Bank of America, N.A. v. 6517 Angel Mountain Trust, et al
Plaintiff: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., successor by merger to BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP, FKA Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP
Defendant: HAMPTON & HAMPTON, P.C., MOUNTAIN GATE HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION and HAMPTON & HAMPTON COLLECTIONS, LLC
Counter Claimant: KENNETH BERBERICH and 6517 ANGEL MOUNTAIN TRUST
Case Number: 20-17167
Filed: November 3, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2020 Filing 9 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 01/28/2021, 2:00 p.m. Pacific Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows :Appellants 6517 Angel Mountain Trust and Kenneth Berberich opening brief due 03/12/2021. Appellee Bank of America, N.A. answering brief due 04/12/2021. Appellants optional reply brief is due within 21 days afer service of the answering brief. See order for details. [11934558] (MS) [Entered: 12/21/2020 10:26 AM]
December 2, 2020 Filing 8 MEDIATION CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 12/21/2020, 10:00 a.m. Pacific Time. (originally scheduled at 11:00 a.m.). [11912033] (VS) [Entered: 12/02/2020 09:23 AM]
December 2, 2020 Filing 7 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 12/21/2020, 11:00 a.m., PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11911971] (VS) [Entered: 12/02/2020 08:57 AM]
November 16, 2020 Filing 6 Added Attorney(s) Richard Aaron Chastain, Stephen Colmery Parsley for party(s) Appellee Bank of America, N.A., in case 20-17167. [11893485] (QDL) [Entered: 11/16/2020 08:43 AM]
November 16, 2020 Filing 5 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Richard Aaron Chastain (Bradley Arant Boult Cummings, LLP, 1819 Fifth Ave. N., Birmingham, AL 35203) for Appellee Bank of America, N.A.. Date of service: 11/16/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11893448] [20-17167] (Chastain, Richard) [Entered: 11/16/2020 08:32 AM]
November 16, 2020 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Stephen Colmery Parsley (Bradley Arant Boult Cummings, LLP, 1819 Fifth Ave. N., Birmingham, AL 35203) for Appellee Bank of America, N.A.. Date of service: 11/16/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11893423] [20-17167] (Parsley, Stephen) [Entered: 11/16/2020 08:13 AM]
November 10, 2020 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 11/10/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11888390]. [20-17167] (AD) [Entered: 11/10/2020 12:44 PM]
November 10, 2020 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellant 6517 Angel Mountain Trust Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 11/10/2020. [11888222] [20-17167]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached flattened PDF of mediation questionnaire. 11/10/2020 by QDL] (Hong, Joseph) [Entered: 11/10/2020 11:21 AM]
November 3, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants 6517 Angel Mountain Trust and Kenneth Berberich Mediation Questionnaire due on 11/10/2020. Appellants 6517 Angel Mountain Trust and Kenneth Berberich opening brief due 01/04/2021. Appellee Bank of America, N.A. answering brief due 02/03/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11880702] (JBS) [Entered: 11/03/2020 01:57 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Bank of America, N.A. v. 6517 Angel Mountain Trust, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: KENNETH BERBERICH
Represented By: Joseph Hong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: 6517 ANGEL MOUNTAIN TRUST
Represented By: Joseph Hong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., successor by merger to BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP, FKA Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP
Represented By: Nicholas E. Belay Esquire
Represented By: Melanie Dawn Morgan Esquire
Represented By: Richard Aaron Chastain
Represented By: Stephen Colmery Parsley Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAMPTON & HAMPTON, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOUNTAIN GATE HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAMPTON & HAMPTON COLLECTIONS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?