Jerry Mutza v. Emulex Corporation, et al
Defendant / Appellee: PAUL F. FOLINO, GARY J. DAICHENDT, BRUCE C. EDWARDS, EMERALD MERGER SUB, INC., JEFFREY W. BENCK, DEAN A. YOOST, GREGORY S. CLARK, RAHUL N. MERCHANT, NERSI NAZARI, BEATRIZ V. INFANTE, EMULEX CORPORATION and JOHN A. KELLEY
Plaintiff / Appellant: JERRY MUTZA, Lead Plaintiff
Case Number: 20-55339
Filed: March 30, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
April 15, 2021 JERRY MUTZA V. EMULEX CORPORATION

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2020 Filing 22 Streamlined request [21], [20] by Appellee Emulex Corporation to extend time to file the brief is approved FOR ALL APPELLEES. Amended briefing schedule: Appellees Jeffrey W. Benck, Gregory S. Clark, Gary J. Daichendt, Bruce C. Edwards, Emerald Merger Sub, Inc., Emulex Corporation, Paul F. Folino, Beatriz V. Infante, John A. Kelley, Rahul N. Merchant, Nersi Nazari and Dean A. Yoost answering brief due 10/05/2020. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [11791749] (BG) [Entered: 08/17/2020 02:11 PM]
August 13, 2020 Filing 21 Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Answering Brief by Appellees Jeffrey W. Benck, Gregory S. Clark, Gary J. Daichendt, Bruce C. Edwards, Paul F. Folino, Beatriz V. Infante, John A. Kelley, Rahul N. Merchant, Nersi Nazari and Dean A. Yoost. New requested due date is 10/05/2020. [11787899] [20-55339] (Landau, Eric) [Entered: 08/13/2020 12:18 PM]
August 13, 2020 Filing 20 Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Answering Brief by Appellee Emulex Corporation. New requested due date is 10/05/2020. [11787871] [20-55339] (Garre, Gregory) [Entered: 08/13/2020 11:58 AM]
August 10, 2020 Filing 19 Received 6 paper copies of Opening Brief [ # 13 ] filed by Jerry Mutza. [11784648] (SD) [Entered: 08/11/2020 10:33 AM]
August 10, 2020 Filing 18 Filed (ECF) Appellees Jeffrey W. Benck, Gregory S. Clark, Gary J. Daichendt, Bruce C. Edwards, Paul F. Folino, Beatriz V. Infante, John A. Kelley, Rahul N. Merchant, Nersi Nazari and Dean A. Yoost response joining motion ([ # 16 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 16 ] Motion (ECF Filing) motion for miscellaneous relief (to be used only if no other relief applies)). Date of service: 08/10/2020. [11783855] [20-55339] (Landau, Eric) [Entered: 08/10/2020 04:26 PM]
August 10, 2020 Filing 17 Received 3 paper copies of excerpts of record [ # 14 ] in 2 volume(s) filed by Appellant Jerry Mutza. [11783754] (KWG) [Entered: 08/10/2020 03:53 PM]
August 7, 2020 Filing 16 Filed (ECF) Appellee Emulex Corporation Motion for miscellaneous relief [Petition for Hearing En Banc]. Date of service: 08/07/2020. [11781506] [20-55339] (Garre, Gregory) [Entered: 08/07/2020 02:25 PM]
August 6, 2020 Filing 15 Filed clerk order: The opening brief [ # 13 ] submitted by Jerry Mutza is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 6 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The excerpts of record [ # 14 ] submitted by Jerry Mutza are filed. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 3 copies of the excerpts in paper format securely bound on the left side, with white covers. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [11779697] (KT) [Entered: 08/06/2020 11:50 AM]
August 5, 2020 Filing 14 Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellant Jerry Mutza. Date of service: 08/05/2020. [11778548] [20-55339] (Monteverde, Juan) [Entered: 08/05/2020 02:03 PM]
August 5, 2020 Filing 13 Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Jerry Mutza. Date of service: 08/05/2020. [11778538] [20-55339] (Monteverde, Juan) [Entered: 08/05/2020 02:00 PM]
June 16, 2020 Filing 12 Streamlined request [11] by Appellant Jerry Mutza to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellant Jerry Mutza opening brief due 08/05/2020. Appellees Jeffrey W. Benck, Gregory S. Clark, Gary J. Daichendt, Bruce C. Edwards, Emerald Merger Sub, Inc., Emulex Corporation, Paul F. Folino, Beatriz V. Infante, John A. Kelley, Rahul N. Merchant, Nersi Nazari and Dean A. Yoost answering brief due 09/04/2020. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [11723189] (BG) [Entered: 06/16/2020 10:08 AM]
June 16, 2020 Filing 11 Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellant Jerry Mutza. New requested due date is 08/05/2020. [11723148] [20-55339] (Monteverde, Juan) [Entered: 06/16/2020 09:59 AM]
April 16, 2020 Filing 10 Added Attorney(s) Travis Biffar for party(s) Appellee Beatriz V. Infante Appellee Nersi Nazari Appellee Gary J. Daichendt Appellee Gregory S. Clark Appellee John A. Kelley Appellee Dean A. Yoost Appellee Jeffrey W. Benck Appellee Rahul N. Merchant Appellee Bruce C. Edwards Appellee Paul F. Folino, in case 20-55339. [11662608] (JFF) [Entered: 04/16/2020 09:10 AM]
April 15, 2020 Filing 9 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Travis Biffar (Thomas Whitelaw & Kolegraff LLP, 18101 Von Karman Avenue, Suite 230, Irvine, CA 92612) for Appellees Jeffrey W. Benck, Gregory S. Clark, Gary J. Daichendt, Bruce C. Edwards, Paul F. Folino, Beatriz V. Infante, John A. Kelley, Rahul N. Merchant, Nersi Nazari and Dean A. Yoost. Date of service: 04/15/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11662416] [20-55339] (Biffar, Travis) [Entered: 04/15/2020 06:03 PM]
