Mary Short, et al v. USA, et al
Defendant: QBE INSURANCE CORPORATION
Plaintiff / Appellant: MARY WILKES SHORT, LEVI WILKES, LESLIE WEILER, J. P. C., A minor by and through their natural guardian and mother, Anna Ruth Trentadue, MEGAN WILKES, MOLLY TYSON, AMY WEILOCH, ANNA RUTH TRENTADUE, ARTHUR THOMAS LINNELL, LEONARD SHORT, ERICA D. LINNELL, F. C. C., A minor by and through their natural guardian and mother, Anna Ruth Trentadue, SHERI LYNNE LINNELL and SHANNON WILKES
Defendant / Appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 20-35311
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
February 25, 2021 MARY SHORT V. USA

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2020 Filing 10 Streamlined request [9] by Appellants F. C. C., J. P. C., Arthur Thomas Linnell, Erica D. Linnell, Sheri Lynne Linnell, Leonard Short, Mary Wilkes Short, Anna Ruth Trentadue, Molly Tyson, Leslie Weiler, Amy Weiloch, Levi Wilkes, Megan Wilkes and Shannon Wilkes to extend time to file the brief is approved. Streamline requests allow for 30 day extensions. Amended briefing schedule: Appellants F. C. C., J. P. C., Arthur Thomas Linnell, Erica D. Linnell, Sheri Lynne Linnell, Leonard Short, Mary Wilkes Short, Anna Ruth Trentadue, Molly Tyson, Leslie Weiler, Amy Weiloch, Levi Wilkes, Megan Wilkes and Shannon Wilkes opening brief due 07/13/2020. Appellee United States of America answering brief due 08/12/2020. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [11683479] (DLM) [Entered: 05/07/2020 10:42 AM]
May 7, 2020 Filing 9 Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellants F. C. C., J. P. C., Arthur Thomas Linnell, Erica D. Linnell, Sheri Lynne Linnell, Leonard Short, Mary Wilkes Short, Anna Ruth Trentadue, Molly Tyson, Leslie Weiler, Amy Weiloch, Levi Wilkes, Megan Wilkes and Shannon Wilkes. New requested due date is 07/10/2020. [11683209] [20-35311] (Shkolnik, Hunter) [Entered: 05/07/2020 08:55 AM]
April 28, 2020 Filing 8 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. [11674515] (VS) [Entered: 04/28/2020 01:38 PM]
April 16, 2020 Filing 7 Filed (ECF) Appellants F. C. C., J. P. C., Arthur Thomas Linnell, Erica D. Linnell, Sheri Lynne Linnell, Leonard Short, Mary Wilkes Short, Anna Ruth Trentadue, Molly Tyson, Leslie Weiler, Amy Weiloch, Levi Wilkes, Megan Wilkes and Shannon Wilkes Correspondence: Letter to Court of Appeals Regarding Transcript of Proceedings. Date of service: 04/16/2020 [11663159] [20-35311] (Shkolnik, Hunter) [Entered: 04/16/2020 01:33 PM]
April 14, 2020 Filing 6 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 04/27/2020, 1:00 p.m., PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11660340] (VS) [Entered: 04/14/2020 10:50 AM]
April 13, 2020 Filing 5 Added Attorney(s) Lowell Sturgill Jr. for party(s) Appellee USA, in case 20-35311. [11658337] (CW) [Entered: 04/13/2020 07:05 AM]
April 11, 2020 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Lowell V. Sturgill Jr. (U.S. Department of Justice, 950 Pennsylvania Avenue N.W., Room 7241, Washington, D.C. 20005) for Appellee USA. Date of service: 04/11/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11658282] [20-35311] (Sturgill, Lowell) [Entered: 04/11/2020 02:01 PM]
April 10, 2020 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 04/10/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11657550]. [20-35311] (AD) [Entered: 04/10/2020 12:44 PM]
April 10, 2020 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellants F. C. C., J. P. C., Arthur Thomas Linnell, Erica D. Linnell, Sheri Lynne Linnell, Leonard Short, Mary Wilkes Short, Anna Ruth Trentadue, Molly Tyson, Leslie Weiler, Amy Weiloch, Levi Wilkes, Megan Wilkes, Shannon Wilkes and Appellee USA Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 04/03/2020. [11657485] [20-35311] (Shkolnik, Hunter) [Entered: 04/10/2020 11:58 AM]
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants F. C. C., J. P. C., Arthur Thomas Linnell, Erica D. Linnell, Sheri Lynne Linnell, Leonard Short, Mary Wilkes Short, Anna Ruth Trentadue, Molly Tyson, Leslie Weiler, Amy Weiloch, Levi Wilkes, Megan Wilkes and Shannon Wilkes Mediation Questionnaire due on 04/13/2020. Appellants F. C. C., J. P. C., Arthur Thomas Linnell, Erica D. Linnell, Sheri Lynne Linnell, Leonard Short, Mary Wilkes Short, Anna Ruth Trentadue, Molly Tyson, Leslie Weiler, Amy Weiloch, Levi Wilkes, Megan Wilkes and Shannon Wilkes opening brief due 06/12/2020. Appellee United States of America answering brief due 07/13/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11652386] (RT) [Entered: 04/06/2020 11:45 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Mary Short, et al v. USA, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QBE INSURANCE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARY WILKES SHORT
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik Esquire
Represented By: Mark S. Northcraft Esquire
Represented By: Brett Scott Bustamante Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LEVI WILKES
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik Esquire
Represented By: Mark S. Northcraft Esquire
Represented By: Brett Scott Bustamante Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LESLIE WEILER
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik Esquire
Represented By: Mark S. Northcraft Esquire
Represented By: Brett Scott Bustamante Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: J. P. C., A minor by and through their natural guardian and mother, Anna Ruth Trentadue
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik Esquire
Represented By: Mark S. Northcraft Esquire
Represented By: Brett Scott Bustamante Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MEGAN WILKES
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik Esquire
Represented By: Mark S. Northcraft Esquire
Represented By: Brett Scott Bustamante Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MOLLY TYSON
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik Esquire
Represented By: Mark S. Northcraft Esquire
Represented By: Brett Scott Bustamante Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: AMY WEILOCH
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik Esquire
Represented By: Mark S. Northcraft Esquire
Represented By: Brett Scott Bustamante Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ANNA RUTH TRENTADUE
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik Esquire
Represented By: Mark S. Northcraft Esquire
Represented By: Brett Scott Bustamante Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ARTHUR THOMAS LINNELL
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik Esquire
Represented By: Mark S. Northcraft Esquire
Represented By: Brett Scott Bustamante Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LEONARD SHORT
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik Esquire
Represented By: Mark S. Northcraft Esquire
Represented By: Brett Scott Bustamante Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ERICA D. LINNELL
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik Esquire
Represented By: Mark S. Northcraft Esquire
Represented By: Brett Scott Bustamante Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: F. C. C., A minor by and through their natural guardian and mother, Anna Ruth Trentadue
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik Esquire
Represented By: Mark S. Northcraft Esquire
Represented By: Brett Scott Bustamante Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SHERI LYNNE LINNELL
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik Esquire
Represented By: Mark S. Northcraft Esquire
Represented By: Brett Scott Bustamante Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SHANNON WILKES
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik Esquire
Represented By: Mark S. Northcraft Esquire
Represented By: Brett Scott Bustamante Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Debra Denise Fowler
Represented By: Lowell Sturgill Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?