Bobby Charlton v. F. Yepez, et al
Defendant / Appellee: C. FITZGERALD, S. REIDMAN, F. YEPEZ, S. BRUNING, C. KROPORNICKI, ARGUELLO, Sgt., JERI TAYLOR, J. DAVIS, M. WILLINGHAM, M. WARE, C. OLSEN, WALKER, Capt., PETERS, Lt., GALLINO, Sgt., A. GONZALEZ, PERSINGER, R.N. and B. DUNCAN
Plaintiff / Appellant: BOBBY SHANE CHARLTON
Case Number: 20-35206
Filed: March 6, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2020 Filing 6 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. [11658850] (VS) [Entered: 04/13/2020 11:08 AM]
March 20, 2020 Filing 5 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 04/03/2020, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [11637226] (VS) [Entered: 03/20/2020 03:36 PM]
March 20, 2020 Filing 4 Attorneys Andrew Hallman, Andrew Hallman, Andrew Hallman, Andrew Hallman, Andrew Hallman, Andrew Hallman, Andrew Hallman, Andrew Hallman,substituted by Attorneys Denise Gale Fjordbeck, [11636630] (JFF) [Entered: 03/20/2020 11:43 AM]
March 20, 2020 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Denise G. Fjordbeck (Oregon Department of Justice - Appellate Division, 1162 Court Street NE, Salem, Oregon 97301) for Appellees Arguello, S. Bruning, J. Davis, B. Duncan, C. Fitzgerald, Gallino, A. Gonzalez, C. Kropornicki, C. Olsen, Persinger, Peters, S. Reidman, Jeri Taylor, Walker, M. Ware, M. Willingham and F. Yepez. Substitution for Attorney Andrew Hallman for Appellees Arguello, S. Bruning, J. Davis, B. Duncan, C. Fitzgerald, Gallino, A. Gonzalez, C. Kropornicki, C. Olsen, Persinger, Peters, S. Reidman, Jeri Taylor, Walker, M. Ware, M. Willingham and F. Yepez. Date of service: 03/20/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11636517] [20-35206] (Fjordbeck, Denise) [Entered: 03/20/2020 11:03 AM]
March 13, 2020 Filing 2 Filed letter from pro se re: Mediation Questionnaire. Served on 03/10/2020. Deficiency: party has counsel. [11629516] (JFF) [Entered: 03/13/2020 01:57 PM]
March 6, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Bobby Shane Charlton Mediation Questionnaire due on 03/13/2020. Transcript ordered by 04/03/2020. Transcript due 05/04/2020. Appellant Bobby Shane Charlton opening brief due 06/12/2020. Appellees Arguello, S. Bruning, J. Davis, B. Duncan, C. Fitzgerald, Gallino, A. Gonzalez, C. Kropornicki, C. Olsen, Persinger, Peters, S. Reidman, Jeri Taylor, Walker, M. Ware, M. Willingham and F. Yepez answering brief due 07/13/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11620587] (JPD) [Entered: 03/06/2020 10:34 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Bobby Charlton v. F. Yepez, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: C. FITZGERALD
Represented By: Andrew Hallman
Represented By: Denise Gale Fjordbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: S. REIDMAN
Represented By: Andrew Hallman
Represented By: Denise Gale Fjordbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: F. YEPEZ
Represented By: Andrew Hallman
Represented By: Denise Gale Fjordbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: S. BRUNING
Represented By: Andrew Hallman
Represented By: Denise Gale Fjordbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: C. KROPORNICKI
Represented By: Andrew Hallman
Represented By: Denise Gale Fjordbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ARGUELLO, Sgt.
Represented By: Andrew Hallman
Represented By: Denise Gale Fjordbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JERI TAYLOR
Represented By: Andrew Hallman
Represented By: Denise Gale Fjordbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: J. DAVIS
Represented By: Andrew Hallman
Represented By: Denise Gale Fjordbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: M. WILLINGHAM
Represented By: Andrew Hallman
Represented By: Denise Gale Fjordbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: M. WARE
Represented By: Andrew Hallman
Represented By: Denise Gale Fjordbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: C. OLSEN
Represented By: Andrew Hallman
Represented By: Denise Gale Fjordbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WALKER, Capt.
Represented By: Andrew Hallman
Represented By: Denise Gale Fjordbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PETERS, Lt.
Represented By: Andrew Hallman
Represented By: Denise Gale Fjordbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GALLINO, Sgt.
Represented By: Andrew Hallman
Represented By: Denise Gale Fjordbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: A. GONZALEZ
Represented By: Andrew Hallman
Represented By: Denise Gale Fjordbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PERSINGER, R.N.
Represented By: Andrew Hallman
Represented By: Denise Gale Fjordbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: B. DUNCAN
Represented By: Andrew Hallman
Represented By: Denise Gale Fjordbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BOBBY SHANE CHARLTON
Represented By: William L. Ghiorso Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?