Joseph Byron, III v. CDTFA, et al
Defendant: CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TAX AND FEE ADMINISTRATION
Plaintiff / Appellant: JOSEPH J. BYRON III
Defendant / Appellee: NICOLAS MADUROS, Director of the California Department of Tax and Fee Administration and DOES, 1-50
Case Number: 20-55125
Filed: February 5, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2020 Filing 4 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 03/13/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11629373]. [20-55125] (AD) [Entered: 03/13/2020 12:44 PM]
March 13, 2020 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) Appellant Joseph J. Byron, III Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 03/13/2020. [11629312] [20-55125] (Nick, J.) [Entered: 03/13/2020 12:03 PM]
February 26, 2020 Filing 2 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The court of appeals' records do not indicate that appellant has filed a mediation questionnaire in accordance with Cir. R. 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing date of this order, appellant shall file a Mediation Questionnaire or dismiss the appeal voluntarily. [11610102] (LW) [Entered: 02/26/2020 03:30 PM]
February 5, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Joseph J. Byron III Mediation Questionnaire due on 02/12/2020. Transcript ordered by 03/06/2020. Transcript due 04/06/2020. Appellant Joseph J. Byron III opening brief due 05/15/2020. Appellees Does and Nicolas Maduros answering brief due 06/15/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11587105] (JMR) [Entered: 02/05/2020 04:38 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Joseph Byron, III v. CDTFA, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOSEPH J. BYRON III
Represented By: J. David Nick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TAX AND FEE ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NICOLAS MADUROS, Director of the California Department of Tax and Fee Administration
Represented By: Laura Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DOES, 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?