Michael Williams v. William Gittere, et al
Respondent / Appellee: ISIDRO BACA, Warden, AARON D. FORD, WILLIAM GITTERE and NEVADA ATTORNEY GENERAL
Petitioner / Appellant: MICHAEL LEON WILLIAMS
Case Number: 20-17251
Filed: November 17, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2021 Filing 5 Sent Appellant a copy of docket entry numbers 2 and 3 in response to his letter of request filed on 01/07/2021. [11955787] (JR) [Entered: 01/07/2021 01:04 PM]
January 7, 2021 Filing 4 ENTRY UPDATED. Filed Appellant Michael Leon Williams letter dated 01/04/2021 re: Request for confirmed copy of motion for certificate of appealability. Paper filing deficiency: None. [11955747] [11955747]--[Edited 01/07/2021 by RL] (RL) [Entered: 01/07/2021 12:44 PM]
December 9, 2020 Filing 3 Filed Appellant Michael Leon Williams addendum to application for certificate of appealability. Dated 12/03/2020. Paper filing deficiency: None. [11920627] (RL) [Entered: 12/09/2020 02:05 PM]
November 20, 2020 Filing 2 Filed Appellant Michael Leon Williams motion requesting permission to file statement that appeal should go forward, and application for certificate of appealabilty with scheduling order. Deficiencies: None. Served on 11/18/2020. [11901670] (RL) [Entered: 11/20/2020 03:12 PM]
November 17, 2020 Filing 1 Open 9th Circuit docket: needs certificate of appealability. Date COA denied in DC: 11/02/2020. Record on appeal included: Yes. [11895599] (WL) [Entered: 11/17/2020 10:45 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Michael Williams v. William Gittere, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: ISIDRO BACA, Warden
Represented By: Sheryl Serreze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: AARON D. FORD
Represented By: Sheryl Serreze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: WILLIAM GITTERE
Represented By: Sheryl Serreze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: NEVADA ATTORNEY GENERAL
Represented By: Sheryl Serreze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: MICHAEL LEON WILLIAMS
Represented By: Michael Leon Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?