered: 10/26/2020 09:15 PM]
October 19, 2020 Filing 16 Filed Intervenor - Pending Jeffrey Olson motion to intervene. Deficiencies: None. Served on 10/13/2020. [11864808] (CW) [Entered: 10/20/2020 07:31 AM]
October 19, 2020 Filing 15 Entered appearance of Intervenor - Pending Jeffrey Olson. [11864805] (CW) [Entered: 10/20/2020 07:28 AM]
October 16, 2020 Filing 14 Filed (ECF) Appellees Colin Scholl and Lisa Strawn Unopposed Motion to dismiss the case. Date of service: 10/16/2020. [11862715] [20-16915] (Dermody, Kelly) [Entered: 10/16/2020 06:27 PM]
October 16, 2020 Filing 13 Filed order MEDIATION (RSK): The briefing schedule previously set by the court is vacated. [11861885] (AF) [Entered: 10/16/2020 01:46 PM]
October 6, 2020 Filing 12 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 10/16/2020, 10:30 a.m., PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11849026] (VS) [Entered: 10/06/2020 11:19 AM]
October 5, 2020 Filing 11 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 10/05/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11847425]. [20-16915] (AD) [Entered: 10/05/2020 12:44 PM]
October 5, 2020 Filing 10 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 10/05/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11847424]. [20-16915] (AD) [Entered: 10/05/2020 12:44 PM]
October 5, 2020 Filing 9 Filed (ECF) Appellees Colin Scholl and Lisa Strawn Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/05/2020. [11847242] [20-16915] (Dermody, Kelly) [Entered: 10/05/2020 11:28 AM]
October 5, 2020 Filing 8 Filed (ECF) Appellants IRS, Steven Terner Mnuchin, Charles P. Rettig, United States Department of the Treasury and USA Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/05/2020. [11847132] [20-16915] (Avetta, Julie) [Entered: 10/05/2020 10:53 AM]
October 2, 2020 Filing 7 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: TSP): The appeal filed October 1, 2020 is a preliminary injunction appeal. Accordingly, Ninth Circuit Rule 3-3 shall apply. The mediation questionnaire is due three days after the date of this order. If they have not already done so, within 7 calendar days after the filing date of this order, the parties shall make arrangements to obtain from the court reporter an official transcript of proceedings in the district court that will be included in the record on appeal. The briefing schedule shall proceed as follows: the opening brief and excerpts of record are due not later than October 29, 2020; the answering brief is due November 27, 2020 or 28 days after service of the opening brief, whichever is earlier; and the optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. See 9th Cir. R. 3-3(b). No streamlined extensions of time will be approved. See 9th Cir. R. 31-2.2(a)(3). Any request for an extension of time to file a brief must be made by written motion under Ninth Circuit Rule 31-2.2(b). Failure to file timely the opening brief shall result in the automatic dismissal of this appeal by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. [11846013] (AF) [Entered: 10/02/2020 03:20 PM]
October 2, 2020 Filing 6 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Julie Ciamporcero Avetta (U.S. Department of Justice, Tax Division, Appellate Section, Post Office Box 502, Washington, D.C. 20044) for Appellants IRS, Steven Terner Mnuchin, Charles P. Rettig, United States Department of the Treasury and USA. Date of service: 10/02/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11845825] [20-16915] (Avetta, Julie) [Entered: 10/02/2020 01:49 PM]
October 2, 2020 Filing 5 Attorney Landon Yost in 20-16915 substituted by Attorney Julie Ciamporcero Avetta in 20-16915 [11845811] (QDL) [Entered: 10/02/2020 01:42 PM]
October 2, 2020 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Julie Ciamporcero Avetta (U.S. Department of Justice, Tax Division, Appellate Section, P.O. Box 502, Washington, DC, 20044) for Appellants USA, United States Department of the Treasury, IRS, Steven Terner Mnuchin and Charles P. Rettig. Substitution for Attorney Landon Yost for Appellants Steven Terner Mnuchin, Charles P. Rettig, United States Department of the Treasury, IRS and USA. Date of service: 10/02/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11845807] [20-16915] (Avetta, Julie) [Entered: 10/02/2020 01:41 PM]
October 2, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance (ECF Filing) [2] is rejected. Filer is not permitted to file on behalf of another attorney. Each attorney must file their own notice of appearance. [11845782] (QDL) [Entered: 10/02/2020 01:30 PM]
October 2, 2020 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Julie Ciamporcero Avetta (U.S. Department of Justice, Tax Division, Appellate Section, Post Office Box 502, Washington, D.C. 20044) for Appellants IRS, Steven Terner Mnuchin, Charles P. Rettig, United States Department of the Treasury and USA. Date of service: 10/02/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11845612] [20-16915] (Wong, Sherra) [Entered: 10/02/2020 12:01 PM]
October 2, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: To be set. Preliminary Injunction appeal, C.R. 3-3. [11845419] (JBS) [Entered: 10/02/2020 11:11 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Colin Scholl, et al v. Steven Mnuchin, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Julie Ciamporcero Avetta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: STEVEN TERNER MNUCHIN, in his official capacity as the Secretary of the U.S. Department of Treasury
Represented By: Julie Ciamporcero Avetta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: UNITED STATES INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Represented By: Julie Ciamporcero Avetta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: CHARLES P. RETTIG, in his official capacity as U.S. Commissioner of Internal Revenue
Represented By: Julie Ciamporcero Avetta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
Represented By: Julie Ciamporcero Avetta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: JOHN GALVAN
Represented By: Christopher R. Pitoun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: PATRICK TAYLOR
Represented By: Christopher R. Pitoun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: COLIN SCHOLL
Represented By: Yaman Salahi
Represented By: Eva Jefferson Paterson
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Jalle Dafa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LISA STRAWN, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated
Represented By: Yaman Salahi
Represented By: Eva Jefferson Paterson
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Jalle Dafa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: JEFFREY OLSON
Represented By: Jeffrey Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?