April 15, 2020 Filing 8 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is NOT SELECTED for inclusion in the Mediation Program. Counsel may contact circuit mediator to discuss services available through the court's mediation program, to request a settlement assessment conf, or circumstances develop that might warrant settlement discussions. Info regarding the mediation program may be found at www.ca9.uscourts.gov/mediation. [11662371] (BLS) [Entered: 04/15/2020 05:00 PM]
April 15, 2020 Filing 7 Terminated Travis Biffar for Dean A. Yoost, Nersi Nazari, Rahul N. Merchant, John A. Kelley, Beatriz V. Infante, Paul F. Folino, Bruce C. Edwards, Gary J. Daichendt, Gregory S. Clark and Jeffrey W. Benck in 20-55339 (due to incorrect ECF contact information) [11662171] (RY) [Entered: 04/15/2020 03:38 PM]
April 6, 2020 Filing 6 Terminated Kevin Hugh Logan for Dean A. Yoost, Nersi Nazari, Rahul N. Merchant, John A. Kelley, Beatriz V. Infante, Paul F. Folino, Bruce C. Edwards, Gary J. Daichendt, Gregory S. Clark and Jeffrey W. Benck in 20-55339 (entered in error at case opening). [11652762] (LA) [Entered: 04/06/2020 02:22 PM]
April 6, 2020 Filing 5 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 04/06/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11652517]. [20-55339] (AD) [Entered: 04/06/2020 12:44 PM]
April 6, 2020 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) Appellant Jerry Mutza Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 04/06/2020. [11652290] [20-55339] (Monteverde, Juan) [Entered: 04/06/2020 11:08 AM]
April 2, 2020 Filing 3 Added Attorney(s) Samir Deger-Sen for party(s) Appellee Emerald Merger Sub, Inc. Appellee Emulex Corporation, in case 20-55339. [11649650] (JFF) [Entered: 04/02/2020 09:50 AM]
April 2, 2020 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Samir Deger-Sen (Latham & Watkins LLP, 885 Third Avenue, New York, NY 10022-4834) for Appellees Emulex Corporation and Emerald Merger Sub, Inc.. Date of service: 04/02/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11649463] [20-55339] (Deger-Sen, Samir) [Entered: 04/02/2020 08:22 AM]
March 30, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Jerry Mutza Mediation Questionnaire due on 04/06/2020. Transcript ordered by 04/27/2020. Transcript due 05/26/2020. Appellant Jerry Mutza opening brief due 07/06/2020. Appellees Jeffrey W. Benck, Gregory S. Clark, Gary J. Daichendt, Bruce C. Edwards, Emerald Merger Sub, Inc., Emulex Corporation, Paul F. Folino, Beatriz V. Infante, John A. Kelley, Rahul N. Merchant, Nersi Nazari and Dean A. Yoost answering brief due 08/06/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11645633] (RT) [Entered: 03/30/2020 01:19 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Jerry Mutza v. Emulex Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PAUL F. FOLINO
Represented By: Kevin Hugh Logan
Represented By: Eric N. Landau
Represented By: Travis Biffar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GARY J. DAICHENDT
Represented By: Kevin Hugh Logan
Represented By: Eric N. Landau
Represented By: Travis Biffar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRUCE C. EDWARDS
Represented By: Kevin Hugh Logan
Represented By: Eric N. Landau
Represented By: Travis Biffar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EMERALD MERGER SUB, INC.
Represented By: Matthew Rawlinson
Represented By: Gregory G. Garre
Represented By: Samir Deger-Sen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JEFFREY W. BENCK
Represented By: Kevin Hugh Logan
Represented By: Eric N. Landau
Represented By: Travis Biffar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEAN A. YOOST
Represented By: Kevin Hugh Logan
Represented By: Eric N. Landau
Represented By: Travis Biffar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GREGORY S. CLARK
Represented By: Kevin Hugh Logan
Represented By: Eric N. Landau
Represented By: Travis Biffar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RAHUL N. MERCHANT
Represented By: Kevin Hugh Logan
Represented By: Eric N. Landau
Represented By: Travis Biffar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NERSI NAZARI
Represented By: Kevin Hugh Logan
Represented By: Eric N. Landau
Represented By: Travis Biffar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BEATRIZ V. INFANTE
Represented By: Kevin Hugh Logan
Represented By: Eric N. Landau
Represented By: Travis Biffar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EMULEX CORPORATION
Represented By: Matthew Rawlinson
Represented By: Gregory G. Garre
Represented By: Samir Deger-Sen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN A. KELLEY
Represented By: Kevin Hugh Logan
Represented By: Eric N. Landau
Represented By: Travis Biffar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JERRY MUTZA, Lead Plaintiff
Represented By: David E. Bower Esquire
Represented By: Benjamin Heikali
Represented By: Juan Monteverde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?