Shane Nickerson v. Jim Salmonsen, et al
Respondent / Appellee: JIM SALMONSEN and ATTORNEY GENERAL FOR THE STATE OF MONTANA
Petitioner / Appellant: SHANE PHILLIP NICKERSON
Case Number: 20-36055
Filed: December 7, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2021 Filing 12 Filed Appellant Shane Phillip Nickerson request for certificate of appealability (document formatted as letter). Deficiencies: None. Served on 01/26/2021. [11988751] (RL) [Entered: 02/01/2021 03:49 PM]
January 12, 2021 Filing 11 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: NA): Appellants letter seeking guidance on how to proceed (Docket Entry No. [ # 10 ]) is construed as a motion to extend time for filing an optional request for a certificate of appealability. See, e.g., Fed. R. App. P. 22; 9th Cir. R. 22-1(d). So construed, the motion is granted. Any request for a certificate of appealability is due by February 18, 2021. [11961385] (OC) [Entered: 01/12/2021 04:15 PM]
January 11, 2021 Filing 10 Filed Appellant Shane Phillip Nickerson request for forms on how to proceed so case doesn't get dismissed. Deficiencies: None. Served on 01/05/2021. [11959446] (RL) [Entered: 01/11/2021 03:03 PM]
January 4, 2021 Filing 9 Filed Appellant Shane Phillip Nickerson letter dated re: account statement. Paper filing deficiency: None. [11951770] (JFF) [Entered: 01/04/2021 04:45 PM]
January 4, 2021 Filing 8 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: KMB): On December 21, 2020, the district court denied appellants post-judgment motions. Appellant filed an amended notice of appeal on December 23, 2020. The stay of proceedings in this court (Docket Entry No. [ # 2 ]) is therefore lifted and this appeal will move forward. This court will rule on the request for a certificate of appealability and any pending motions in a later order. [11950920] (OC) [Entered: 01/04/2021 11:52 AM]
December 28, 2020 Filing 7 Received copy of amended notice of appeal from district court. [11946389] (NAC) [Entered: 12/28/2020 03:08 PM]
December 23, 2020 Filing 6 Received copy of amended notice of appeal from district court. [11938529] (RL) [Entered: 12/23/2020 02:16 PM]
December 22, 2020 Filing 5 Received copy of District Court order filed on. 12/21/2020 [11937479] (JFF) [Entered: 12/22/2020 04:32 PM]
December 21, 2020 Filing 4 Filed Appellant Shane Phillip Nickerson letter dated re: case information. Paper filing deficiency: None. [11935313] (JFF) [Entered: 12/21/2020 02:31 PM]
December 18, 2020 Filing 3 Filed Appellant Shane Phillip Nickerson letter dated re: case information. Paper filing deficiency: None. [11933281] (JFF) [Entered: 12/18/2020 02:59 PM]
December 16, 2020 Filing 2 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: KMB): On November 30, 2020, the district court received appellants motion titled Objection to Honorable Judge Christensen Rulings & Motion to Stay. Appellants November 30, 2020 filing may constitute one of the motions listed in Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 4(a)(4). Proceedings in this court will be stayed until the district court determines whether appellants November 30, 2020 filing falls within those listed in Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 4(a)(4) and, if so, whether the motion should be granted or denied. See Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(4); Leader Natl Ins. Co. v. Indus. Indem. Ins. Co., 19 F.3d 444, 445 (9th Cir. 1994). To challenge the decision on the post-judgment motion, appellant must file an amended notice of appeal within the time set by Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 4. See Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(4). A copy of this order will be sent to the district court. [11930244] (OC) [Entered: 12/16/2020 02:54 PM]
December 7, 2020 Filing 1 Open 9th Circuit docket: needs certificate of appealability. Date COA denied in DC: 11/23/2020. Record on appeal included: Yes. [11917299] (JMR) [Entered: 12/07/2020 02:31 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Shane Nickerson v. Jim Salmonsen, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: JIM SALMONSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: ATTORNEY GENERAL FOR THE STATE OF MONTANA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: SHANE PHILLIP NICKERSON
Represented By: Shane Phillip Nickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?