Nevada Deanza Family Limited P, et al v. Tesoro Refining & Marketing Co, et al
Plaintiff: NEVADA DEANZA FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP
Defendant / Appellee: MARATHON PETROLEUM CORPORATION, a Delaware Corporation, TESORO REFINING & MARKETING COMPANY LLC, a Delaware Corporation and MARATHON PETROLEUM COMPANY LP, a Delaware Corporation
Intervenor Plaintiff: FIRST ELEMENT FUEL, INC.
Case Number: 20-17199
Filed: November 9, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2020 Filing 5 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 01/19/2021, 09:00 a.m., Pacific Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: Appellant's opening brief due 04/02/2021. Appellees' answering brief due 05/03/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due within 21 days afer service of the answering brief. See order for details. [11920272] (VS) [Entered: 12/09/2020 11:49 AM]
November 27, 2020 Filing 4 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 12/09/2020, 09:00 a.m., PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11907569] (VS) [Entered: 11/27/2020 09:58 AM]
November 16, 2020 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 11/16/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11895013]. [20-17199] (AD) [Entered: 11/16/2020 06:44 PM]
November 16, 2020 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellant First Element Fuel, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 11/16/2020. [11894546] [20-17199] (Chang, Cheryl) [Entered: 11/16/2020 03:20 PM]
November 9, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant First Element Fuel, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire due on 11/16/2020. Transcript ordered by 12/07/2020. Transcript due 01/05/2021. Appellant First Element Fuel, Inc. opening brief due 02/16/2021. Appellees Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Marathon Petroleum Corporation and Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC answering brief due 03/16/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11887229] (RT) [Entered: 11/09/2020 04:22 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Nevada Deanza Family Limited P, et al v. Tesoro Refining & Marketing Co, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARATHON PETROLEUM CORPORATION, a Delaware Corporation
Represented By: Scott T. Tropio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TESORO REFINING & MARKETING COMPANY LLC, a Delaware Corporation
Represented By: Scott T. Tropio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARATHON PETROLEUM COMPANY LP, a Delaware Corporation
Represented By: Scott T. Tropio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEVADA DEANZA FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: FIRST ELEMENT FUEL, INC.
Represented By: Cheryl Stephanie Chang Esquire
Represented By: Jessica McElroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?