K. Corrigan, et al v. David Bernhardt, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: HANLEY RANCH PARTNERSHIP, MICHAEL F. HANLEY IV, K. JOHN CORRIGAN, M. MARTHA CORRIGAN and LINDA LEE HANLEY
Defendant / Appellee: DONN CHRISTIANSEN, Owyhee Field Office Manager in his official capacity as manager for the Owyhee FO of the Boise District of the BLM, JOHN RUHS, Idaho State Director of the BLM, WILLIAM PERRY PENDLETON, Director of the BLM, LARA DOUGLAS, Boise District Manager in her capacity as manager for the Boise District of the BLM and DAVID BERNHARDT, Secretary of the U.S. Department of Interior
Intervenor Defendant / Appellee: WESTERN WATERSHEDS PROJECT
Case Number: 20-35393
Filed: May 6, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2020 Filing 9 Filed text clerk order (Deputy Clerk: EU): Updated deadlines. Automatic 60-day extension (notice filed at Docket Entry No. [ # 8 ]). Appellants K. John Corrigan, M. Martha Corrigan, Linda Lee Hanley, Michael F. Hanley IV and Hanley Ranch Partnership opening brief due 09/11/2020. Appellees David Bernhardt, Donn Christiansen, Lara Douglas, William Perry Pendleton, John Ruhs and Western Watersheds Project answering brief due 10/13/2020. The optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11732585] (EU) [Entered: 06/24/2020 03:10 PM]
June 24, 2020 Filing 8 Filed (ECF) Appellants K. John Corrigan, M. Martha Corrigan, Hanley Ranch Partnership, Linda Lee Hanley and Michael F. Hanley, IV Correspondence: COVID-19 Notice. Date of service: 06/24/2020 [11732541] [20-35393] (Schroeder, Laura) [Entered: 06/24/2020 02:49 PM]
June 11, 2020 Filing 7 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. All further inquiries regarding this appeal, including request for extensions of time, should be directed to the Clerk's Office. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [11718879] (VS) [Entered: 06/11/2020 01:24 PM]
May 21, 2020 Filing 6 Added Attorney(s) Paul Ruprecht for party(s) Appellee Western Watersheds Project, in case 20-35393. [11698243] (NAC) [Entered: 05/21/2020 02:56 PM]
May 21, 2020 Filing 5 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Paul David Ruprecht (Western Watersheds Project, PO Box 12356, Reno, NV 89510) for Appellee Western Watersheds Project. Date of service: 05/21/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11698230] [20-35393] (Ruprecht, Paul) [Entered: 05/21/2020 02:53 PM]
May 19, 2020 Filing 4 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 06/11/2020, 1:00 p.m., PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11695401] (VS) [Entered: 05/19/2020 11:35 AM]
May 12, 2020 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 05/12/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11688917]. [20-35393] (AD) [Entered: 05/12/2020 06:44 PM]
May 12, 2020 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellants K. John Corrigan, M. Martha Corrigan, Hanley Ranch Partnership, Linda Lee Hanley and Michael F. Hanley, IV Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 05/12/2020. [11688832] [20-35393] (Schroeder, Laura) [Entered: 05/12/2020 05:12 PM]
May 6, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants K. John Corrigan, M. Martha Corrigan, Linda Lee Hanley, Michael F. Hanley IV and Hanley Ranch Partnership Mediation Questionnaire due on 05/13/2020. Appellants K. John Corrigan, M. Martha Corrigan, Linda Lee Hanley, Michael F. Hanley IV and Hanley Ranch Partnership opening brief due 07/13/2020. Appellees David Bernhardt, Donn Christiansen, Lara Douglas, William Perry Pendleton, John Ruhs and Western Watersheds Project answering brief due 08/13/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11682782] (RT) [Entered: 05/06/2020 03:07 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: K. Corrigan, et al v. David Bernhardt, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: HANLEY RANCH PARTNERSHIP
Represented By: W. Alan Schroeder
Represented By: Laura Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MICHAEL F. HANLEY IV
Represented By: W. Alan Schroeder
Represented By: Laura Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: K. JOHN CORRIGAN
Represented By: W. Alan Schroeder
Represented By: Laura Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: M. MARTHA CORRIGAN
Represented By: W. Alan Schroeder
Represented By: Laura Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LINDA LEE HANLEY
Represented By: W. Alan Schroeder
Represented By: Laura Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DONN CHRISTIANSEN, Owyhee Field Office Manager in his official capacity as manager for the Owyhee FO of the Boise District of the BLM
Represented By: Robert Firpo Esquire
Represented By: Christine Gealy England
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN RUHS, Idaho State Director of the BLM
Represented By: Robert Firpo Esquire
Represented By: Christine Gealy England
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WILLIAM PERRY PENDLETON, Director of the BLM
Represented By: Robert Firpo Esquire
Represented By: Christine Gealy England
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LARA DOUGLAS, Boise District Manager in her capacity as manager for the Boise District of the BLM
Represented By: Robert Firpo Esquire
Represented By: Christine Gealy England
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID BERNHARDT, Secretary of the U.S. Department of Interior
Represented By: Robert Firpo Esquire
Represented By: Christine Gealy England
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant / appellee: WESTERN WATERSHEDS PROJECT
Represented By: Talasi Brooks
Represented By: Paul Ruprecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?