Marie Lopez v. The Bank of New York Mellon, et al
Defendant / Appellee: DOES, 1 through 25, inclusive, SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING, a South Carolina corporation, NEW PENN FINANCIAL, LLC, DBA Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, NATIONAL DEFAULT SERVICING CORPORATION, an Arizona corporation, THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON, As Trustee For the Certificateholders Of the CWALT, Inc., Alternative Loan Trust 2007-AO4 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-AO4, FKA The Bank of New York, NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE HOLDINGS, INC., a Texas corporation, DBA Mr. Cooper and THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON, As Trustee For the Certificateholders Of the CWALT, Inc., Alternative Loan Trust 2007-AO4 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-AO4, FKA Bank of New York
Plaintiff / Appellant: MARIE LOPEZ
Case Number: 20-55187
Filed: February 24, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2020 Filing 9 Filed order (Deputy Clerk: SSR) Appellants motion (Docket Entry No. [ # 8 ] ) for voluntary dismissal is granted. This appeal is dismissed. Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). This order served on the district court shall act as and for the mandate of this court. [11659179] (JPD) [Entered: 04/13/2020 01:29 PM]
April 13, 2020 Filing 8 Filed Appellant Marie Lopez pro se motion to dismiss case pursuant to FRAP 42(b). Served on. Deficiency: party has counsel. [11658644] (NAC) [Entered: 04/13/2020 10:05 AM]
April 10, 2020 Filing 7 A copy of the 04/10/2020 order [ # 6 ] was served on appellants counsel of record, Patrick Solomonian, Esq., by email at patricks.law@gmail.com. [11658202] (JPD) [Entered: 04/10/2020 05:37 PM]
April 10, 2020 Filing 6 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LCC): On March 4, 2020, this court ordered appellant, within 21 days, to pay the filing and docketing fees for this appeal or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. The order warned appellant that failure to comply may result in the dismissal of the appeal by the Clerk of the Court. To date, appellant has not complied with the courts March 4, 2020 order. The court sua sponte grants appellant an extension of time to comply with the courts order. Within 21 days after the date of this order, appellant shall comply fully with the courts March 4, 2020 order. Failure to comply with this order will result in the automatic dismissal of this appeal by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. The previously established briefing schedule remains in effect. The Clerk shall serve a copy of this order on appellants counsel of record, Patrick Solomonian, Esq., by email at patricks.law@gmail.com. [11658196] (JPD) [Entered: 04/10/2020 05:28 PM]
March 12, 2020 Filing 5 Mail returned on 03/12/2020 addressed to Patrick Solomonian for Marie Lopez, re: Mediation Questionnaire Overdue order. "UNDELIVERABLE, UNABLE TO FORWARD" Forwarding to: case files. [11627614] (LW) [Entered: 03/12/2020 11:48 AM]
March 9, 2020 Filing 4 Mail returned on 03/09/2020 addressed to Patrick Solomonian for Marie Lopez, re: 02/24/2020 Case Opening Information [ # 1 ]. Returned envelope notes: Return to sender, not deliverable as addressed, unable to forward. Resending to: case files; unable to locate forwarding address. [11622939] (JBS) [Entered: 03/09/2020 01:25 PM]
March 4, 2020 Filing 3 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The court of appeals' records do not indicate that appellant has filed a mediation questionnaire in accordance with Cir. R. 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing date of this order, appellant shall file a Mediation Questionnaire or dismiss the appeal voluntarily. [11617904] (LW) [Entered: 03/04/2020 12:36 PM]
March 4, 2020 Filing 2 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: TSP): Order to show cause docket fee due [11617310] (TSP) [Entered: 03/04/2020 07:50 AM]
February 24, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Marie Lopez Mediation Questionnaire due on 03/02/2020. Transcript ordered by 03/19/2020. Transcript due 04/20/2020. Appellant Marie Lopez opening brief due 05/27/2020. Appellees Does, National Default Servicing Corporation, Nationstar Mortgage Holdings, Inc., New Penn Financial, LLC, Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing and The Bank of New York Mellon answering brief due 06/29/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11606324] (RT) [Entered: 02/24/2020 11:04 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Marie Lopez v. The Bank of New York Mellon, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DOES, 1 through 25, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING, a South Carolina corporation
Represented By: Kathryn Anne Moorer
Represented By: T. Robert Finlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NEW PENN FINANCIAL, LLC, DBA Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Represented By: Kathryn Anne Moorer
Represented By: T. Robert Finlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NATIONAL DEFAULT SERVICING CORPORATION, an Arizona corporation
Represented By: Robert P. Zahradka
Represented By: Megan E. Lees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON, As Trustee For the Certificateholders Of the CWALT, Inc., Alternative Loan Trust 2007-AO4 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-AO4, FKA The Bank of New York
Represented By: Kathryn Anne Moorer
Represented By: T. Robert Finlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE HOLDINGS, INC., a Texas corporation, DBA Mr. Cooper
Represented By: Tuan V. Uong
Represented By: Abraham Joshua Colman Esquire
Represented By: Raffi Kassabian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON, As Trustee For the Certificateholders Of the CWALT, Inc., Alternative Loan Trust 2007-AO4 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-AO4, FKA Bank of New York
Represented By: Kathryn Anne Moorer
Represented By: T. Robert Finlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARIE LOPEZ
Represented By: Patrick Solomonian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?