Silvia Lasko, et al v. Caliber Home Loans, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: MOSQUE OF THE GOLDEN RULE and WORLDWIDE MINISTRIES OF ISLAM
Defendant / Appellee: U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A., Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust, COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS, JOE ANDERSON, HSBC, OCWEN FINANCIAL CORPORATION, BANK OF AMERICA, SUMMIT FINANCIAL CORP., CALIBER HOME LOANS, INC., MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC. and LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST
Plaintiff / Appellant: SILVIA REGINA LASKO and KEITH ALAN LASKO, AKA Imam Keith Alan Lasko
Case Number: 20-17181
Filed: November 5, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2020 Filing 6 Filed original and 8 copies of Appellants Keith Alan Lasko and Silvia Regina Lasko opening brief of 34 pages (Informal: No). Served on 11/20/2020. [11901406] (LA) [Entered: 11/20/2020 02:07 PM]
November 20, 2020 Filing 5 Fee status changed ( [Case Number 20-17181: Paid] ). Paid in district court on 11/13/2020, receipt number NVLAS072778. [11901398] (LA) [Entered: 11/20/2020 02:06 PM]
November 18, 2020 Filing 4 Added Attorney(s) Jessica R. Blaemire for party(s) Appellee Ocwen Financial Corporation, in case 20-17181. [11897224] (QDL) [Entered: 11/18/2020 10:22 AM]
November 18, 2020 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Jessica Robbin Blaemire (Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP 1155 F St NW Washington DC 20004) for Appellee Ocwen Financial Corporation. Date of service: 11/18/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11897217] [20-17181] (Blaemire, Jessica) [Entered: 11/18/2020 10:20 AM]
November 5, 2020 Filing 2 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CKP): Order to show cause docket fee due [11883321] (CKP) [Entered: 11/05/2020 02:19 PM]
November 5, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANTS. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Keith Alan Lasko and Silvia Regina Lasko opening brief due 01/04/2021. Appellees Joe Anderson, Bank of America, Caliber Home Loans, Inc., Countrywide Home Loans, HSBC, LSF9 Master Participation Trust, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Ocwen Financial Corporation, Summit Financial Corp. and U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. answering brief due 02/03/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11882705] (JBS) [Entered: 11/05/2020 09:18 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Silvia Lasko, et al v. Caliber Home Loans, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A., Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust
Represented By: Joseph Patrick Sakai
Represented By: Joel Edward Tasca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS
Represented By: Ariel Edward Stern Esquire
Represented By: Melanie Dawn Morgan Esquire
Represented By: Scott Lachman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOE ANDERSON
Represented By: Joseph Patrick Sakai
Represented By: Joel Edward Tasca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HSBC
Represented By: Joseph Patrick Sakai
Represented By: Jacob Bundick
Represented By: Jason Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OCWEN FINANCIAL CORPORATION
Represented By: Arthur Zorio Esquire
Represented By: Maximilien D. Fetaz Esquire
Represented By: Sean Keenan McElenney Esquire
Represented By: Jessica R. Blaemire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BANK OF AMERICA
Represented By: Lilith Vala Xara Esquire
Represented By: Ariel Edward Stern Esquire
Represented By: Melanie Dawn Morgan Esquire
Represented By: Scott Lachman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SUMMIT FINANCIAL CORP.
Represented By: Joseph Patrick Sakai
Represented By: Joel Edward Tasca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CALIBER HOME LOANS, INC.
Represented By: Joseph Patrick Sakai
Represented By: Joel Edward Tasca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC.
Represented By: Joseph Patrick Sakai
Represented By: Joel Edward Tasca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST
Represented By: Joseph Patrick Sakai
Represented By: Joel Edward Tasca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SILVIA REGINA LASKO
Represented By: Silvia Regina Lasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KEITH ALAN LASKO, AKA Imam Keith Alan Lasko
Represented By: Keith Alan Lasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOSQUE OF THE GOLDEN RULE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WORLDWIDE MINISTRIES OF ISLAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?