Philip Sands v. Ralph Diaz
Petitioner / Appellant: PHILIP LEO SANDS
Respondent / Appellee: RALPH DIAZ, Secretary of CDCR
Case Number: 20-16935
Filed: October 6, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2020 Filing 6 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: KMB): On November 30, 2020, the district court denied the motion for reconsideration. The stay of proceedings in this court (Docket Entry No. [ # 4 ]) is therefore lifted and this appeal will move forward. This court will rule on the request for a certificate of appealability and any pending motions in a later order. To challenge the district courts ruling on the post-judgment motion, appellant must file an amended notice of appeal within the time prescribed by Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 4. See Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(4). [11911573] (WL) [Entered: 12/01/2020 04:04 PM]
November 9, 2020 Filing 5 Filed Appellant Philip Leo Sands letter dated re: questions on case. Paper filing deficiency: None. [11887081] (JFF) [Entered: 11/09/2020 03:46 PM]
November 2, 2020 Filing 4 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: KMB): This appeal was filed while a timely Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(4) motion was pending in the district court. The notice of appeal is therefore ineffective, see Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(4), and proceedings in this court will be stayed until the district court decides the September 25, 2020 motion. See Leader Natl Ins. Co. v. Industrial Indemnity Ins. Co., 19 F.3d 444 (9th Cir. 1994). Within 21 days after the district courts decision, appellant must notify this court in writing of the decision and state whether he wishes to move forward with this appeal. To challenge the decision on the post-judgment motion, appellant must file an amended notice of appeal within the time set by Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 4. See Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(4). A copy of this order will be sent to the district court. [11879547] (JMR) [Entered: 11/02/2020 04:33 PM]
October 30, 2020 Filing 3 Filed Appellant Philip Leo Sands motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: None. [11877748] (JFF) [Entered: 10/30/2020 04:15 PM]
October 9, 2020 Filing 2 Received copy of District Court order filed on 10/09/2020. Denying leave to appeal IFP. [11854391] (RR) [Entered: 10/09/2020 02:23 PM]
October 6, 2020 Filing 1 Open 9th Circuit docket: needs certificate of appealability. Date COA denied in DC: 09/03/2020. Record on appeal included: Yes. [11848989] (JMR) [Entered: 10/06/2020 11:07 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Philip Sands v. Ralph Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: PHILIP LEO SANDS
Represented By: Philip Leo Sands
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: RALPH DIAZ, Secretary of CDCR
Represented By: Rene Antonio Chacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?