Friends of the Bitterroot v. Leanne Marten, et al
Defendant / Appellant: LEANNE MARTEN, Regional Forester of Region One of the U.S. Forest Service and UNITED STATES FOREST SERVICE, an agency of the U.S. Department of Agriculture
Plaintiff / Appellee: FRIENDS OF THE BITTERROOT
Case Number: 20-36032
Filed: November 30, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2021 Filing 10 Filed order (Deputy Clerk: SML) The conference previously scheduled for January 13, 2021, is canceled. Appellants motion to dismiss Appeal No. 20-36032 (Docket Entry No. [ # 8 ]) is granted. Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys fees on appeal. A copy of this order shall serve as and for the mandate of this court. [11960708] (WL) [Entered: 01/12/2021 11:42 AM]
January 12, 2021 Filing 9 Filed (ECF) Appellant Friends of the Bitterroot in 20-36041 Unopposed Motion to dismiss case voluntarily pursuant to FRAP 42(b). Date of service: 01/12/2021. [11960587] [20-36041, 20-36032] (Akland, Kristine) [Entered: 01/12/2021 11:02 AM]
January 12, 2021 Filing 8 Filed (ECF) Appellants Leanne Marten and USFS in 20-36032, Appellees Leanne Marten and USFS in 20-36041 Unopposed Motion to dismiss case voluntarily pursuant to FRAP 42(b). Date of service: 01/12/2021. [11960107] [20-36032, 20-36041] (Richmond, Benjamin) [Entered: 01/12/2021 08:45 AM]
December 8, 2020 Filing 7 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 01/13/2021, 10:30 a.m., PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11919338] [20-36032, 20-36041] (VS) [Entered: 12/08/2020 04:20 PM]
December 4, 2020 Filing 6 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 12/04/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11914753]. [20-36032] (AD) [Entered: 12/04/2020 06:44 AM]
December 4, 2020 Filing 5 Filed (ECF) Appellants Leanne Marten and USFS in 20-36032, Appellees Leanne Marten and USFS in 20-36041 Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 12/04/2020. [11914747] [20-36032, 20-36041] (Richmond, Benjamin) [Entered: 12/04/2020 06:18 AM]
December 3, 2020 Filing 4 Attorney John Tustin in 20-36032 substituted by Attorney Benjamin Richmond in 20-36032 [11913886] [20-36032, 20-36041] (RR) [Entered: 12/03/2020 11:22 AM]
December 3, 2020 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Benjamin Weinstein Richmond (Department of Justice, ENRD, Appellate Section, P.O. Box 7415, Ben Franklin Station, Washington, DC 20044) for Appellant USFS in 20-36032, Appellee USFS in 20-36041. Substitution for Attorney Mr. John Tustin for Appellants Leanne Marten and USFS in 20-36032, Attorney Mr. John Tustin for Appellees Leanne Marten and USFS in 20-36041. Date of service: 12/03/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11913715] [20-36032, 20-36041] (Richmond, Benjamin) [Entered: 12/03/2020 10:39 AM]
December 1, 2020 Filing 2 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. Setting cross-appeal briefing schedule as follows: Appellant Friends of the Bitterroot Mediation Questionnaire due on 12/08/2020. First cross appeal brief due 03/08/2021 for Leanne Marten and United States Forest Service. Second brief on cross appeal due 04/08/2021 for Friends of the Bitterroot. Third brief on cross appeal due 05/10/2021 for Leanne Marten and United States Forest Service. Optional cross appeal Reply brief for Friends of the Bitterroot is due within 21 days of service of Third brief on cross appeal. [11911492] [20-36041, 20-36032] (RT) [Entered: 12/01/2020 03:36 PM]
November 30, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Leanne Marten and United States Forest Service Mediation Questionnaire due on 12/07/2020. Transcript ordered by 12/28/2020. Transcript due 01/26/2021. Appellants Leanne Marten and United States Forest Service opening brief due 03/08/2021. Appellee Friends of the Bitterroot answering brief due 04/08/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11908924] (RT) [Entered: 11/30/2020 10:27 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Friends of the Bitterroot v. Leanne Marten, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: LEANNE MARTEN, Regional Forester of Region One of the U.S. Forest Service
Represented By: John Tustin
Represented By: Benjamin Richmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: UNITED STATES FOREST SERVICE, an agency of the U.S. Department of Agriculture
Represented By: John Tustin
Represented By: Benjamin Richmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: FRIENDS OF THE BITTERROOT
Represented By: Timothy M. Bechtold Esquire
Represented By: Kristine M. Akland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?