Albert Kwan v. Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Fi, et al
Defendant: SCENA WEBB, MATTHEW G. WHITAKER, Acting Attorney General and BRIAN T. MORAN
Plaintiff / Appellant: ALBERT K. KWAN
Defendant / Appellee: BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS AND EXPLOSIVES, Division of the Department of Justice
Case Number: 20-35132
Filed: February 14, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2020 Filing 6 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: th): Granting Motion [ # 5 ] (ECF Filing) filed by Appellant to extend time to file brief. Appellant Albert K. Kwan opening brief due 05/18/2020. Appellee Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives answering brief due 06/17/2020. The optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. This order was issued prior to the expiration of time within which a response may be filed. Fed. R. App. P. 27(b). The appellant is reminded that a motion for an extension of time to file a brief should include the position of opposing counsel. 9th Cir. R. 31-2.2(b)(6). [11652974] (TH) [Entered: 04/06/2020 03:20 PM]
April 6, 2020 Filing 5 Filed (ECF) Appellant Albert K. Kwan Motion to extend time to file Opening brief. Date of service: 04/06/2020. [11652353] [20-35132] --[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect content of filing. 4/6/2020 by TYL] (Conte, Joseph) [Entered: 04/06/2020 11:34 AM]
February 24, 2020 Filing 4 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is NOT SELECTED for inclusion in the Mediation Program. Counsel may contact circuit mediator to discuss services available through the court's mediation program, to request a settlement assessment conf, or circumstances develop that might warrant settlement discussions. Info regarding the mediation program may be found at www.ca9.uscourts.gov/mediation. [11606858] (LW) [Entered: 02/24/2020 02:12 PM]
February 20, 2020 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 02/20/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11603294]. [20-35132] (AD) [Entered: 02/20/2020 12:44 PM]
February 20, 2020 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellant Albert K. Kwan Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 02/20/2020. [11602686] [20-35132] (Conte, Joseph) [Entered: 02/20/2020 08:41 AM]
February 14, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Albert K. Kwan Mediation Questionnaire due on 02/21/2020. Appellant Albert K. Kwan opening brief due 04/16/2020. Appellee Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives answering brief due 05/18/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11597853] (RT) [Entered: 02/14/2020 11:08 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Albert Kwan v. Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Fi, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ALBERT K. KWAN
Represented By: Eric R. Stahlfeld
Represented By: Joseph Roll Conte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS AND EXPLOSIVES, Division of the Department of Justice
Represented By: Kristen Rose Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCENA WEBB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW G. WHITAKER, Acting Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN T. MORAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?