USA v. Cleveland Adams
Defendant / Appellant: CLEVELAND THOR ADAMS
Plaintiff / Appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 20-35429
Filed: May 19, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2020 Filing 8 Filed (ECF) Appellee USA reply to response to order to show cause dated 05/21/2020. Date of service: 06/15/2020. [11722263] [20-35429] (Chung, Yunah) [Entered: 06/15/2020 03:31 PM]
June 3, 2020 Filing 5 Filed Appellant Cleveland Thor Adams motion for certificate of appealability. Deficiencies: None. [11709506] (RR) [Entered: 06/03/2020 10:29 AM]
June 1, 2020 Filing 7 Filed Appellant Cleveland Thor Adams response to why appeal should not be dismissed. [11711006] (RR) [Entered: 06/04/2020 11:26 AM]
June 1, 2020 Filing 4 Filed Appellant Cleveland Thor Adams motion for certificate of appealability. Deficiencies: None. [11707163] (NAC) [Entered: 06/01/2020 02:54 PM]
May 29, 2020 Filing 6 Filed Appellant Cleveland Thor Adams motion for certificate of appealability. Deficiencies: None. [11710996] (RR) [Entered: 06/04/2020 11:21 AM]
May 26, 2020 Filing 3 Filed Appellant Cleveland Thor Adams motion for certificate of appealability. Deficiencies: None. [11703649] (RR) [Entered: 05/28/2020 10:48 AM]
May 21, 2020 Filing 2 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: KMB): The record suggests that this court may lack jurisdiction over the request for certificate of appealability because the notice of appeal was not filed or deposited for mailing in the prisons internal mail system within 60 days after entry of the district courts judgment on February 6, 2020. See 28 U.S.C. 2107(b); Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(1)(B), (c). The record reflects that appellant has not filed a motion in the district court to extend or reopen time for appeal and that the notice of appeal was due during the COVID-19 public health crisis. See Fed R. App. P. 4(a)(5), (6); Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Within 60 days after this order, appellant must move for voluntary dismissal of this request for certificate of appealability or show cause why it should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. If appellant elects to show cause, a response may be filed within 10 days after service of appellants memorandum. If appellant does not comply with this order, the Clerk will dismiss this request for certificate of appealability pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 42-1.[11697775] (WL) [Entered: 05/21/2020 11:02 AM]
May 19, 2020 Filing 1 Open 9th Circuit docket: needs certificate of appealability. Date COA denied in DC: 02/05/2020. Record on appeal included: Yes. [11696082] (OC) [Entered: 05/19/2020 04:44 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: USA v. Cleveland Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: CLEVELAND THOR ADAMS
Represented By: Cleveland Thor Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Bryan Wilson
Represented By: Yunah Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?