Rafael Mora-Contreras, et al v. Colette Peters, et al
Defendant / Appellee: JERRY PLANTE, DOUG YANCEY, CRAIG PRINS, MEGHAN LEDDY, COLETTE PETERS, JEREMY M. NOFZIGER, JOHN DOES, 1-5 and ZACHARY GOULD
Plaintiff / Appellant: SHANE STAGGS and RAFAEL MORA-CONTRERAS
Case Number: 20-35476
Filed: June 1, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2020 Filing 8 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. The briefing schedule previously established by the court remains in effect. [11753527] (LW) [Entered: 07/15/2020 10:15 AM]
June 23, 2020 Filing 7 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 07/08/2020, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [11731119] (LW) [Entered: 06/23/2020 03:09 PM]
June 19, 2020 Filing 6 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 06/19/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11728244]. [20-35476] (AD) [Entered: 06/19/2020 06:44 PM]
June 19, 2020 Filing 5 Filed (ECF) Appellants Rafael Mora-Contreras and Shane Staggs Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 06/19/2020. [11728237] [20-35476] (Chavez, Juan) [Entered: 06/19/2020 06:40 PM]
June 17, 2020 Filing 4 Attorney Shannon M. Vincent in 20-35476 substituted by Attorney Denise Gale Fjordbeck in 20-35476 [11724799] (QDL) [Entered: 06/17/2020 11:17 AM]
June 17, 2020 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Denise G. Fjordbeck (Oregon Department of Justice - Appellate Division, 1162 Court Street NE, Salem, Oregon 97301) for Appellees Zachary Gould, Meghan Leddy, Jeremy M. Nofziger, Colette Peters, Doug Yancey, Craig Prins and Jerry Plante. Substitution for Attorney Shannon M. Vincent for Appellees Zachary Gould, Meghan Leddy, Jeremy M. Nofziger, Colette Peters, Jerry Plante, Craig Prins and Doug Yancey. Date of service: 06/17/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11724577] [20-35476] (Fjordbeck, Denise) [Entered: 06/17/2020 09:45 AM]
June 12, 2020 Filing 2 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The court of appeals' records do not indicate that appellants have filed a mediation questionnaire in accordance with Cir. R. 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing date of this order, appellants shall file a Mediation Questionnaire or dismiss the appeal voluntarily. [11720562] (LW) [Entered: 06/12/2020 02:53 PM]
June 1, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Rafael Mora-Contreras and Shane Staggs Mediation Questionnaire due on 06/08/2020. Appellants Rafael Mora-Contreras and Shane Staggs opening brief due 07/28/2020. Appellees John Does, Zachary Gould, Meghan Leddy, Jeremy M. Nofziger, Colette Peters, Jerry Plante, Craig Prins and Doug Yancey answering brief due 08/27/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11706304] (JPD) [Entered: 06/01/2020 09:22 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Rafael Mora-Contreras, et al v. Colette Peters, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JERRY PLANTE
Represented By: Shannon M. Vincent
Represented By: Denise Gale Fjordbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DOUG YANCEY
Represented By: Shannon M. Vincent
Represented By: Denise Gale Fjordbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CRAIG PRINS
Represented By: Shannon M. Vincent
Represented By: Denise Gale Fjordbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MEGHAN LEDDY
Represented By: Shannon M. Vincent
Represented By: Denise Gale Fjordbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COLETTE PETERS
Represented By: Shannon M. Vincent
Represented By: Denise Gale Fjordbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JEREMY M. NOFZIGER
Represented By: Shannon M. Vincent
Represented By: Denise Gale Fjordbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN DOES, 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ZACHARY GOULD
Represented By: Shannon M. Vincent
Represented By: Denise Gale Fjordbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SHANE STAGGS
Represented By: Juan Chavez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RAFAEL MORA-CONTRERAS
Represented By: Juan Chavez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?