Roy Cheesman, et al v. City of Ellensburg, et al
Defendant / Appellee: CITY OF ELLENSBURG, ANDREW HALL, Officer, JIM WEED, Detective Sergeant, DAN HANSBERRY, Captain, DEREK HOLMES, Officer, JASON BRUNK, Corporal, JENNIFER MARGHEIM, Officer, ANDREW LARSON, Officer and LUCAS ANDERSON, Officer
Plaintiff / Appellant: ROY D. CHEESMAN and RUTH ANN CONDE CHEESMAN
Case Number: 20-35213
Filed: March 10, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2020 Filing 5 Filed Appellants Roy D. Cheesman and Ruth Ann Conde Cheesman letter dated 04/30/2020 re: RT designation - NAN. Paper filing deficiency: None. [11680948] (CW) [Entered: 05/05/2020 11:27 AM]
April 2, 2020 Filing 4 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LAB): A review of the district court docket reflects that the district court granted appellants leave to proceed in forma pauperis and that such permission has not been revoked. Accordingly, appellants in forma pauperis status continues in this court. See Fed. R. App. P. 24(a)(3). Appellants motions to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal (Docket Entry Nos. [ # 2 ] and [ # 3 ]) are therefore unnecessary. The previously established briefing schedule remains in effect. [11650361] (AF) [Entered: 04/02/2020 03:44 PM]
March 19, 2020 Filing 3 Filed Appellant Roy D. Cheesman FORM 4 motion and affidavit for permission to proceed in forma pauperis. Deficiencies: None. Served on 03/16/2020. [11635669] (RL) [Entered: 03/19/2020 03:25 PM]
March 19, 2020 Filing 2 Filed Appellants Roy D. Cheesman and Ruth Ann Conde Cheesman financial affidavit CJA 23. Deficiencies: None. Served on 03/16/2020. [11635628] (RL) [Entered: 03/19/2020 03:09 PM]
March 10, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Transcript ordered by 04/08/2020. Transcript due 05/08/2020. Appellants Roy D. Cheesman and Ruth Ann Conde Cheesman opening brief due 06/17/2020. Appellees Lucas Anderson, Jason Brunk, City of Ellensburg, Andrew Hall, Dan Hansberry, Derek Holmes, Andrew Larson, Jennifer Margheim and Jim Weed answering brief due 07/17/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11624419] (JBS) [Entered: 03/10/2020 11:03 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Roy Cheesman, et al v. City of Ellensburg, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITY OF ELLENSBURG
Represented By: Kirk A. Ehlis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANDREW HALL, Officer
Represented By: Kirk A. Ehlis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JIM WEED, Detective Sergeant
Represented By: Kirk A. Ehlis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAN HANSBERRY, Captain
Represented By: Kirk A. Ehlis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEREK HOLMES, Officer
Represented By: Kirk A. Ehlis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JASON BRUNK, Corporal
Represented By: Kirk A. Ehlis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JENNIFER MARGHEIM, Officer
Represented By: Kirk A. Ehlis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANDREW LARSON, Officer
Represented By: Kirk A. Ehlis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LUCAS ANDERSON, Officer
Represented By: Kirk A. Ehlis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROY D. CHEESMAN
Represented By: Roy D. Cheesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RUTH ANN CONDE CHEESMAN
Represented By: Ruth Ann Conde Cheesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?