Brittian Young v. Arizona Department of Environm, et al
Defendant / Appellee: CHARLES L. RYAN, Director for ADOC, CAMILLE D. BIBLES, U.S. District Judge, ARIZONA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, Named as State of Arizona - Arizona Department of Corrections, DAVID SHINN, Director, Director for ADOC, CAROL MILLER, Commercial Property Manager, 4909 LLC State of Arizona, DOMINIC LANZA, MARK BRNOVICH, Attorney General, Attorney General, DAVID G. CAMPBELL, Senior U.S. District Judge, 4909 BEVERLY LLC, Named as 4909 Beverly - Arizona LLC, Commercial Property Holder/Manager, UNKNOWN PARTY, State of Arizona Corrections Officer, Sgt. at Arizona Department of Corrections, ARIZONA DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, Named as State of Arizona ADEQ, Motor Vehicle Inspector, LISA DANIEL FLORES, Judge at Maricopa County Superior Court for Juvenile Civil Matters and ARIZONA DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SAFETY, Named as State of Arizona - Arizona Department of Child Safety
Plaintiff / Appellant: BRITTIAN WILLIE YOUNG
Case Number: 20-17217
Filed: November 13, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2020 Filing 5 Received original and 8 copies of Appellant Brittian Willie Young opening brief of 48 pages (Informal: No). Served on 11/24/2020. Major deficiency: briefing is stayed (IFP motion pending). [11911438] (KWG) [Entered: 12/01/2020 03:16 PM]
November 30, 2020 Filing 4 Filed Appellant Brittian Willie Young motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: None. Served on 11/24/2020. [11909712] (CW) [Entered: 11/30/2020 02:57 PM]
November 30, 2020 Filing 3 Filed Appellant Brittian Willie Young motion for oral argument. Deficiencies: None. Served on 11/24/2020. [11909706] (CW) [Entered: 11/30/2020 02:56 PM]
November 13, 2020 Filing 2 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CKP): Order to show cause docket fee due [11892825] (CKP) [Entered: 11/13/2020 03:36 PM]
November 13, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCE OF PRO SE APPELLANT AND NO APPEARANCE FOR APPELLEES. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Brittian Willie Young opening brief due 01/11/2021. [11891869] (JPD) [Entered: 11/13/2020 10:04 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Brittian Young v. Arizona Department of Environm, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHARLES L. RYAN, Director for ADOC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CAMILLE D. BIBLES, U.S. District Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ARIZONA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, Named as State of Arizona - Arizona Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID SHINN, Director, Director for ADOC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CAROL MILLER, Commercial Property Manager, 4909 LLC State of Arizona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DOMINIC LANZA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARK BRNOVICH, Attorney General, Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID G. CAMPBELL, Senior U.S. District Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: 4909 BEVERLY LLC, Named as 4909 Beverly - Arizona LLC, Commercial Property Holder/Manager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNKNOWN PARTY, State of Arizona Corrections Officer, Sgt. at Arizona Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ARIZONA DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, Named as State of Arizona ADEQ, Motor Vehicle Inspector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LISA DANIEL FLORES, Judge at Maricopa County Superior Court for Juvenile Civil Matters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ARIZONA DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SAFETY, Named as State of Arizona - Arizona Department of Child Safety
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BRITTIAN WILLIE YOUNG
Represented By: Brittian Willie Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?