Hamidullah Habibi v. William Barr, et al
Petitioner / Appellant: HAMIDULLAH HABIBI
Respondent / Appellee: CHAD F. WOLF, Secretary of the United States Department of Homeland Security, MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, Deputy Director and Senior Official Performing the Duties of the Director of Immigration and Customs Enforcement, CHRISTOPHER J. LAROSE, Senior Warden, Otay Mesa Detention Center, JAMES DOBSON, Assistant Field Office Director, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, GREGORY ARCHAMBAULT, Field Office Director, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement and WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General
Case Number: 20-55506
Filed: May 7, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
November 18, 2020 HAMIDULLAH HABIBI V. WILLIAM BARR

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2020 Filing 15 Filed clerk order: The reply brief [ # 14 ] submitted by Hamidullah Habibi is filed. No paper copies are required at this time. [11738285] (LA) [Entered: 06/30/2020 12:54 PM]
June 29, 2020 Filing 14 Submitted (ECF) Reply Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Hamidullah Habibi. Date of service: 06/29/2020. [11737468] [20-55506] (Medeiros, Christopher) [Entered: 06/29/2020 11:10 PM]
June 29, 2020 Filing 13 Filed clerk order: The answering brief [ # 10 ] submitted by appellees is filed. No paper copies are required at this time. [11737268] (LA) [Entered: 06/29/2020 05:21 PM]
June 29, 2020 Filing 12 Filed clerk order: The opening brief [ # 5 ] and excerpts of record [ # 6 ] submitted by Hamidullah Habibi are filed. No paper copies are required at this time. [11737267] (LA) [Entered: 06/29/2020 05:20 PM]
June 29, 2020 Filing 11 Filed order (SUSAN P. GRABER and RYAN D. NELSON) The motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Docket Entry No. [ # 3 ]) is granted. The Clerk shall amend the docket to reflect this status. The Clerk will file the opening brief submitted at Docket Entry No. [ # 5 ], and the answering brief submitted at Docket Entry No. [ # 10 ]. Principal briefing is complete. [11737156] (OC) [Entered: 06/29/2020 04:33 PM]
June 22, 2020 Filing 10 Submitted (ECF) Answering Brief for review. Submitted by Appellees Matthew T. Albence, Gregory Archambault, William P. Barr, James Dobson, Christopher J. Larose and Chad F. Wolf. Date of service: 06/22/2020. [11729380] [20-55506] (O'Malley, Andrew) [Entered: 06/22/2020 01:56 PM]
May 26, 2020 Filing 9 Fee status changed ( [Case Number 20-55506: IFP Pending In COA] ). [11700670] (LA) [Entered: 05/26/2020 12:07 PM]
May 26, 2020 Filing 8 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LA): The order filed on May 26, 2020 at Docket Entry No. [ # 7 ] was filed in error and is vacated. Appellant's brief and excerpts of record will be filed after the pending motion to proceed in forma pauperis is resolved. 9th Cir. R. 27-11. [11700660] (LA) [Entered: 05/26/2020 12:05 PM]
May 26, 2020 Filing 7 Filed clerk order: The opening brief [ # 5 ] and excerpts of record [ # 6 ] submitted by Hamidullah Habibi are filed. No paper copies are required at this time. [11700617] (LA) [Entered: 05/26/2020 11:49 AM]
May 22, 2020 Filing 6 Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellant Hamidullah Habibi. Date of service: 05/22/2020. [11700003] [20-55506] (Medeiros, Christopher) [Entered: 05/22/2020 09:45 PM]
May 22, 2020 Filing 5 Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Hamidullah Habibi. Date of service: 05/22/2020. [11700001] [20-55506] (Medeiros, Christopher) [Entered: 05/22/2020 09:42 PM]
May 15, 2020 Filing 4 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: SLL): The unopposed motion to expedite this appeal (Docket Entry No. [ # 2 ]) is granted. The opening brief is due May 22, 2020 The answering brief is due June 22, 2020. The optional reply brief is due within 7 days after service of the answering brief. The motion to proceed in forma pauperis will be addressed by separate order. [11692569] (AF) [Entered: 05/15/2020 02:19 PM]
May 14, 2020 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) Appellant Hamidullah Habibi Motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Date of service: 05/14/2020. [11690816] [20-55506] (Medeiros, Christopher) [Entered: 05/14/2020 11:45 AM]
May 11, 2020 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellant Hamidullah Habibi EMERGENCY Motion to expedite case. Date of service: 05/11/2020. [11685860] [20-55506] (Medeiros, Christopher) [Entered: 05/11/2020 07:43 AM]
May 7, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Hamidullah Habibi opening brief due 07/16/2020. Appellees Matthew T. Albence, Gregory Archambault, William P. Barr, Attorney General, James Dobson, Christopher J. Larose and Chad F. Wolf answering brief due 08/17/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11683247] (RT) [Entered: 05/07/2020 09:11 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Hamidullah Habibi v. William Barr, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: HAMIDULLAH HABIBI
Represented By: Christopher Paul Kailani Medeiros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: CHAD F. WOLF, Secretary of the United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Andrew Nathan O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, Deputy Director and Senior Official Performing the Duties of the Director of Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Andrew Nathan O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: CHRISTOPHER J. LAROSE, Senior Warden, Otay Mesa Detention Center
Represented By: Andrew Nathan O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: JAMES DOBSON, Assistant Field Office Director, Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Andrew Nathan O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: GREGORY ARCHAMBAULT, Field Office Director, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Andrew Nathan O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General
Represented By: Andrew Nathan O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?