Andrew Moret v. Pat Garrett, et al
Defendant / Appellee: S. SIEMILLER, GODFRIED, M LLOYD, J. SHULZ, B. CONDON, S. HOPSON, BRANFORD, T. MILLSAP, R. BOSE, A. ASHENFELTER, PAT GARRETT, H. SMITH and WASHINGTON COUNTY JAIL
Plaintiff / Appellant: ANDREW GUY MORET
Case Number: 20-35563
Filed: June 23, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 Filing 5 Filed Appellant Andrew Guy Moret letter dated 07/22/2020 re: In this matter, as far as my amended complaint 03, I will ask humbly that the magistrate reconsider accepting it based on continuing violation theory. Paper filing deficiency: None. [11772122] (RL) [Entered: 07/30/2020 02:04 PM]
July 27, 2020 Filing 4 ENTRY UPDATED. Filed Appellant Andrew Guy Moret request for 30 days to file the brief (document formatted as letter). Deficiencies: Case closed. Served on 07/18/2020. [11768865] [11768865]--[Edited 07/28/2020 by RL] (RL) [Entered: 07/28/2020 10:40 AM]
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 Filed order (Deputy Clerk: DA) Appellants motion to stay appellate proceedings is construed as a motion to voluntarily dismiss this appeal. Appellants motion for voluntary dismissal of this appeal (Docket Entry No. [ # 2 ]) is granted. This appeal is dismissed. See Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). This order served on the district court shall act as and for the mandate of this court. [11754260] (JBS) [Entered: 07/15/2020 03:37 PM]
July 6, 2020 Filing 2 Filed Appellant Andrew Guy Moret motion to stay appellate proceedings. Deficiencies: None. [11743144] (NAC) [Entered: 07/06/2020 03:20 PM]
June 23, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Andrew Guy Moret opening brief due 08/24/2020. Appellees A. Ashenfelter, R. Bose, Branford, B. Condon, Pat Garrett, Godfried, S. Hopson, M Lloyd, T. Millsap, J. Shulz, S. Siemiller, H. Smith and Washington County Jail answering brief due 09/24/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11731247] (RT) [Entered: 06/23/2020 04:02 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Andrew Moret v. Pat Garrett, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: S. SIEMILLER
Represented By: Elmer Manuel Dickens Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GODFRIED
Represented By: Elmer Manuel Dickens Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: M LLOYD
Represented By: Elmer Manuel Dickens Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: J. SHULZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: B. CONDON
Represented By: Elmer Manuel Dickens Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: S. HOPSON
Represented By: Elmer Manuel Dickens Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRANFORD
Represented By: Elmer Manuel Dickens Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: T. MILLSAP
Represented By: Elmer Manuel Dickens Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: R. BOSE
Represented By: Elmer Manuel Dickens Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: A. ASHENFELTER
Represented By: Elmer Manuel Dickens Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PAT GARRETT
Represented By: Elmer Manuel Dickens Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: H. SMITH
Represented By: Elmer Manuel Dickens Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WASHINGTON COUNTY JAIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ANDREW GUY MORET
Represented By: Andrew Guy Moret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?